TATUM v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-cv-00760-NBF
District Judge Nancy B. Firestone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo WAYNE TATUM, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Scott Little +1 410 539 3545 +1 410 547 8313 starkandlittle@comcast.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Domenique Grace Kirchner +1 202 307 1111 +1 202 514 8624 domenique.kirchner@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/2/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 10/10/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags AUTO, CLOSED, ENDADR
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 16 Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 Unpublished Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
    UNPUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing the case. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 15 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/29/2003 Terminated:
      MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint of Plaintiff Wayne Tatum Because it is Barred by the Statutue of Limitations, 28 USC 2501 by UNITED STATES.Service: 7/25/03. Response due by 8/25/2003. (jcp, )
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003
        JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 7/24/03.(jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/27/2003 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
          STATUS REPORT ORDER:The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by Friday, 7/25/2003. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 ~Notice (other)
            NOTICE of decision in Martinez v. U.S. by UNITED STATES. Service: 6/23/03.(dw1, )
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 Transcript
              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of September 24, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER staying proceedings pending the decision of the Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit in Martinez v. United States (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 ~Notice (other)
                  NOTICE of Intent to proceed by motion in lieu of an answer to the complaint by USA. Service: 9/16/02. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER set telephonic Status Conference for 2:30 p.m., 9/24/02. ( signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 Order
                      ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. reset Answer deadline to 10/18/02 ( signed by the Clerk ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002, Terminated: 9/4/2002 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service: 8/30/02) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to October 18, 2002). (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/29/2002 ADR - Notice of ADR Automatic Program Procedures.Court Filing
                          Notice of ADR Pilot Procedures. ( signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone ). Copy to Parties (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER re: Special Procedures ( signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/25/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Domenique Grace Kirchner. Service: 7/22/02. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/2/2002 Court Filing
                                Notice of assignment to Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/2/2002
                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #054254. Answer due on 9/3/02. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/2/2002
                                    CASE assigned to Sr. ADR Judge Thomas J. Lydon. (FE)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 146 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?