DETROIT EDISON v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-cv-00926-MCW
District Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Detroit Edison Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Beau Bryan +1 202 616 8299 +1 202 307 2503 patrick.bryan@usdoj.gov
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/2/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, PROTO, SNF
  Entries (178) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 159 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
RESPONSE to [156] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Chu, Jack)
    LREF
    Legal Document 158 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008
    Joint MOTION For Entry Of Stipulated Orders Regarding Discovery Of Draft Expert Reports And Plaintiff's Review Of The Department Of Energy's "Record Information System" Database, filed by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY, USA.Response due by 9/19/2008.(Chu, Jack)
      LREF
      Legal Document 157 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Court Filing
      ORDER granting Defendant's [155] Motion for Extension of Time to file supplemental briefing on pending summary judgment motions Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
        LREF
        Legal Document 156 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
        MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
          LREF
          Legal Document 155 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008, Terminated: 9/2/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Briefing On The Pending Motions For Summary Judgment Regarding The Rate Of Spent Nuclear Fuel Acceptance And Greater Than Class C Waste, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Bryan, Patrick)
            LREF
            Legal Document 154 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Court Filing
            ORDER granting [153] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer due by 10/2/2008. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
              LREF
              Legal Document 153 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008, Terminated: 8/19/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/2/2008 to File Answer re [152] Amended Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 9/4/2008.(Bryan, Patrick)
                LREF
                Legal Document 152 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008
                AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT, filed by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY.. (Chu, Jack)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 151 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Court Filing
                  ORDER granting [150] Motion for Leave to File Amended and Supplemental Complaint Plaintiff shall formally file its amended and supplemental complaint no later than 10 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (pr1)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 150 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008, Terminated: 7/24/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File An Amended And Supplemental Complaint, filed by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY.Response due by 8/8/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (First Amended Complaint and Supplemental Complaint))(Chu, Jack)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 149 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Court Filing
                      ORDER granting [144] Defendant's Motion to defer consideration of Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 148 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008
                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [144] MOTION To Defer The Court's Consideration Of Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability, filed by USA. (Bryan, Patrick)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 147 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 Court Filing
                          ORDER granting [145] Motion To Schedule Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (pr1)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 146 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008
                            RESPONSE to [144] MOTION To Defer The Court's Consideration Of Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability, filed by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY.Reply due by 5/19/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Government's first document request))(Chu, Jack)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 145 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008, Terminated: 5/5/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                              Unopposed MOTION To Schedule Supplemental Briefing With Respect To The Pending Summary Judgment Motions Regarding The Rate Of Spent Nuclear Fuel Acceptance And Greater Than Class C Waste, filed by USA.Response due by 5/22/2008.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 144 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008, Terminated: 5/30/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                MOTION To Defer The Court's Consideration Of Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability, filed by USA.Response due by 5/5/2008.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008
                                  Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 4/4/2008 Before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams: A one-day Status Conference was held in which the current state of the proceeding was discussed. The Court lifted the stay and entered a scheduling order. Defendant was advised to inform the Court as to when it planned to file updates to its briefs regarding recent pertinent SNF-related decisions and any motion to stay consideration of the pending liability motions. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(pr1, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 143 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-33) held on April 4, 2008 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 142 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Beau Bryan for USA. (Bryan, Patrick)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008
                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines for proceeding held 4/4/2008. Transcript due from Heritage by 4/11/2008. (lld)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 141 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Court Filing
                                          ORDER LIFTING STAY Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 140 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Court Filing
                                            SCHEDULING ORDER:All Fact and Expert Discovery due by 10/1/2009. Joint Witness and Exhibit List due by 11/27/2009. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 10/30/2009. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/1/2009 10:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Trial set for 12/7/2009 - 12/18/2009 09:00 AM (place to be decided) before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 139 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Court Filing
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/4/2008 11:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 138 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008
