VERMONT YANKEE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-cv-00898-TCW
District Judge Thomas C. Wheeler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Entergy Nuclear Operations, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com
No Logo Entergy Nuclear Vermont Yankee, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Bradley Fagg +1 202 739 5191 +1 202 739 3001 bfagg@morganlewis.com
No Logo Vermont Yankee Nuclear Power Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Conway +1 202 420 2235 conwayr@dicksteinshapiro.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marian Elizabeth Sullivan +1 202 307 0365 +1 202 307 2503 marian.sullivan@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/30/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, PROTO, SNF
  Entries (240) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 214 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
RESPONSE to [212] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Arnold, Scott)
    LREF
    Legal Document 213 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
    RESPONSE to [212] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Fagg, Arnold)
      LREF
      Legal Document 212 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
      MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
        LREF
        Legal Document 211 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Court Filing
        ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [192] MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Ownership of and Right to Pursue Claims Or, In the Alternative, Motion In Limine to Preclude VYNPC from Introducing Evidence Regarding Claims Not Retained: Oral Argument set for 9/17/2008 10:00 AM in the National Courts Building before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck)
          LREF
          Legal Document 210 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008
          RESPONSE to PROPOSED ADDITIONAL FACTS by Defendant the United States, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC., filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC.. (Fagg, Arnold)
            LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 209 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008
            **SEALED**RESPONSE to PROPOSED ADDITIONAL FACTS by Plaintiff Vermont Yankee Nuclear Power Corporation, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC., filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..(Fagg, Arnold)
              LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 208 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008
              **SEALED**REPLY to Response to Motion re [192] MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Ownership of and Right to Pursue Claims Or, In the Alternative, Motion In Limine to Preclude VYNPC from Introducing Evidence Regarding Claims Not Retained, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..(Fagg, Arnold)
                LREF
                Legal Document 207 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008
                Unopposed MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [185] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, filed by USA.Response due by 9/2/2008.(Donahue, Lisa)
                  LREF
                  Blank 206 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Court Filing
                  ORDER granting [205] Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler.(pn)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 205 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008, Terminated: 8/7/2008 Motion to Seal
                    MOTION to Seal Reply Brief to be filed on August 14, 2008, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 8/25/2008.(Fagg, Arnold)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 204 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008
                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [192] MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Ownership of and Right to Pursue Claims Or, In the Alternative, Motion In Limine to Preclude VYNPC from Introducing Evidence Regarding Claims Not Retained in support of Defendant's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by USA. (Luongo, Jeremiah)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 203 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008
                        RESPONSE to [193] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, filed by USA, filed by USA. (Luongo, Jeremiah)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008
                          RESPONSE to [192] MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Ownership of and Right to Pursue Claims Or, In the Alternative, Motion In Limine to Preclude VYNPC from Introducing Evidence Regarding Claims Not Retained, filed by USA.Reply due by 8/18/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Second part of USA response)(Luongo, Jeremiah) Modified on 8/1/2008 to seal document. (dls). Modified on 8/6/2008 (Jordan, George).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 201 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008
                            PROPOSED ADDITIONAL FACTS re: [192] Motion for Summary Judgment,, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION. (Arnold, Scott)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 200 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008
                              RESPONSE to [193] Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact, in Support of Its Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs Entergy Nuclear Vermont Yankee, LLC and Entergy Nuclear Operations, Inc.s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Ownership of and Right to Pursue Claims or, in the Alternative, Motion in Limine to Preclude Vermont Yankee Nuclear Power Corporation from Introducing Evidence Regarding Claims Not Retained, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION. (Arnold, Scott)
                                LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 199 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008
                                **SEALED**RESPONSE to [192] MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Ownership of and Right to Pursue Claims Or, In the Alternative, Motion In Limine to Preclude VYNPC from Introducing Evidence Regarding Claims Not Retained, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.Reply due by 8/14/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits A-B, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit C Part 1, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit C Part 2, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit E Part 1, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit E Part 2, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit F Part 1, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit F Part 2, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit F Part 3, # (10) Exhibit Exhibit G, # (11) Exhibit Exhibit H Part 1, # (12) Exhibit Exhibit H Part 2, # (13) Exhibit Exhibit H Part 3, # (14) Exhibit Exhibits I - Q, # (15) Exhibit Exhibit R, # (16) Exhibit Exhibit S Part 1, # (17) Exhibit Exhibit S Part 2)(Arnold, Scott)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 198 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Marian Elizabeth Sullivan for USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 197 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting [196] Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 196 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008, Terminated: 7/28/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                      MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal, Electronically, "Plaintiff Vermont Yankee Nuclear Power Corporations Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff Entergy Vermont Yankee, LLC and Entergy Nuclear Operation, Inc.s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Ownership of and Right to Pursue Claims or, in the Alternative, Motion in Limine to Preclude VYNPC from Introducing Evidence Regarding Claims not Retained", filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.Response due by 8/11/2008.(Arnold, Scott)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 195 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting [194] Motion for Extension of Time Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler.(ck)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 194 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008, Terminated: 6/16/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until July 31, 2008 to to respond to Entergy Nuclear Vermont Yankee, LLC and Entergy Nuclear Operations, Inc.s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Ownership of and Right to Pursue Claims or, in the alternative, Motion in Limine to Preclude Vermont Yankee Nuclear Power Corporation from Introducing Evidence Regarding Claims Not Retained, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.Response due by 6/30/2008.(Arnold, Scott)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 193 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008
