MOODY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-cv-00407-FMA
District Judge Francis M. Allegra, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo KEITH A. MOODY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by King Horsley & Lyons LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Bennett Wells +1 985 641 1855 +1 985 649 1536 JohnLawEsq@msn.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office COFC
Filed 4/29/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 11/18/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 28 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 Court Filing
    PUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION on [10] Motion to Dismiss filed by USA. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing the complaint. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 27 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
      SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION to [10] Dft's Motion to Dismiss filed by KEITH A. MOODY, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Reply due by 7/3/2003. Service: 6/16/03.(jcp, )
        LREF
        Blank 25 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Memorandum
        MEMORANDUM Concerning Equitable Estoppel by UNITED STATES. Service: 6/30/03.(jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 26 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 6, 2003 before Judge Francis M. Allegra. (dw1, )
            LREF
            Blank 23 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 Memorandum
            MEMORANDUM concerning pre-trial agreement by UNITED STATES. Service: 6/20/03.(dw1, )
              LREF
              Blank 24 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Response
              SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE to [22] Court Scheduling Order of June 10, 2003 filed by KEITH A. MOODY. Service: 6/18/03.(jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/13/2003
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Francis M. Allegra : Oral Argument held on 6/6/2003. (si1, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 22 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's memorandum re: pre-trial agreement due by 6/23/2003. Plaintiff's memorandum due by 6/30/2003. Parties each shall file memorandum by 6/30/2003. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (dw1, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003
                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/7/2003. (vp1, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 21 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Reid Prouty for UNITED STATES. Service: 5/30/03.(dw1, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                        ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [10] Motion to Dismiss: Oral Argument set for 6/6/2003 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (dw1, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Response
                          SUR-REPLY by KEITH A. MOODY to [15-1] motion reply by USA. Service: 1/14/03 (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [17-1] motion for Leave to file sur-reply (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003, Terminated: 1/27/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                              MOTION by KEITH A. MOODY (Service: 1/14/03) for Leave to file sur-reply . Response due: 1/31/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John N. Maher Service :1/2/03 (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                  REPLY by USA to response to [10-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 11/25/02. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to the motion to dismiss Reply to Response to Motion due 11/25/02 for [10-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002, Terminated: 11/12/2002 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 11/7/02) to Extend Time to file reply to the motion to dismiss until 11/25/02. Response due: 11/25/02. (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/25/2002 Response to Motion
                                        RESPONSE by KEITH A. MOODY (Service: 10/21/02 ) to [10-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 11/7/02 (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jonathan Peter Sills. Service: 10/8/02. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 9/27/02) to Dismiss . Response due: 10/28/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: 9/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting in part, denying in part [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint Answer to complaint due 9/27/02 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002, Terminated: 8/27/2002 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/22/02 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until October 25, 2002]. Response due: 9/9/02 (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002
                                                  ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 8/27/02 ( signed by the Clerk ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002, Terminated: 5/21/2002 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 5/17/02) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to August 27, 2002). (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                      SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER of Judge Francis M. Allegra. Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 06/25/2002
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jeffrey Alan Belkin. Service :5/9/02. (HW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER to retain document entitled "Designation of Administrative Record" until further order of the court ( (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Francis M. Allegra. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002
                                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #053772. Answer due on 6/28/02. (FE)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 153 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?