MAHFOUZ SCHONES v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-cv-00344-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo ERNESTINA F. MAHFOUZ SCHONES, Plaintiff

Represented by INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mildred M Cazort +1 479 587 1243 +1 479 587 1157 info@cazortlawfirmltd.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Postal Service

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Francis Kiely +1 202 268 4037 +1 202 268 5287 michael.f.kiely@usps.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/22/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 5/29/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: 5/29/2003
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, with no costs assessed. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: 5/29/2003 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
    ORDER granting defendant's motion to dismiss and directing the Clerk to dismiss the complaint, with no costs to be assessed. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/26/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
      REPLY by USA to response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim. Service: 11/22/02. (LTD)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time within which to reply to response to motion to dismiss . Reply to Response to Motion reset to 11/22/02 for [8-1] motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002, Terminated: 10/30/2002 Terminated:
          MOTION by USA (Service : 10/28/02 ) to Extend Time within which to reply to response to motion to dismiss , (until November 22, 2002). (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
            RESPONSE by ERNESTINA F. MAHFOUZ SCHONES (Service: 10/9/02 ) to [8-1] motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 10/28/02 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss Response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim due 10/10/02 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002, Terminated: 9/23/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                MOTION by ERNESTINA F. MAHFOUZ SCHONES (Service: 8/29/02) to Extend Time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss until 10/10/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/22/2002 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service: 7/19/02) to Dismiss for failure to state a claim . Response due: 8/19/02. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 Set/Clear Flags
                    **Not member of bar flag removed. (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002
                      ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 7/19/02 ( signed by the Clerk ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002, Terminated: 7/11/2002 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service: 7/10/02) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to July 19, 2002). (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002
                          ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. reset Answer deadline to 7/10/02 ( signed by the Clerk ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002, Terminated: 6/21/2002 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service: 6/20/02) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to July 10, 2002). (DS)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Michael Francis Kiely. Service: 5/10/02. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge James F. Merow. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #053706. Answer due on 6/21/02. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002 Set/Clear Flags
                                    **Not member of bar flag set (FE)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 71 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?