                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [192] MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Ownership of and Right to Pursue Claims Or, In the Alternative, Motion In Limine to Preclude VYNPC from Introducing Evidence Regarding Claims Not Retained, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC.. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 192 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008
                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Ownership of and Right to Pursue Claims Or, In the Alternative, Motion In Limine to Preclude VYNPC from Introducing Evidence Regarding Claims Not Retained, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 7/14/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, part 1 of 2, # (2) Exhibit A, part 2 of 2, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D)(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 191 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Court Filing
                                                ORDER denying [182] Motion for Joinder Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 190 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [183] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 41(b). Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 189 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008
                                                    RESPONSE to [183] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(b) , or, In the Alternative, Motion to Compel, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.Reply due by 5/5/2008. (Arnold, Scott)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 188 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008
                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [182] MOTION for Joinder, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Transcript)(Ashman, Joseph)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 187 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008
                                                        RESPONSE to [182] MOTION for Joinder, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.Reply due by 4/21/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits)(Arnold, Scott)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 186 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008
                                                          RESPONSE to [182] MOTION for Joinder, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Reply due by 4/21/2008. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 185 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [184] Motion for Extension of Time; Fourth Amended Discovery Scheduling Order issued. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 184 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008, Terminated: 4/1/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until June 13, 2008 to submit expert reports and damages schedules and information in response to the Court's Amended Pretrial Order on Damages, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.Response due by 4/17/2008.(Arnold, Scott)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 183 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008, Terminated: 4/22/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                **SEALED** MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(b), filed by USA.Response due by 4/21/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 182 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008, Terminated: 4/28/2008 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                  **SEALED** MOTION for Joinder, filed by USA.Response due by 4/7/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008
                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Response due by 4/21/2008. (dw1)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008
                                                                      ORDER granting [181] Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 181 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008, Terminated: 3/19/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal, filed by USA.Response due by 4/4/2008.(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 180 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-70) held on January 30, 2008 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 179 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part [160] Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 178 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008
                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [160] MOTION to Compel Complete Production of Documents, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 177 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008
                                                                                RESPONSE to [160] Motion to Compel,, filed by USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 176 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Edward Gardner for USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 175 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008, Terminated: 1/9/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Response To Plaintiff Vermont Yankee Nuclear Power Corporation's Motion To Compel Complete Production Of Documents, filed by USA.Response due by 1/28/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Response)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008
                                                                                      ORDER granting [175] Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff Vermont Yankee Nuclear Power Corporation's Motion to Compel Complete Production of Documents. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 174 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [160] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents: Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2008 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 173 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007
                                                                                          **SEALED**REPLY to Response to Motion re [160] MOTION to Compel Complete Production of Documents Plaintiff Vermont Yankee Nuclear Power Corporation's Reply to Plaintiffs Entergy Nuclear Vermont Yankee, LLC and Entergy Nuclear Operations, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff Vermont Yankee Nuclear Power Corporation's Motion to Compel Complete Production of Documents, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit Exhibit B Part 1# (3) Exhibit Exhibit B Part 2# (4) Exhibit Exhibit C# (5) Exhibit Exhibits D and E# (6) Exhibit Exhibit F Part 1# (7) Exhibit Exhibit F Part 2# (8) Exhibit Exhibit F Part 3# (9) Exhibit Exhibit G Part 1# (10) Exhibit Exhibit G Part 2# (11) Exhibit Exhibit G Part 3# (12) Exhibit Exhibit H Part 1# (13) Exhibit Exhibit H Part 2# (14) Exhibit Exhibit H Part 3)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007
