MAEDA v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-cv-00461-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JUDITH E. MAEDA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by FELDESMAN TUCKER LEIFER FIDELL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugene R. Fidell +1 202 466 8960 +1 202 293 8103 efidell@feldesmantucker.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Postal Service

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Francis Kiely +1 202 268 4037 +1 202 268 5287 michael.f.kiely@usps.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/8/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 1/30/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JUDITH E. MAEDA and USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(ii). Copy to parties. (LTD)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (LTD)
      LREF
      Blank 15 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
      STATUS REPORT ORDER. Defendant's Status report due 1/24/03 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Status Report
        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 1/13/03. (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Report due on 1/13/03 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002 Status Report
            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 12/2/02. (LTD)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
              SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Report due on 12/2/02 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 Status Report
                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 10/31/02. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER set Defendant's Status Report deadline to 10/31/02. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002 Status Report
                    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 9/25/02. (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Stay Proceedings to conduct settlement discussions. Set Defendant's Status Report deadline to 9/30/02. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy parties. (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002, Terminated: 8/7/2002 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service: 8/5/02) to Stay Proceedings to conduct settlement discussions . Response due: 8/22/02. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint Answer deadline to 8/7/02 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002, Terminated: 6/25/2002 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service: 6/24/02) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint , (until August 7, 2002). (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 6/3/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Michael Francis Kiely. Service: 5/31/02. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Court Filing
                                Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O. C. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002
                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #053860. Answer due on 7/8/02. (FE)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 152 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?