HOOKER, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-vv-00472-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2017 at 7:46 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BRIAN HOOKER, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Shoemaker and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clifford John Shoemaker +1 703 281 6395 +1 703 281 5807 cliff@attorneyaccess.net
No Logo MARCIA HOOKER, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Shoemaker and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clifford John Shoemaker +1 703 281 6395 +1 703 281 5807 cliff@attorneyaccess.net
No Logo STEVEN R. HOOKER, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Shoemaker and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clifford John Shoemaker +1 703 281 6395 +1 703 281 5807 cliff@attorneyaccess.net
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ann Kathleen Donohue +1 202 353 7832 +1 202 616 4310 ann.donohue@usdoj.gov
Space Katherine Carr Esposito +1 202 514 9729 +1 202 616 4310 katherine.esposito@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/10/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 469 - Injury - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (135) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: 6/7/2016 Motion for Attorney Fees
MOTION for Attorney Fees , filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 6/24/2016. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: 5/19/2016 DECISION of Special Master
    DECISIONRedactions due by 6/2/2016 Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (dj) Copy to parties.
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/3/2015 Medical Literature
      MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #80-88] filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Table of Contents, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 80, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 81, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 82, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 83, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit 84, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit 85, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit 86, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit 87, # (10) Exhibit Exhibit 88)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Medical Literature
        MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #71-79] filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Table of Contents, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 71, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 72, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 73, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 74, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit 75, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit 76, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit 77, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit 78, # (10) Exhibit Exhibit 79)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015 Medical Literature
          MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #63-70] filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Table of Contents, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 63, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 64, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 65, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 66, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit 67, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit 68, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit 69, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit 70)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/10/2015 Order on Motion to Strike
            ORDER re [81] Motion to Strike. Respondent filed a "Motion to Strike" on January 22, 2015. I hereby decline to strike any material in the record. When I reach the causation issue in this case, I will give the material in question whatever weight I find to be appropriate under all of the circumstances of the case. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (tpj) Copy to parties.
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 Medical Literature
              MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #L through CCC] filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, NOTICE of Intent to File on Compact Disc pursuant to Vaccine General Order #13 filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES(Compact Disc due by 6/8/2015.). (Walters, Justine)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 Response
                RESPONSE to Petitioners' Status Report Concerning Unavailable Records, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Walters, Justine)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Compact Disc Received
                  Compact Disc Received by the Clerk's Office. (vw)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: 5/20/2015 Order
                    ORDER Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jtl) Copy to parties.
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: 5/18/2015 Medical Records
                      MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #62] filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Table of Contents, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 62)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None
                        ORDER granting 119 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Respondent's Response due by 7/25/2016. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jtl) Copy to parties. (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: 5/18/2015 Status Report
                          STATUS REPORT regarding ready for Hearing, filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None
                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until July 25, 2016 to File Response as to 117 MOTION for Attorney Fees , filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Response due by 7/11/2016. (Walters, Justine) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Status Report
                              STATUS REPORT regarding medical records, filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 118 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
                                PUBLIC DECISION (Originally filed: 05/19/2016) regarding 116 DECISION of Special Master Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (dj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: 5/12/2015 Medical Literature
                                  MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #61] filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Table of Contents, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 61)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Vaccine)
                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part [103] Motion for Extension of Time Petitioners' Medical records due by 5/15/2015. Petitioners' supplemental Expert Reports due by 5/18/2015. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jtl) Copy to parties.
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015, Terminated: 5/1/2015 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/15/2015 to file medical records , filed by BRIAN HOOKER.Response due by 5/18/2015. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: 4/7/2015 Medical Records
                                        MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #60] filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Table of Contents, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 60)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: 4/7/2015 Response to Motion
                                          RESPONSE to [81] MOTION to Strike & Response to Petitioners' Exhibit 19 , filed by BRIAN HOOKER.Reply due by 4/17/2015. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/2/2015 Reply to Response to Motion
                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [82] MOTION to Dismiss as Untimely Filed and Supplemental Respondent's Report , filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Walters, Justine)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 3/31/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Vaccine)
                                              ORDER granting [98] Motion for Extension of Time Petitioners' Response due by 4/7/2015. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jtl) Copy to parties.