                                                                                            ORDER granting [172] Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 172 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007, Terminated: 12/19/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal, Electronically, PLAINTIFF VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATIONS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC AND ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATIONS MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLETE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.Response due by 1/7/2008.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 171 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007
                                                                                                RESPONSE to [160] MOTION to Compel Complete Production of Documents, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Reply due by 12/21/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Affidavits 1 - 7)(Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 170 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                  THIRD AMENDED DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 169 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                    SECOND AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER ON DAMAGES Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 168 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting [165] Motion for Extension of Time Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery shall close on 12/10/2008. Plaintiffs Expert Report due by 4/18/2008. Defendants Expert Report due by 10/3/2008. (dw1)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007
                                                                                                          ORDER granting [166] Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 167 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                            DISCOVERY ORDER Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 166 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007, Terminated: 11/30/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.Response due by 12/14/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Errata)(Arnold, Scott)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 165 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007, Terminated: 11/30/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until April 18, 2008 to to file expert reports and damages schedules and information in response to the Court's Amended Pretrial Order on Damages, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.Response due by 12/13/2007.(Arnold, Scott)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 164 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007
                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for an Order Regarding Discovery of Draft Expert Reports, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.Response due by 12/13/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Arnold, Scott)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 163 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [161] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 162 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [161] First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [160] MOTION to Compel Complete Production of DocumentsFirst MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [160] MOTION to Compel Complete Production of Documents, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.Reply due by 12/3/2007. (Arnold, Scott)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 161 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007, Terminated: 11/19/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                        First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [160] MOTION to Compel Complete Production of Documents, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 12/3/2007.(Bessette, Paul)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 160 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007, Terminated: 1/31/2008 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                          **SEALED** MOTION to Compel Complete Production of Documents, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.Response due by 11/26/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) Exhibit # (5) Exhibit # (6) Exhibit)(Arnold, Scott)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 159 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [158] Motion for Leave to File, Under Seal, Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Complete Production of Documents. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 158 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007, Terminated: 11/6/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff Vermont Yankee Nuclear Power Corporation's Motion to Compel Complete Production of Documents Under Seal, Electronically, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.Response due by 11/23/2007.(Arnold, Scott)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 157 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [156] Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 156 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007, Terminated: 7/24/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until January 3, 2008, June 19, 2008 to Submission of damages schedules and responses, and expert reports, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION, USA, ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Response due by 8/9/2007.(Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 155 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER ON DAMAGES. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 154 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Amended Discovery Scheduling Order: Granting in Part and Denying in Part [150] Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 153 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [150] MOTION to Amend Schedule, filed by USA.Reply due by 6/4/2007. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 152 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007
                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [150] MOTION to Amend Schedule, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION. (Arnold, Scott)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 151 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [150] MOTION to Amend Schedule, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR VERMONT YANKEE, LLC, ENTERGY NUCLEAR OPERATIONS, INC..Reply due by 5/18/2007. (Fagg, Arnold)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 150 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007, Terminated: 5/23/2007 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend Schedule, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.Response due by 5/21/2007.(Arnold, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 149 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                Pretrial Order on Damages. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 148 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Discovery Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 147 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-23) held on January 24, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 146 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007
                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 145 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: A status conference is scheduled for January 24, 2007 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 144 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006
