ANTELOPE COAL, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-cv-00317-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANTELOPE COAL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Lowes Baker +1 307 687 6008
No Logo Kennecott Energy And Coal Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Lowes Baker +1 307 687 6008
No Logo SPRING CREEK COAL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Lowes Baker +1 307 687 6008
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/16/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $351000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 8/15/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 23 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by ANTELOPE COAL COMPANY, KENNECOTT ENERGY AND COAL COMPANY, SPRING CREEK COAL COMPANY, USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. The parties to bear their respective costs, including any possible attorneys' fees or other expenses of this litigation. (jcp, )
    LREF
    Blank 22 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 8/13/2003 Court Filing
    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on August 5, 2003 before Judge Marian Blank Horn. (dw1, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003
      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 9/5/2003. (vp1, )
        LREF
        Blank 21 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
        STATUS REPORT ORDER:If the court has not received a joint stipulation of dismissal on or before Friday, 9/12/2003, the court ORDERS the parties to file a Joint Status Report on that date. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marian Blank Horn : Status Conference held on 08/05/03. (tpv, )
            LREF
            Blank 20 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003 Court Filing
            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:The court ORDERS the parties to appear for a Status Conference on Tuesday, 8/5/2003 11:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Marian Blank Horn. Counsel for dft shall appear in person. Counsel for pltf may appear by telephone. If a final settlement of this case is achieved before Tuesday, 8/5/03, the parties shall so inform the court immediately and shall file a notice of dismissal. The 8/5/03 status conference can only be canceled by the court, and will only be canceled if the case has not been settled and dismissed. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 Joint Status Report
              JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 7/21/03.(jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 10, 2003 before Judge Marian Blank Horn. (dw1, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 17 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                  STATUS REPORT ORDER:Given the parties' representations, if a notice of dismissal is not filed with the court on or bofore, Monday, July 21, 2003, the parties shall file a joint status report on or before that date. The parties' motion to rescind the court's June 10, 2003 Orders is GRANTED IN PART.Joint Status Report due by 7/21/2003. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 16 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Charles Stoddart for UNITED STATES. Service: 6/20/03.(dw1, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marian Blank Horn : Status Conference held on 6/10/03. (tpv, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: 6/12/2003
                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/10/2003. (vp1, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 15 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/10/2003 11:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Marian Blank Horn. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (hw1, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Joint Status Report
                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by The United States. Service: 4/14/03. (lrd)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due 7/14/2003. (lrd)
                                LREF
                                Blank 13 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                STATUS REPORT ORDER. First Joint Status report due on 4/14/03; Second Joint Status Report due on 7/14/03 ( signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 12 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Status Report
                                  Supplemental STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 1/7/03 (HW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 11 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Joint Status Report due on 1/21/03 (signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 10 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/3/2003 Status Report
                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 12/30/02. (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 9 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting in part, denying in part [8-1] joint motion to Stay Proceedings Joint Status Report due 1/3/03 (signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 8 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002, Terminated: 10/2/2002 Terminated:
                                          JOINT MOTION by ANTELOPE COAL, SPRING CREEK COAL, KENNECOTT ENERGY and USA to Stay Proceedings . (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002, Terminated: 10/2/2002 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 7 Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: 8/16/2002 Answer
                                              ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 8/14/02 (JPSR due 10/8/02). (LTD)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 6 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert N. Dorosin. Service :6/19/02 (AB)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint Answer to complaint due 8/16/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002, Terminated: 6/11/2002 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 6/10/02 ) to Extend Time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint until 8/16/02. (AB)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Rozella Ann Oliver. Service: 5/10/02. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Court Filing
                                                        Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002
                                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #053659. Answer due on 6/17/02. (FE)
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 223 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?