HOFFMAN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-cv-00932-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo STEVEN A. HOFFMAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stan R. Singleton +1 316 788 5593
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Hamilton Williamson +1 703 712 5087 +1 703 712 5280 jwilliamson@mcguirewoods.com
Office COFC
Filed 8/5/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $10000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 7/14/2003
Origin
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003
JUDGMENT in favor of the Defendant on the Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record. (bb1, )
    LREF
    Blank 14 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 Court Filing
    ORDER directing the Clerk to dismiss the case. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (bb1, )
      LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Administrative RecordCourt Filing
      ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by The United States. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/13/03.(hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
        MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), ro, in the alternative, for judgment upon the Administrative Record (and Appendix) by The United States. Filed by leave of the Judge.Service: 12/19/02. Response due by 6/13/2003 (hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
          STATEMENT OF FACTS by The United States,filed by leave of the Judge.Service: 12/19/02.(hw1, )
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
            ORDER granting [9] Motion for Leave to File Administrative Record Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (hw1, )
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002, Terminated: 5/13/2003 Terminated:
              MOTION by USA (Service : 12/19/02 ) for Leave to File administrative record. Response due: 1/6/03 (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to answer the complaint Answer to complaint due 12/19/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002, Terminated: 12/12/2002 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service: 12/9/02) to Extend Time to answer the complaint until 12/19/02. Response due: 12/26/02. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 11/13/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Hamilton Williamson. Service: 11/8/02. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT filed. Copies (5) to defendant. Answer due on 12/9/02 (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER directing the Clerk to file plaintiff's response to the show cause order and his complaint despite his failure to comply with the RCFC. ( signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (DS) Modified on 11/05/2002
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/17/2002 Order on Motion for Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. Show Cause Response due: 10/4/02 for STEVEN A. HOFFMAN (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 Court Filing
                            Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn. Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002
                              Record transferred from the U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas, case number 01-CV-1435, consisting of 1 volume. Notice to parties. (Amended complaint due by 9/3/02). (FE)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 185 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?