WORLD WIDE RACING v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-cv-00460-DGS
District Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo WORLD WIDE RACING FUELS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig D Bell +1 804 755 1179 +1 804 698 2160 cdbell@mcguirewoods.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Diane Seward +1 202 307 6508 +1 202 514 9440 elizabeth.d.seward2@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/6/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $119000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 5/29/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls, )
    LREF
    Blank 19 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [18] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the Motion for Summary Judgment. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due 5/23/2003.Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (lrd)
      LREF
      Blank 18 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003, Terminated: 3/20/2003 Terminated:
      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the motion for summary judgment until 5/23/03, by WORLD WIDE RACING FUELS, INC. Service: 3/18/03. Response due 4/4/2003. (lrd)
        LREF
        Blank 17 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the motion for summary judgment Response to [14-1] motion for Summary Judgment due 3/24/03 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003, Terminated: 2/28/2003 Terminated:
          MOTION by WORLD WIDE RACING (Service: 2/21/03) to Extend Time to respond to the motion for summary judgment until 3/24/03. Response due: 3/10/03. (LTD)
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 1/30/03. (LTD)
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Terminated:
              MOTION by USA (Service: 1/30/03) for Summary Judgment , (together with separate appendix B). Response due: 3/3/03. (LTD) Modified on 02/11/2003
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time to file dispositive motion Defendant's Dispositive motion due 1/31/03 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003, Terminated: 1/24/2003 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service: 1/22/03) to Extend Time to file dispositive motion until 1/31/03. Response due: 2/10/03. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Transcript
                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: one volume, at Washington, DC, for date of November 25, 2002, exhibits: none. Notice to parties. (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Filing deadline to 1/25/03 (Diane Gilbert Sypolt signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Status Conference
                        Status Conference held (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 1:00 p.m. 11/25/02, in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 7 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 Answer
                              ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 9/3/02 (JPSR due 10/25/02 ) (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002
                                ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. reset Answer deadline to 9/3/02 ( signed by the Clerk ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 5 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002, Terminated: 7/3/2002 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 7/2/02) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to September 3, 2002). (DS)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 4 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                    SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER of Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt, directing parties to confer with each other and establishing the court's policies and procedures including, but not limited to, mandatory disclosure, limitations on discovery, enlargements of time, the content of the joint preliminary status report, and scheduling of an initial status conference. A typical schedule is provided. JPSR is due 45 days after answer is filed; and 15 days after the close of discovery, the parties shall file a JSR or dispositive motion. Copy to parties. (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Elizabeth Diane Seward. Service: 5/28/02. (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 2 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                        Notice of assignment to Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 Complaint
                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #053847. Answer due on 7/5/02. (FE)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 92 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?