                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY, USA. (Chu, Jack)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 137 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [136] Motion for Extension of Time JPSR due by 3/20/2008. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 136 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008, Terminated: 3/14/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/20/2008 to File The Parties' Joint Status Report, filed by USA.Response due by 3/31/2008.(Lester, Harold)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 135 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [134] Motion for Extension of Time JPSR due by 3/14/2008. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 134 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008, Terminated: 3/6/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/14/2008 to File The Parties' Joint Status Report, filed by USA.Response due by 3/24/2008.(Lester, Harold)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 133 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [132] Motion for Extension of Time JPSR due by 3/5/2008. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 132 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008, Terminated: 2/6/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/5/2008 to file Joint Status Report, filed by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY.Response due by 2/25/2008.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 131 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Court Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [130] Motion for Extension of Time Joint Status Report due by 2/6/2008 Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 130 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008, Terminated: 1/8/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until February 6, 2008 to to file Joint Status Report, filed by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY.Response due by 1/25/2008.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 129 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER Continuing Stay of Case Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2008 Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 128 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007
                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 127 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [126] Motion for Extension of Time Joint Status Report due by 6/29/2007 Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 126 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007, Terminated: 6/4/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/29/07 to File Joint Status Report, filed by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY.Response due by 6/18/2007.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 125 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [124] Motion to Continue Stay Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 124 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007, Terminated: 2/5/2007 Motion to Continue
                                                                            Joint MOTION to Continue Stay, filed by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY, USA.Response due by 2/20/2007.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 123 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER STAYING CASE Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 122 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/16/2006
                                                                                RESPONSE to Supplemental Brief in Response to the Court's Order of December 20, 2005, filed by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 121 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/16/2006
                                                                                  RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief, filed January 27, 2006, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 120 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006
                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: [116] Order, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix)(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 119 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006
                                                                                      RESPONSE to The Court's Order Of December 20, 2005, filed by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Colonnello declaration))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 118 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting [117] Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 117 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006, Terminated: 1/20/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/27/2006 to File The Parties' Supplemental Briefs In Response To The Court's Order Dated December 20, 2005, And An Enlargement To 2/16/2006 To File Their Simultaneous Reply Briefing, filed by USA. Response due by 2/6/2006. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 116 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER requesting supplemental briefing. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Simultaneous Supplemental Pleadings due by 1/20/2006; and simultaneous responses (replies) by 2/9/2006. (hw1, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 115 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Yee-Chieh Chu (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 114 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/8/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [113]Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 113 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005, Terminated: 2/8/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Supplement To Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability And Response In Opposition To Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment Upon Counts I And II Of Plaintiff's Complaint by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY. Response due by 2/14/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Letter from Zabransky to Kirkland received 12/1/04))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 112 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part [99] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jk1, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 111 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part [99] Motion for E-mail Preservation Order. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jk1, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 110 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004
                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [96] CROSS MOTION to [79] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004
                                                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 10/29/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 109 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting [108] Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to [96] CROSS MOTION to [79] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY (until 10/29/04). Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, ) Modified on 10/27/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 108 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004, Terminated: 10/26/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [103] Response to [96] CROSS MOTION to [79] Motion for Summary Judgment,until 10/29/04, by USA. Response due by 11/8/2004 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 10/26/2004 to clarify docket text. (dls).
