MARTINEZ, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-vv-00040-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BRAD MARTINEZ, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Brian Sacks +1 904 634 1122 +1 904 355 8855 sackslegal@gmail.com
No Logo EUGENE A. MARTINEZ, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Brian Sacks +1 904 634 1122 +1 904 355 8855 sackslegal@gmail.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Catharine Elizabeth Reeves +1 202 307 1400 +1 202 616 4310 catharine.reeves@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/15/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $250000
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 10/30/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 24 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $125,000.00 ws mailed on January 15, 2003 to David B. Sacks, Esq., attorney for the Petitioners. See letter in file. (JM)
    LREF
    Blank 23 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003
    SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $11,805.00 was mailed on January 15, 2003, to David B. Sacks, Esq., for the Petitioners. See letter in file. (JM)
      LREF
      Blank 22 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002
      Certified copy of election and judgment forwarded to HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 21 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Petitioner's Election
        PETITIONER'S ELECTION to accept Judgment. Service: 11/5/02 Election(y/n): y (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 20 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded compensation in the amount of $125,000.00 in the form of a check payable to petitioner as Personal Representative of the Estate of Brad Martinez. It is further ordered and adjudged that petitioner is awarded attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $11,805.13 in the form of a check payable to petitioner and petitioner's attorney, David B. Sacks. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002
            Case closed (LD)
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Notice Not to Seek Review
              JOINT NOTICE NOT TO SEEK REVIEW (LD)
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Published Decision of Special Master - Fees
                Decision of Special Master Laura D. Millman re: fees and costs. Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 17 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002 Stipulation
                  Stipulation by EUGENE A. MARTINEZ, HHS (DS)
                    LREF
                    Blank 16 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 Status Report/Order
                    STATUS REPORT ORDER. Respondent's Status report due 10/24/02 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 15 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 Notice of Change of Address
                      NOTICE of change of address by David Brian Sacks. (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 14 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002
                        ORDER Medical Expert Report due 7/8/02 for HHS , and Status Conference set for 10:30 a.m. on 7/11/02 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 13 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 Affidavit
                          AFFIDAVIT by EUGENE A. MARTINEZ, Re: Dr. Jerry A. Bridgham. Service: 4/19/02. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 12 Filed: 4/17/2002, Entered: 4/17/2002
                            ORDER re: Wolfson Children's Hospital in Jacksonville, FL., shall release the original autopsy slides of Brad Martinez to David B. Sacks, Esquire (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 11 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/15/2002 notice of filing
                              Notice of filing supplemental medical records by EUGENE A. MARTINEZ. Service: 4/?/02 (DS)
                                LREF
                                Blank 10 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Order
                                ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Amend caption to remove Janice Martinez and add Eugene A. Martinez. ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002
                                  ORDER resetting telephonic Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 5/7/02 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002, Terminated: 4/4/2002 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by ALLEN MARTINEZ (Service : 3/29/02 ) to Amend caption to remove Janice Martinez and add Eugene A. Martinez. Response due: 4/15/02 (AB)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: 3/22/2002
                                      Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Amend the Style of the petition received 3/14/02 returned this day because of improper service and copies missing. (AB)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002 Order
                                        ORDER Supplemental Medical Expert Report due: 4/22/02 for BRAD MARTINEZ, for JANICE MARTINEZ, for ALLEN MARTINEZ , date Respondent's Report due to 6/14/02 and Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. 4/30/02 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/15/2002 Order
                                          ORDER re: modification of Rule 4(a). ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002
                                            NOTICE of filing (Exhibit 14) by ALLEN MARTINEZ. Service: 1/23/02. (LTD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Catharine Elizabeth Reeves. Service: 1/22/02. (LTD)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: 1/15/2002
                                                NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master Laura D. Millman. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: 1/15/2002
                                                  PETITION by ALLEN MARTINEZ, JANICE MARTINEZ and BRAD MARTINEZ, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #053072. Vac. Date: 11/7/00 (Respondent's report due 4/15/02). (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: 1/15/2002
                                                    CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 173 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?