                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 143 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-17) held on October 31, 2006 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 142 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 12/29/2006. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 12/1/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 141 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2006 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 140 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER NOTICE granting re: [138] Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented) pursuant to Rule 83.1(d)(4). Attorney Alexander D. Tomaszczuk terminated. Entered by the Clerk. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 139 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [106] and [108] Defendant's Motions for Summary Judgment, and granting [112] Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 138 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006, Terminated: 10/20/2006 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented)
                                                                                                                                                                        Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney Richard J. Conway in place of Alex D. Tomaszczuk, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 137 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 136 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [132] Motion to Unseal Document. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 135 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006
                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [132] MOTION to Unseal Document Pending Motions, For An Order Directing That Plaintiffs Re-Examine Their Designation Of Material As Subject To The Protective Order and For Entry of a Revised Protective Order, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 134 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [132] MOTION to Unseal Document Pending Motions, For An Order Directing That Plaintiffs Re-Examine Their Designation Of Material As Subject To The Protective Order and For Entry of a Revised Protective Order, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.Reply due by 10/2/2006. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 133 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE, filed by USA re [11] Motion for Summary Judgment, [27] Motion for Summary Judgment, [49] MOTION to Strike, (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 132 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006, Terminated: 9/29/2006 Motion to Unseal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Unseal Document Pending Motions, For An Order Directing That Plaintiffs Re-Examine Their Designation Of Material As Subject To The Protective Order and For Entry of a Revised Protective Order, filed by USA. Response due by 9/18/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 9/18/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 131 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-20) held on August 16, 2006 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 130 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part [103] Motion to Consolidate this case with Entergy Nuclear VT Yankee (03-2663). Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 129 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/26/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [112] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [106] Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by USA,, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (1991 ACR excerpt)# (2) Exhibit B (Boguslawski declaration))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/20/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's Reply in support of its Cross-Motion due by 7/26/2006. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [128] Motion for Enlargement. Plaintiff's Reply in support of its June 8, 2006 cross-motion for summary judgment is due July 26, 2006. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 128 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006, Terminated: 7/19/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/26/06 to File Reply In Support Of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [125] Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 127 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [114] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, filed by USA, filed by USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 126 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [112] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [106] Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by USA,, [106] MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint and, in the alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment Upon Defendant's Right To Recover Unpaid Fees, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 125 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006, Terminated: 7/7/2006 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Defendant's Reply To Plaintiff's Response To Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment Upon Counts I and II of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint And, In the Alternative, For Partial Summary Judgment Upon Defendant's Right To Recover Unpaid Fees, and Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability by 9 pages, filed by USA. Response due by 7/24/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 124 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING [121] Defendant's Motion to File Out of Time its Reply in Support of [103] Defendant's Motion to Consolidate, and GRANTING [122] Defendant's Motion for an Enlargement of Time until July 6, 2006 to File its Reply in support of [106] Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendant's Response to [112] Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 123 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [108] MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding the Invalid Assignment Of Plaintiff's Standard Contract and Pre-Existing Claims from the Partial Breach of that Contract, filed by USA.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 122 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006, Terminated: 6/30/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until July 6, 2006 to File Response or Reply as to [112] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [106] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 121 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006, Terminated: 6/30/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply To Motion to Consolidate Out of Time filed by USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 120 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [103] MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03-2663C with this case, filed by USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 119 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [108] Motion for Summary Judgment, On The Assignment Issue, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.(Tomaszczuk, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 118 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [109] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact On The Assignment Issue, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.(Tomaszczuk, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [116] Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Electronically, and granting [117] Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File its Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Proposed Findings of Fact. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 117 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006, Terminated: 6/12/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/9/2006 to File Response to Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment On Assignment And Proposed Findings Of Fact, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.Response due by 6/26/2006.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 116 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006, Terminated: 6/12/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Electronically, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.Response due by 6/26/2006.