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 107 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [106] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to [96] CROSS MOTION to [79] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY (until 10/20/2004) Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, ) Modified on 9/27/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004
                                                                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 10/20/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 106 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004, Terminated: 9/27/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [96] CROSS MOTION to [79] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY, [103] Response to Motion,until 10/20/2004, by USA. Response due by 10/8/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 105 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Appendix Using Electronic Documents Exceeding 1 Megabyte by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY. Response due by 9/27/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Appendix Part I - pages 1-49# (2) Appendix Appendix Part II p50-99# (3) Appendix Appendix Pt III p100-147)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 104 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [97] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY filed by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 103 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [96] CROSS MOTION to [79] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY filed by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY. Reply due by 9/23/2004. (Herzfeld, Daniel) Modified on 9/10/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004
                                                                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Response due by 9/9/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 102 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [100] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [96] CROSS MOTION to [79] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY, [97] Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg, ) Modified on 9/3/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 101 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [99] MOTION for Protective Order and E-mail Preservation Order filed by USA. Reply due by 9/13/2004. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 100 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004, Terminated: 9/2/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [96] CROSS MOTION to [79] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY, [97] Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY. Response due by 9/16/2004 (Herzfeld, Daniel) Modified on 8/31/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 99 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004, Terminated: 11/8/2004 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Protective Order and E-mail Preservation Order by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY. Response due by 8/30/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exh 1 - Proposed Agreement and Protective Order# (2) Exhibit Exh 2 - Proposed E-Mail Preservation Order)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 98 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [80] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 97 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004
                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 96 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004
                                                                                                                                        CROSS MOTION to [79] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY by USA. Response due by 8/30/2004 (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12) # (13) # (14) # (15) # (16) # (17) # (18) # (19) # (20) # (21) # (22) # (23) # (24) # (25) # (26) # (27) # (28) # (29) # (30) # (31) # (32) # (33) # (34) # (35) # (36) # (37) # (38) # (39) # (40) # (41) # (42))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 95 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/27/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [94] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [79] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability, [80] Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact, (until July 28, 2004). Response due by 7/28/2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg, ) Modified on 7/27/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/27/2004
                                                                                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Response due by 7/28/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 94 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004, Terminated: 7/27/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                            Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [79] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability, [80] Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact, (until July 28, 2004) by USA. Response due by 8/12/2004 (Snyder, Sharon) Modified on 7/26/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 93 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [92] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [79] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability, (until 7/26/04). Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg, ) Modified on 7/19/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004
                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Response due by 7/26/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 92 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004, Terminated: 7/19/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [79] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability, (until 7/26/04) by USA. Response due by 8/2/2004 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 7/19/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 91 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004
                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY, USA. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 90 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [88] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time of the Joint Status Report to 7/8/2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dy1, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 89 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [87] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [79] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability, (until 7/16/2004). Response due by 7/16/2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg, ) Modified on 6/30/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Response due by 7/16/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 88 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004, Terminated: 6/30/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/8/2004 to file Status Report by USA. Response due by 7/15/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 87 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004, Terminated: 6/29/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [79] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability,until 7/16/2004, by USA. Response due by 7/12/2004 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 6/28/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 86 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 18, 2004 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 85 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting Parties' Motion for Extension of Time until June 28, 2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 84 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [82] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg, ) Modified on 6/16/2004 for punctuation (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/28/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 83 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004