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015, Terminated: 3/31/2015 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/7/2015 to file response to Respondent's Response to Petitioner's Allegations of Misconduct and Motion to Strike , filed by BRIAN HOOKER.Response due by 4/16/2015. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: 3/26/2015 Order
                                                  ORDER: Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (tpj) Copy to parties.
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/23/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Vaccine)
                                                    ORDER granting [94] Motion for Extension of Time Petitioners' Response due by 3/30/2015. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jtl) Copy to parties.
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/23/2015 Response to Motion
                                                      RESPONSE to [82] MOTION to Dismiss as Untimely Filed and Supplemental Respondent's Report , filed by BRIAN HOOKER.Reply due by 4/2/2015. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/23/2015, Terminated: 3/23/2015 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/3/2015 to file response to Respondent's Response to Petitioner's Allegations of Misconduct and Motion to Strike , filed by BRIAN HOOKER.Response due by 4/9/2015. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: 3/20/2015 Medical Literature
                                                          MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #58-59] filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Table of Contents, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 58, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 59)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: 3/18/2015 Scheduling Order
                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER :Petitioners' Medical records due by 5/1/2015. Petitioners' Expert Report(s) Due by 5/18/2015 Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jtl) Copy to parties.
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank  Status Conference
                                                              Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 3/17/2015 before Special Master George L. Hastings: Status Conference held on 3/17/2015. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR) (For parties in the case only, click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(jtl)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER (Non PDF): A status conference is set for 3/17/2015 at 3:00 PM EST in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master George L. Hastings. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (tpj) Copy to parties.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: 3/10/2015 Scheduling Order
                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER :Petitioners' Response due by 3/23/2015. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jtl) Copy to parties.
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: 3/9/2015 Amended Petition
                                                                    AMENDED PETITION re: [1] Petition, [22] Amended Petition filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: 3/9/2015 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/23/2015 to file response to Respondent's Response to Petitioner's Allegations of Misconduct and Motion to Strike , filed by BRIAN HOOKER.Response due by 3/26/2015. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: 2/24/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Vaccine)
                                                                        ORDER granting [87] Motion for Extension of Time Petitioners' Response due by 3/23/2015. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jtl) Copy to parties.
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: 2/23/2015, Terminated: 2/24/2015 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/23/2015 to file Response to Motion to Dismiss , filed by BRIAN HOOKER.Response due by 3/12/2015. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: 2/18/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Vaccine)
                                                                            ORDER granting [85] Motion for Extension of Time Petitioners' Response due by 3/9/2015. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jtl) Copy to parties.
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015, Terminated: 2/18/2015 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/9/2015 to Response to Respondent's Response to Petitioner's Allegations of Misconduct and Motion to Strike , filed by BRIAN HOOKER.Response due by 2/26/2015. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: 1/23/2015 Scheduling Order
                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER : Petitioners' Response due by 2/23/2015. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jtl) Copy to parties.
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: 1/22/2015 notice of filing
                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING Respondent's Expert Reports and Exhibits by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit C, # (2) Exhibit D, # (3) Exhibit E, # (4) Exhibit F, # (5) Exhibit G, # (6) Exhibit H, # (7) Exhibit I, # (8) Exhibit J, # (9) Exhibit K)(Daigneault, Justine)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: 1/22/2015 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss as Untimely Filed and Supplemental Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Response due by 2/9/2015. (Daigneault, Justine)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: 1/22/2015, Terminated: 6/10/2015 Motion to Strike
                                                                                      MOTION to Strike & Response to Petitioners' Exhibit 19, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Response due by 2/9/2015. (Daigneault, Justine)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: 12/9/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Vaccine)
                                                                                        ORDER granting [79] Motion for Extension of Time Respondent's Expert Report(s) due by 1/22/2015. Respondent's supplemental Rule 4(c) Report due by 1/22/2015. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jtl) Copy to parties.