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 115 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [103] MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03-2663C with this case, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.Reply due by 6/22/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (1-30-04 Chief Judge Order))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 114 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [112] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [106] Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by USA, In Support Of Its Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 113 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [107] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact On The One-Time Fee Motion, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 112 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006, Terminated: 10/19/2006 Cross Motion [Dispositive]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [106] Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by USA filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part I# (2) Appendix Part II# (3) Appendix Part III)(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 111 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [110] Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Consolidate. Response now due June 8, 2006. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Response due by 6/8/2006. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 110 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006, Terminated: 5/22/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/8/2006 to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Consolidate filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 109 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [108] MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding the Invalid Assignment Of Plaintiff's Standard Contract and Pre-Existing Claims from the Partial Breach of that Contract, filed by USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 108 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006, Terminated: 10/19/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding the Invalid Assignment Of Plaintiff's Standard Contract and Pre-Existing Claims from the Partial Breach of that Contract, filed by USA.Response due by 6/5/2006. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 107 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [106] MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint and, in the alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment Upon Defendant's Right To Recover Unpaid Fees, filed by USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 106 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006, Terminated: 10/19/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint and, in the alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment Upon Defendant's Right To Recover Unpaid Fees, filed by USA.Response due by 6/5/2006. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 105 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [102] Motion to File Under Seal and [104] Motion for Extension of Time to file Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 104 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006, Terminated: 5/4/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 103 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006, Terminated: 8/16/2006 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03-2663C with this case, filed by USA.Response due by 5/22/2006. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 102 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006, Terminated: 5/4/2006 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal For Leave To File Documents Under Seal Electronically, filed by USA.Response due by 5/22/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 101 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [100] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time until May 3, 2006 to file its Motion for Summary Judgment. Subsequent filing deadlines have been adjusted accordingly. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's Response/Cross Motions due by 6/8/2006. Defendant's Dispositive Motion(s) due by 5/3/2006. Plaintiff's Reply in support of Cross-Motion due by 7/19/2006. Defendant's Reply due by 6/29/2006. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 100 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006, Terminated: 4/26/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/3/2006 to File Defendant's Motions For Summary Judgment Regarding Liability, filed by USA. Response due by 5/12/2006.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 99 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [97] Motion for Enlargement of Time, and granting [98] Joint Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's Response/Cross Motions due by 6/1/2006. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/26/2006. Plaintiff's Reply i Support of Cross Motion due by 7/12/2006. Defendant's Reply/Response due by 6/22/2006. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 98 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006, Terminated: 3/21/2006 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend Schedule, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION and USA. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 97 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006, Terminated: 3/21/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 04/17/2006 to to File Responses to Document Requests and Motion for Leave to File Revised Schedule, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION. Response due by 4/3/2006. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 96 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulated Order Governing Review of the DOE's "Record Information System" Database. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 95 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Preservation Order. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 94 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 93 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [92] Motion for Leave to File A Corrected Motion. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 92 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006, Terminated: 2/15/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Corrected Motion For Entry Of The Protective Order E-Mail Preservation Order And Order Governning Access To The RIS Database, filed by USA. Response due by 3/3/2006. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 91 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006, Terminated: 2/15/2006 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Protective Order E-mail Preservation Order and Order Governing Review of the RIS Database, filed by USA. Response due by 3/3/2006. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 90 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 6, 2006 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 3/6/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 89 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's Dispositive Motion due by 3/20/2006. Plaintiff's Response and Cross-Motion due by 5/1/2006. Defendant's Reply and Response due by 5/22/2006. Plaintiff's Reply due by 6/12/06. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiffs Reply in Support of its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/12/2006. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 88 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER taking under advisement [87] Motion to Continue. A status conference is scheduled for February 6, 2006 at 3:00 pm. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/6/2006 03:00 PM before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 87 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006, Terminated: 8/10/2006 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Continue Stay, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION and USA. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 86 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/3/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [85] MOTION to Reassign Case To A Single Judge, filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION. Reply due by 1/17/2006. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 85 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005, Terminated: 8/10/2006 Motion to Reassign CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Reassign Case To A Single Judge, filed by USA. Response due by 1/3/2006. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 84 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler for all further proceedings. Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr no longer assigned to case (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 83 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER reassigning case to Judge Wheeler with his consent Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 82 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/5/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER - Stay continued until the end of 2005 or 30 days after the Federal Circuit issues a decision in Indiana Michigan. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 81 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 80 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Yee-Chieh Chu (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 79 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER - This case will continue in suspension until either July 1, 2005 or 30 days after a decision is issued in Indiana Michigan. This case will not be consolidated with any other case for the time being. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 78 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION, USA. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 77 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER - Status report due 1/18/05 rather than 1/15/05 stated in a previous Order. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 76 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - Reminder that status report is due on January 15. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 75 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/6/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER - This case is suspended until December 31, 2004. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/15/2005. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 74 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 73 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/7/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 1/30/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 72 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [62] Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. . (swf, ) Modified on 9/2/2004 (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 71 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER - We ask that the parties notify the court as soon as they have agreed upon modifications to the Protective Order. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 70 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 69 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT In Response To The Court's June 9, 2004 Order by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 68 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER - We ask that the parties file a status report concerning the posture of this case. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 67 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [59] Order filed by USA. Service: 2/17/04.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [64] Dft's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Dft'sResponse to the Court's Order dated 1/15/2004 will be due on 2/17/2004. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004, Terminated: 2/10/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the [59] Court's Order of 1/15/2004, until 2/17/2004, by USA. Service: 2/2/2004. Response due by 2/19/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [59] Order filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION. Service: 2/2/04.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004, Terminated: 9/2/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION.Service: 1/30/2004. Response due by 2/17/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES [54] Dft's Second Motion to Renew its Motion toConsolidate as well as its previous motions relating to consolidation. The Court further LIFTS THE STAY of the remainder of the cases to which the Order of 4/16/2003, applied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket this Order in this case with an entry noting the same on the dockets of the remaining SNFcases captioned in Dft's instant motion, with a courtesy copy to all SNF parties and presiding SNF judges of the Court. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [60] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [59] Order of 1/15/2004, until 2/2/2004. Response due by 2/2/2004. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004, Terminated: 1/29/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the [59] Court's Order of 1/15/2004, until 2/2/2004, by USA.Service: 1/23/2004. Response due by 2/9/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: We have lifted the Stay in this case. Counsel should notify the court no later than 1/23/2004 whether they wish to enter a pretrial schedule. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Counsel for Dft's Change of Facsimile Number by USA. Service: 12/2/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Directly Related Case [03-2663] by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION. Service: 11/12/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: All filings in this case relating to issues of consolidation will be captioned in this case name and show this presiding judge on the caption. The parties will provide a courtesy copy of such filings to the Clerk's Office for transmission to the Chief Judge. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Response to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA.Service: 9/3/03. Response due by 9/22/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to the Chief Judge for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA. [Original document located in Case No. 98-483C]Service: 8/26/03. Response due by 9/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION to [54] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate filed by VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION. [Original document located in Case No. 98-483C] Reply due by 8/29/2003. Service: 8/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/15/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Dft's Motion to the Chief Judge for Leave to Correct Certificate of Service and to Waive Requirements of RCFC 5.3 Regarding "Dft's Second Motion [to the Chief Judge] to Renew its Motion to Consolidate." (Original Motion located in Case No. 98-126C) (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SECOND MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate by USA. [COPY] (Original Document in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 7/29/03 by hand. Response due by 8/12/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by The United States. Service: 4/11/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE re [22] Cross Motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear acceptance (together with separate appendix) filed by The United States. Reply due by 4/25/2003. Service: 4/11/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [48] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike portions of plaintiff's filings concerning the rate of acceptance of spent nuclear fuel by The United States.Service: 4/11/03 by hand. Response due by 4/25/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003, Terminated: 4/16/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Reply Brief by 30 pages by The United States.Service by hand: 4/11/03. Response due by 4/25/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See orde rin 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to plaintiffs "Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact" filed by The United States. Service: 3/10/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [27] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The United States. Service: 3/10/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [43] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003, Terminated: 3/18/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 3/10/03) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 3/27/03. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: See order [612-1] dated 3/7/03, in case 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [40-1] motion for Leave to remove filings from under seal (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003, Terminated: 3/5/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by VERMONT YANKEE (Service: 2/27/03) for Leave to remove filings from under seal . Response due: 3/17/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 2/21/03) for Leave to file a copy of the motion to renew consideration of 'The United States' motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases, etc. . Response due: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by VERMONT YANKEE (Service: 2/3/03 ) to [27-1] motion for Summary Judgment regarding plaintiff's greater than class C radioactive waste arguments. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Reply due: 2/20/03 (removed from under seal per order of March 5, 2003) (JT) Modified on 03/07/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact regarding Plaintiff's Greater than Class C Radioactive Waste Arguments by VERMONT YANKEE. Service: 2/3/03 (removed from under seal per order of March 5, 2003) (JT) Modified on 03/07/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response by VERMONT YANKEE to [26-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 2/3/03 (Removed from under seal per order of March 5, 2003) (JT) Modified on 03/07/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [32-1] motion for Leave to Place Filings Under Seal Temporarily. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; Defendant's Reply to Response to Motion reset to 2/20/03 for [27-1] motion for Summary Judgment regarding plaintiff's greater than class C radioactive waste arguments. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: The coordinating judge on the Spent Nuclear Fules cases has asked that we suspend consideration of pending motions until the judge has met with the judges of this court who have these cases on their docket's, this meeting will take place February 12, 2003 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003, Terminated: 2/7/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by VERMONT YANKEE (Service : 2/3/03 ) for Leave to Place Filings Under Seal Temporarily. Response due: 2/20/03 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/11/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [7-1] motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim. Service: 1/30/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by VERMONT YANKEE (Service: 1/15/03) to [28-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion and to file reply to the motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 1/30/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [27-1] motion for Summary Judgment regarding plaintiff's greater than class C radioactive waste arguments. Service: 1/22/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/03) to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion and to file reply to the motion for summary judgment until ? Response due: 1/27/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 1/3/03) for Summary Judgment regarding plaintiff's greater than class C radioactive waste arguments , (together with a separate appendix).led by leave of the Judge. Response due: 2/3/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact (regarding plaintiff's greater than class C radioactive waste arguments) by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/3/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [19-1] motion for Leave to place filings under seal temporarily (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/6/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response by VERMONT YANKEE to [12-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 12/19/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/6/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by VERMONT YANKEE. Service: 12/19/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/6/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CROSS MOTION by VERMONT YANKEE ( Service: 12/19/02 ) and RESPONSE to [11-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment by USA, (together with separate appendix). Response due: 1/21/03. (HW) Modified on 01/06/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [18-1] motion to Extend Time within which to its reply brief . Reply to Response to Motion reset to 1/10/03 for [7-1] motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [17-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/3/2003, Terminated: 1/6/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by VERMONT YANKEE (Service : 12/30/02 ) for Leave to place filings under seal temporarily . Response due: 1/13/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/6/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; Response to [22-1] cross motion reset to 1/21/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002, Terminated: 12/30/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 12/23/02 ) to Extend Time within which to its reply brief , (until January 10, 2003). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002, Terminated: 12/30/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by VERMONT YANKEE (Service : 12/19/02 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation , (enlarge to 79 pages). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by VERMONT YANKEE (Service: 12/10/02 ) to [7-1] motion to Dismiss (Count III) for failure to state a claim Reply due: 12/27/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Marian Elizabeth Sullivan Service :12/10/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the motion to dismiss Response to [7-1] motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim reset to 12/10/02 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002, Terminated: 12/4/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by VERMONT YANKEE (Service: 11/25/02) to Extend Time to respond to the motion to dismiss until 12/10/02. Response due: 12/12/02 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 11/21/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION, with appendix, by USA (Service: 11/21/02) for partial Summary Judgment . Response due: 12/23/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [9-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: 11/23/2002, Terminated: 11/25/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 11/21/02 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation in motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent Nuclear Fuel acceptance. (HW) Modified on 11/25/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 10/30/02 (JPSR due 12/23/02). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 10/29/02) to Dismiss for failure to state a claim . Response due: 11/26/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. reset Answer deadline to 10/30/02 ( signed by the Clerk ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002, Terminated: 10/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 9/30/02) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to October 30, 2002). (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr.. Service: 9/30/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice by VERMONT YANKEE of indirectly related cases. (Case Nos.: 01-551C, 01-249C, 01-116C, 01-115C, 00-703C, 00-697C, 00-440C, 99-447C, 98-621C, 98-614C, 98-488C, 98-486C, 98-485C, 98-484C, 98-483C, 98-474C, 98-154C and 98-126C). Response due: 8/20/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #054460. Answer due on 9/30/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 192 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?