WOLLAM v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-cv-01744-LMB
District Judge Lawrence M. Baskir, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GARY S. WOLLAM, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Guy James Ferrante +1 703 644 2009 kingand@erols.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dawn Elyse Goodman +1 202 616 1067 +1 202 514 8624 dawn.goodman@usdoj.gov
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Space Brian Spencer Smith +1 202 616 0391 +1 202 353 7298 brian.smith@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/27/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADR, AUTO, ECF, STAYED
  Entries (72) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 64 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008
JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by GARY S. WOLLAM. (Ferrante, Guy)
    LREF
    Legal Document 63 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008
    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by GARY S. WOLLAM. (Ferrante, Guy)
      LREF
      Legal Document 62 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008
      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by GARY S. WOLLAM. (Ferrante, Guy)
        LREF
        Legal Document 61 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008
        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by GARY S. WOLLAM. (Ferrante, Guy)
          LREF
          Legal Document 60 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: 11/12/2007
          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by GARY S. WOLLAM. (Ferrante, Guy)
            LREF
            Legal Document 59 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
            NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn Elyse Goodman for USA. (Goodman, Dawn)
              LREF
              Legal Document 58 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by GARY S. WOLLAM. (Ferrante, Guy)
                LREF
                Legal Document 57 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007
                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by GARY S. WOLLAM. (Ferrante, Guy)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 56 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by GARY S. WOLLAM. (Ferrante, Guy)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 55 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Spencer Smith for USA. (Smith, Brian)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 54 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Spencer Smith for USA. (Smith, Brian)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 53 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Jaeger, Gregory)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 52 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007
                          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Jaeger, Gregory)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 51 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006
                            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Jaeger, Gregory)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 50 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006
                              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Jaeger, Gregory)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 49 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006
                                NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (dls )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 48 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006 Court Filing
                                  ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dls )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 47 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Joint Status Report
                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. Service: 7/12/2006.(hw1, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 46 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [45] Motion for Extension of Time. Status Report due by 7/12/2006. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 45 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006, Terminated: 6/27/2006 Terminated:
                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/12/2006 to File Joint Status Report , filed by USA. Service: 6/16/2006.Response due by 7/3/2006.(mb2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 44 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006 Joint Status Report
                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. Service: 4/28/2006.(mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 43 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 3/2/2006 Joint Status Report
                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. Service: 2/24/2006.(mb2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 42 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [41] Motion for Extension of Time. Status Report due by 2/28/2006. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (mb2, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 41 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006, Terminated: 2/23/2006 Terminated:
                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/28/2006 to File the Joint Status Report , filed by USA. Service: 2/16/2006. Response due by 3/6/2006. (mb2, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/28/2005 Joint Status Report
                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. Service: 12/21/2005.(mb2, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [38] Motion for Extension of Time to file the Joint Status Report. Joint Status Report due by 12/21/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dw1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005, Terminated: 12/16/2005 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/21/2005 to File the Joint Status Report , filed by GARY S. WOLLAM. Service: 12/7/2005. Response due by 12/27/2005. (mb2, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [35] Motion for Extension of Time. Status Report due by 10/14/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (mb2, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Joint Status Report
                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. Service: 10/13/2005.(mb2, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005, Terminated: 10/14/2005 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/14/2005 to Joint Status Report, filed by GARY S. WOLLAM. Service: 10/11/2005. Response due by 10/28/2005. (mb2, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: 8/15/2005 Joint Status Report
                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by GARY S. WOLLAM and USA. Service: 8/12/2005.(dw1)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [32] Motion for Extension of Time to file the Joint Staus Report. Joint Status Report due by 8/15/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dw1)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005, Terminated: 8/10/2005 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/15/2005 to File Joint Status Report, filed by USA. Service: 8/8/2005. Response due by 8/25/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Joint Status Report
                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 6/6/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Joint Status Report
                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 4/4/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                        NOTICE of Reassignment to ADR Judge Christine Odell Cook Miller. (dls )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to ADR Judge Christine O.C. Miller for all further ADR Pilot Program proceedings. ADR Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone for Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (dls )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 Joint Status Report
                                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 2/10/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [25] Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Status Report due by 2/11/2005 Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (mb2, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/8/2005, Terminated: 2/9/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until 02/11/05 to File Joint Status Report by USA.Service: 02/04/05. Response due by 2/22/2005 (mb2, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: 12/9/2004 Joint Status Report
                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 12/3/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [22] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time.Joint Status Report due by 12/3/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004, Terminated: 11/23/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time until December 3, 2004 to file the Joint Status Report by USA.Service: 11/19/04. (dw1)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004 Joint Status Report
                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 10/12/2004.(dw1)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER: Pltf's second unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time until 10/12/2004, to file the Joint Status Report is hereby GRANTED. This Order vacates the Court's Order of 10/7/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: 10/12/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [18] Pltf's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time.Joint Status Report due by 10/8/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. [VACATED PER ORDER OF 10/8/2004] (jcp, ) Modified on 10/14/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004, Terminated: 10/7/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until October 12, 2004 to file Joint Status Report by GARY S. WOLLAM.Service: 10/4/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting [16] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Joint Status Report due by 10/4/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/29/2004, Terminated: 9/29/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/4/2004 to file the Joint Status Report by GARY S. WOLLAM.Service: 9/27/2004. Response due by 10/14/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 7/26/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by GARY S. WOLLAM. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 5/25/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due 8/2/2004 and every 60 days thereafter. (jcp, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 3/25/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/25/2004 and every 60 days thereafter. (jcp, ) Modified on 5/28/2004 to correct due date. (dls).
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 1/23/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due 3/26/2004 and every 60 days thereafter. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 11/25/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due 2/2/2004 and every 60 days thereafter. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by GARY S. WOLLAM. Service: 9/26/03.(jat, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/28/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES, GARY S. WOLLAM. Service: 7/25/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/28/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/23/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES. Service: 5/27/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: (60 day intervals). Joint Status Report due by 7/28/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by GARY S. WOLLAM. Service: 3/27/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Stay proceedings Joint Status Report due 3/28/03, and every 60 days thereafter. (signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 5/28/2003 (dls, ).
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003, Terminated: 1/28/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                    MOTION by GARY S. WOLLAM (Service: 1/22/03) to Stay proceedings . Response due: 2/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER (signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gregory Thomas Jaeger Service :12/17/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Notice of assignment to Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 Complaint
                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT, Answer due on 1/26/03. [fee not received] (FE)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                              Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $150 and RECEIPT #055503. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                CASE assigned to ADR Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 175 times.

                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?