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: 12/5/2014, Terminated: 12/9/2014 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
                                                                                          Second MOTION for Extension of Time until January 22, 2015 to file respondent's supplemental Rule 4(c) Report and expert reports , filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Response due by 12/22/2014. (Daigneault, Justine)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: 9/8/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Vaccine)
                                                                                            ORDER granting [77] Motion for Extension of Time Respondent's Expert Report(s) due by 12/8/2014. Respondents Rule 4(c) Report due by 12/8/2014. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jtl) Copy to parties.
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: 9/5/2014, Terminated: 9/8/2014 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until December 8, 2014 to file Respondent's Report and Medical Expert Reports , filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Response due by 9/22/2014. (Daigneault, Justine)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: 7/18/2014 Medical Records
                                                                                                MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #57] filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Table of Contents, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 57)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: 7/14/2014 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER : Respondent's Expert Report Due by 9/8/2014. Respondent's Report due by 9/8/2014. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jtl) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: 7/10/2014 Statement of Completion
                                                                                                    STATEMENT of Completion by BRIAN HOOKER. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: 7/10/2014 Medical Records
                                                                                                      MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #55-56] filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Table of Contents, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 55, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 56)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/2/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Vaccine)
                                                                                                        ORDER granting [71] Motion for Extension of Time Petitioners' Medical records and statement of completion due by 7/14/2014. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jtl) Copy to parties. (Main Document 72 replaced on 7/2/2014) (dls).
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: 6/30/2014, Terminated: 7/2/2014 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/14/14 to file all medical records , filed by BRIAN HOOKER.Response due by 7/17/2014. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: 6/26/2014 Medical Records
                                                                                                            MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #53-54] filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Table of Contents, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 53, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 54)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: 6/18/2014 Medical Records
                                                                                                              MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #50-52] filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Table of Contents, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 50, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 51, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 52)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: 6/18/2014 Medical Literature
                                                                                                                MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #49] filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Table of Contents, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 49)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: 5/29/2014 Order
                                                                                                                  ORDER All medical records and Statement of Completion due by 6/30/2014. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (dlb) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: 5/28/2014 Medical Records
                                                                                                                    MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #48] filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Table of Contents, # (2) Exhibit EXH48-NW Integrative Medicine)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: 5/28/2014 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/30/2014 to file medical records , filed by BRIAN HOOKER.Response due by 6/16/2014. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: 5/28/2014 Status Report
                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT in Response to Court's Order, filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: 5/16/2014 Medical Records
                                                                                                                          MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #42-47] filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Table of Contents, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 42, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 43, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 44, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 45, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit 46, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit 47)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: 5/13/2014 Medical Records
                                                                                                                            MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #34-41] filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Table of Contents, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 34, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 35, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 36, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 37, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit 38, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit 39, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit 40, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit 41)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: 4/28/2014 Order on Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [60] Motion to Amend Schedule Due dates for Respondents Rule 4 report and expert report are suspended. Petitioners' medical records, statement of comepletion and Status Report due by 5/28/2014 Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jtl) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: 4/22/2014, Terminated: 4/28/2014 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [59] Scheduling Order, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Response due by 5/9/2014. (Daigneault, Justine)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: 4/21/2014 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER : Respondent's Expert Report Due by 6/18/2014 Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jtl) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: 4/18/2014 Expert Report
                                                                                                                                    EXPERT REPORT of Dr. Mary Megson (Ex. no. 32-33) filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Table of Contents, # (2) Exhibit EXH32-Expert Report of Dr. Mary Megson, # (3) Exhibit EXH33-CV of Dr. Mary Megson)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: 3/18/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Vaccine)