                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY, USA. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 82 Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: 6/10/2004, Terminated: 6/16/2004 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Its Cross-Motion For Partial Summary Judgment On The Acceptance Rate by 20 pages by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY. Response due by 6/28/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Reply in Support of Cross-Motion on Acceptance Rate)# (2) Exhibit B (A. Tomaszczuk Letter, 11-2-01)# (3) Exhibit C (B. Banes Letter, 11-8-01))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 80 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004
                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 79 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY. Response due by 6/28/2004 (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 81 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                APPENDIX to [78] Dft's Supplemental Brief by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 5/27/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 78 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: [12] Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Counts I and II of plaintiff's complaint (rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance) by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 77 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's Supplemental Pleadings due by 5/27/2004. Plaintiff's Reply due by 6/10/2004. Plaintiff's Dispositive Motion(s)due by 5/28/2004. Defendant's Response due by 6/25/2004. Plaintiff's Reply due by 7/14/2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/18/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams: Status Conference. (teg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 76 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/18/2004 02:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dy1,)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 75 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [73] Order regarding pre-discovery conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 74 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 73 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER for parties to submit case discovery reports by April 23 and to appear before Judge Sypolt for pre-discovery conference on April 30, 2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (teg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Parties Discovery Report(s) due by 4/23/2004. Pre-Discovery Conference set for 4/30/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 72 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES [65] Dft's Second Motion to Renew its Motion toConsolidate as well as its previous motions relating to consolidation. The Court further LIFTS THE STAY of the remainder of the cases to which the Order of 4/16/2003, applied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket this Order in this case with an entry noting the same on the dockets of the remaining SNFcases captioned in Dft's instant motion, with a courtesy copy to all SNF parties and presiding SNF judges of the Court. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Counsel for Dft's Change of Telephone and Facsimile Numbers by USA. Service: 12/2/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          [NUNC PRO TUNC] REPLY to Pltfs' Responses to [65] Dft's Second MOTION to the Chief Judge to Renew Consideration of Dft's Motion to Consolidate, filed by USA. Service: 9/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: [68] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Responses to [65] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, is GRANTED NUNC PRO TUNC, and the Clerk is directed to accept Dft's Reply for filing this 11th day of September, 2003. Reply due by 9/3/2003. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003, Terminated: 9/11/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Response to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA.Service: 9/3/03. Response due by 9/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to the Chief Judge for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C]Service: 8/26/03. Response due by 9/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 66 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Rule 40.1(c) of the RCFC, which permits the Chief Judge to reassign any case if necessary for the efficient administration of justice, the Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign the above captioned case to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Judge Christine O. C. Miller no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION to [65] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate filed by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY. [Original document located in Case No. 98-483C] Reply due by 8/29/2003. Service: 8/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/15/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Dft's Motion to the Chief Judge for Leave to Correct Certificate of Service and to Waive Requirements of RCFC 5.3 Regarding "Dft's Second Motion [to the Chief Judge] to Renew its Motion to Consolidate." (Original Motion located in Case No. 98-126C) (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SECOND MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate by USA. [COPY] (Original Document in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 7/29/03 by hand. Response due by 8/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES. Service: 7/11/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [62] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Status Report. Dft shall file its Status Report by 7/11/2003. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/3/2003, Terminated: 7/3/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/11/03 to file Its Portion of the Parties' Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES.Service: 7/1/03. Response due by 7/18/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/27/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [60] Motion for Extension of Time. Dft shall file its Status Report by July 1, 2003.Status Report due by 7/1/2003 Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003, Terminated: 6/26/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/1/03 to file Its Portion of the Parties' Joint Status Report Pursuant to the Court's Order, Dated April 17, 2003 by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/24/03. Response due by 7/11/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/25/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by DETROIT EDISON COMPANY. Service: 6/24/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003 Order on Motion for ClarificationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [57] Motion for Clarification. Paragraph 4 of the order entered on April 17, 2003, is vacated only with respect to the second sentence. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003, Terminated: 5/6/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Clarification (of 4/17/03 Order) by THE DETROIT EDISON COMPANY.Service: 5/2/03. Response due by 5/19/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLISHED OPINION. It is ORDERED, as follows: (1) Defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED only insofar as it relates to plaintiff's claim that its vested contact rights were taken. Defendant's motion is otherwise DENIED, without prejudice; and (2) This case remains STAYED pursuant to the Chief Judge's order of 4/16/03, and this court's order of 4/17/03. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 54 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT ORDER. Parties shall file a joint Status Report within 10 days of a decision, or in the event that no decision, etc., regarding issues on the motions referred to in paragrapgh 1 by 7/11/2003, or the motion referred to in paragragh 2 by 6/10/03. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re [19] Cross Motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance (together with a separate appendix) filed by The United States. Reply due by 4/25/2003. Service: 4/11/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [49] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by The United States. Service: 4/11/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike portions of plaintiff's filings concerning the rate of acceptance of spent Nuclear fuel by The United States.Service: 4/11/03 by hand. Response due by 4/25/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003, Terminated: 4/14/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Reply Brief by 30 pages by The United States.Service by hand: 4/11/03. Response due by 4/25/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [26-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Service: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response by USA to [34-1] proposed findings by DETROIT EDISON. Service: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [44-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003, Terminated: 3/11/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 3/10/03) For leave to exceed the page limitation in the reply to the motion for partial summary judgment. Response due: 3/27/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: See order [612-1] dated 3/7/03, in case 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 2/14/03) to renew consideration of "The United States' Motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc." . Response due: 3/3/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [37-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of the motion to renew consideration of "The United States' motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases, etc. (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [39-1] motion for Leave to remove filings from under seal (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003, Terminated: 3/3/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by DETROIT EDISON (Service: 2/27/03) for Leave to remove filings from under seal . Response due: 3/17/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-236C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003, Terminated: 3/4/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 2/21/03) for Leave to file a copy of the motion to renew consideration of "The United States' motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases, etc. . Response due: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE, with appendix, by DETROIT EDISON (Service: 2/3/03) to [26-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Reply due: 2/20/03. FILED UNDER SEAL. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response by DETROIT EDISON to [25-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 2/3/03. FILED UNDER SEAL. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by DETROIT EDISON. Service: 2/3/03. FILED UNDER SEAL. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [32-1] motion for Leave to Place Filings Under Seal Temporarily (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003, Terminated: 2/6/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by DETROIT EDISON (Service : 2/3/03 ) for Leave to Place Filings Under Seal Temporarily. Response due: 2/20/03 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/11/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [7-1] motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim. Service: 1/30/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: (1) Defendant shall file its reply on the takings claims by Notice of Compliance deadline of 1/30/03 ; (2) Defendant shall file its reply on the Greater-Than-Class-C radioactive waste claim by 3/11/30; and (3) Defendant shall file its reply to plaintiff's cross-motion regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance by 4/11/03 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [27-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion and reply to the motion to dismiss. Service: 1/22/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by DETROIT EDISON (Service: 1/15/03) to [27-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion and reply to the motion to dismiss. Reply due: 1/30/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/03) to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion and reply to the motion to dismiss until ? Response due: 1/21/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/11/2003 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 1/3/03 ) for Partial Summary Judgment , together with a separate appendix (filed by leave of the Judge). Response due: 2/3/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/11/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/3/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [22-1] motion for Leave to place filing under seal temporarily (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Extend Time within which to reply to response to motion for summary judgment . Reply to Response to Motion reset to 1/10/03 for [12-1] motion for Summary Judgment on counts I and II of the complaint ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/3/2003, Terminated: 1/6/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by DETROIT EDISON (Service : 12/30/02 ) for Leave to place filing under seal temporarily . Response due: 1/13/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002, Terminated: 12/30/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 12/23/02 ) to Extend Time within which to reply to response to motion for summary judgment , (until January 10, 2003). Response due: 1/10/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response by DETROIT EDISON to [11-1] proposed findings by USA Service: 12/19/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 Cross Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CROSS MOTION by DETROIT EDISON ( Service: 12/19/02 ) and RESPONSE to [12-1] motion for Summary Judgment on counts I and II of the complaint by USA (together with a separate appendix). Response due: 1/20/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [17-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation for its opposition to Defendant's motion for parital summary judgment (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by DETROIT EDISON. Service: 12/19/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; Response to [19-1] cross motion reset to 1/21/03 . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002, Terminated: 12/23/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by DETROIT EDISON (Service : 12/19/02 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation for its opposition to Defendant's motion for parital summary judgment. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by DETROIT EDISON (Service: 12/10/02 ) to [7-1] motion to Dismiss (Count III) for failure to state a claim Reply due: 12/27/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: 12/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the motion to dismiss Response to [7-1] motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim due 12/10/02 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002, Terminated: 12/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by DETROIT EDISON (Service: 11/25/02) to Extend Time to respond to the motion to dismiss until 12/10/02. Response due: 12/12/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION, with appendix, by USA (Service: 11/21/02) for Summary Judgment on counts I and II of the complaint . Response due: 12/23/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 11/21/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [9-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: 11/23/2002, Terminated: 11/25/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 11/21/02 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation iregarding motion for summary judgment upon Count I and II of plaintiff's complaint. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 10/31/02 (JPSR due 12/23/02). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 10/29/02) to Dismiss for failure to state a claim . Response due: 11/26/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. reset Answer deadline to 10/31/02 ( signed by the Clerk ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002, Terminated: 10/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 9/30/02) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to October 31, 2002). (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr.. Service: 9/30/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O. C. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 Notice of Indirectly Related Case(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice by DETROIT EDISON of indirectly related cases. (Case Nos.: 02-898C, 01-551C, 01-249C, 01-116C, 01-115C, 00-703C, 00-697C, 00-440C, 99-447C, 98-621C, 98-614C, 98-488C, 98-486C, 98-485C, 98-484C, 98-483C, 98-474C, 98-154C and 98-126C). Response due: 8/23/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #054499. Answer due on 10/1/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 175 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?