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part [56] Motion for Extension of Time Petitioners' Expert Report due by 4/18/2014. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jtl) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: 3/17/2014, Terminated: 3/18/2014 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/19/2014 to file Expert Report from Dr. Kendall , filed by BRIAN HOOKER.Response due by 4/3/2014. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Vaccine)
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [55] Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioners' Expert Report due by 3/17/2014. (NON-PDF Order). Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jam) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: 1/16/2014, Terminated: 1/17/2014 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/17/2014 to file Dr. Kendall Expert Report , filed by BRIAN HOOKER.Response due by 2/3/2014. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Vaccine)
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [53] Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioners' Expert Report due by 1/16/2014. (Non-PDF Order). Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jam) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: 12/16/2013 Order
                                                                                                                                                ORDER amending caption. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (dlb) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: 12/12/2013, Terminated: 12/18/2013 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/16/2014 to file Expert Report from Dr. Francis Kendall , filed by BRIAN HOOKER.Response due by 12/30/2013. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/20/2013 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners' Expert Report due by 12/16/2013. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jam) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 11/15/2013, ended on 11/15/2013, before Special Master George L. Hastings: Status Conference held on 11/15/2013. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR) (For parties in the case only, click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(dlb)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: 11/7/2013 Medical Records
                                                                                                                                                        MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #31] filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Table of Contents, # (2) Exhibit EXH31-Declaration of James M. Love)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013 Order
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re Vaccine Rule 16(b)Notice of Compliance due by 11/18/2013. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (dlb) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER (Non PDF): Status Conference set for 11/15/2013 11:00 AM in Special Master's Office before Special Master George L. Hastings. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (dlb) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: 10/8/2013 Expert Report
                                                                                                                                                              EXPERT REPORT of Dr. Janet Kern (Ex. no. 30) filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Table of Contents, # (2) Exhibit EXH30-Additional Report from Dr. Janet Kern)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013 Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [47] Motion to Stay Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jtl) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013, Terminated: 10/7/2013 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Stay , filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Response due by 10/24/2013. (Matanoski, Vincent)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 Expert Report
                                                                                                                                                                    EXPERT REPORT of Reports from Dr. Kern, Dr. Haley and Dr. Smith (Ex. no. 25-29) filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Table of Contents, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 25, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 26, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 27, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 28, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit 29)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 Expert Report
                                                                                                                                                                      EXPERT REPORT of Dr. Mark Geier and David Geier (Ex. no. 21-24) filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Table of Contents, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 21, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 22, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 23, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 24)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 Medical Records
                                                                                                                                                                        MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #19-20] filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Table of Contents, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 19 -- Part 1, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 19 -- Part 2, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 19 -- Part 3, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 19 -- Part 4, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit 19 -- Part 5, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit 19 -- Part 6, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit 20)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [40] MOTION to Dismiss and Response to Petitioners' Expert Report , filed by BRIAN HOOKER.Reply due by 10/15/2013. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER:Petitioners shall file, by no later than October 4, 2013: 1) a Reply to Respondent's Response to Petitioners' Expert Report and Motion to Dismiss; 2) an expert report from Dr. Smith, a report from another expert, and/or a supplemental expert report from Dr. Geier; and 3) a statement of Dr. Geier specifying up to ten articles from Dr. Geier's List of References. A Status Conference set for 10/16/2013 11:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master George L. Hastings. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jam) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Daigneault, Justine)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 9/4/2013, ended on 9/4/2013, before Special Master George L. Hastings: Status Conference held on 9/4/2013. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR) (For parties in the case only, click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: 8/20/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss and Response to Petitioners' Expert Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Response due by 9/6/2013. (Daigneault, Justine)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: 6/27/2013 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent's Response to Petitioner's Expert Report is due by 8/20/2013. Petitioner's Statement from Dr. Geier is due by 9/4/2013. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 9/4/2013 at 11:00 AM. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jam) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 6/20/2013 before Special Master George L. Hastings: Status Conference held on 6/20/2013. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR) (For parties in the case only, click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(jtl)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER (Non PDF): Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/20/2013 at 11:00 AM in Special Master's Office before Special Master George L. Hastings. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (dlb) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: 6/11/2013 Motion for Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Status Conference re [36] Expert Report , MOTION to Amend Schedule re: Scheduling Order,, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Response due by 6/28/2013. (Daigneault, Justine)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER (Non PDF) Petitioners filed [36] an Expert Report on June 6, 2013. Accordingly, respondent's Expert Report and supplemental "Rule 4 report" are due by 7/22/2013. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jam) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: 6/6/2013 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT regarding references, filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: 6/6/2013 Expert Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                EXPERT REPORT of Dr. Mark Geier (Ex. no. 17-18) filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Table of Contents, # (2) Exhibit EXH17-Report of Dr. Mark Geier, # (3) Exhibit EXH18-Reference List)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: 5/6/2013 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT regarding expert report, filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: 3/4/2013 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT regarding expert report, filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT regarding status of obtaining an expert report, filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: 12/6/2012 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER : A Petitioners' Status Report is due on 2/6/2013 and 4/8/2013. Petitioners' Expert Report is due by no later than 6/6/2013. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jam) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: 11/5/2012 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT regarding status of obtaining an expert report, filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: 9/4/2012 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT regarding status of obtaining an expert report, filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: 7/5/2012 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT regarding expert report, filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT regarding Expert Report, filed by STEVEN R. HOOKER. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: 3/5/2012 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT regarding expert report, filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: 1/3/2012 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT regarding status of obtaining expert report, filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: 11/2/2011 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT regarding status of obtaining expert report, filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: 8/15/2011 Status Conference Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (dlb) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 8/2/2011, ended on 8/2/2011, held before Special Master George L. Hastings: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/2/2011. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR) (For parties in the case only, click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(jtl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Justine Elizabeth Daigneault for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.. (Daigneault, Justine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Amended Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED PETITION re: [1] Petition filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: 6/20/2011 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/20/2011 to file Amended Petition, filed by BRIAN HOOKER.Response due by 7/7/2011. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: 5/19/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: If petitioners wishes to proceed, petitioners shall file, within thirty days of the date of this Order, an amended petition that is fully compliant with ยง 300aa-11(c) and which clearly explains the theory of vaccine causation in this case. Failure to file a timely response to this Order will lead to dismissal of this claim. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (tpj) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Carr Esposito for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.. (Esposito, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES RESPONDENTS STATEMENT REGARDING JURISDICTION AND APPROPRIATENESS OF PROCEEDING WITHIN THE COURTS OMNIBUS AUTISM PROCEEDING. (Esposito, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #16] filed by BRIAN HOOKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Table of Contents# (2) Exhibit EXH16-Byron Burrup, M.D.)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Compact Disc Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Compact Disc Received by the Clerk's Office re [16] Notice of Filing on Compact Disc. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Compact Disc Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Compact Disc Received by the Clerk's Office re [16] Notice of Filing on Compact Disc. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING on Compact Disc pursuant to Vaccine General Order #12 filed by BRIAN HOOKER.Compact Disc due by 9/14/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Table of Contents)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [12] Motion for leave to electronically file Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [11] Motion to Issue Subpoena Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to file electronically , filed by STEVEN R. HOOKER, BRIAN HOOKER, MARCIA HOOKER. Service: 12/02/05 by hand. Response due by 12/16/2005. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Issue Subpoena , filed by STEVEN R. HOOKER, BRIAN HOOKER, MARCIA HOOKER. Service: 12/02/05 by hand. Response due by 12/16/2005. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 Notice Regarding Statutory Requirement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: the statutory 420-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (jmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - upon the request of petitioners' counsel, the Formal Notice previously filed is hereby withdrawn. Proceedings are suspended--and, thus, the final due date for the special master's decision is formally suspended--for an indefinite period of time, but no longer than 180 days. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 240-day time period for special master's decision. ( signed by Special Master George L. Hastings Jr. ) Copy to parties. (DAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 8/9/2002, Entered: 8/13/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by HHS. Service: 8/9/02. (NN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER reassigning this case to Special Master George L. Hastings Jr. Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by HHS. Service: 7/16/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/6/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Ann Kathleen Donohue. Service: 6/6/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: Petitioner's in this case may delay indefinitely the filing of the medical records relating to this case until the court determines a procedure for resolving the general "causation" issue involved(signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF assignment to Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PETITION by STEVEN R. HOOKER, BRIAN HOOKER and MARCIA HOOKER, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #053883, Vac. Date: 2/25/99 (Respondent's report due 8/8/02). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 1,216 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?