WILLIAMS, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-vv-00476-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DARNEL WARREN, SR., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Winand Thomas +1 504 525 2256
No Logo KRYSTILYNN WILLIAMS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Winand Thomas +1 504 525 2256
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda Sara Renzi +1 202 616 4133 linda.renzi@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/15/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Dismissed by Special Master
County
Terminated 9/12/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 24 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 Order
ORDER regarding motion for attorney's fees, attorney's costs and personal expenses. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
    LREF
    Blank 23 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that the petition is dismissed. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 22 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 DECISION of Special Master
      DECISION Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (jat, )
        LREF
        Blank 21 Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Order
        FINAL ORDER BEFORE INVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL The special master enlarges to August 1, 2003, petitioners' time within which to file affidavits from all potential fact witnesses and a medical expert's opinion that meets the intent of the special master's March 31, 2003 order. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (jmm, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
          Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Expert Report due by 8/1/2003. (jmm, )
            LREF
            Blank 20 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 3/31/2003
            SCHEDULING ORDER:Expert Report due by 7/3/2003.Affidavits from all potential fact witnesses due 5/9/2003. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (jmm, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 3/31/2003
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards : Telephone Conference held on 03/27/03. (abb, )
                LREF
                Blank 19 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003 Order
                ORDER a rule 5 conference is scheduled for 3/27/03 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (jat, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 18 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003 Respondent's Report
                  Respondent's Report by The Secretary of Health and Human Services.Service: 03/14/03. (jmm, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 17 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE of Election to Remain Before the Special Master by KRYSTILYNN WILLIAMS, DARNEL WARREN SR. Service: 2/18/03 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 16 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 Order
                      ORDER date Respondent's Report due to 3/14/03 ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 15 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Order
                        ORDER re expiration of 240-day time period. ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (DAL)
                          LREF
                          Blank 14 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Status Report
                          STATUS REPORT by HHS. Service: 2/6/03 (VO)
                            LREF
                            Blank 13 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Order
                            ORDER Parties medical records or a joint mootion for the issuance of a subpoena is due 1/10/03 (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 12 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Status Report
                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by HHS. Service: 12/13/02. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 11 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 Status Report/Order
                                STATUS REPORT ORDER. Parties outstanding documents or a joint Status report due 12/11/02 (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copyto parties. (LTD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Status Report
                                  STATUS REPORT by HHS. Service: 11/1/02. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 9 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Status Report/Order
                                    STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status report due 10/25/02 (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 8 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/10/2002 Order
                                      ORDER setting telephonic Status Conference for 3:00 p.m. 9/16/02 (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 Additional Documentation
                                        Additional Documentation of medical records by KRYSTILYNN WILLIAMS, DARNEL WARREN SR. Service: 7/29/02. (NN)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002
                                          ORDER Petitioner's documents or an affidavit due 8/16/02 (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002
                                            Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $185 and RECEIPT #054197. ($35 handling fee also charged for returned check) (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 Status Report
                                              Joint STATUS REPORT by HHS, DARNEL WARREN SR. Service: 6/14/02 (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: 5/24/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Linda Sara Renzi. Service: 5/23/02. (LTD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 Status Report/Order
                                                  STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due 5/31/02 and Respondent shall enter a notice of appearance expeditiously (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copyto parties. (LTD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002
                                                    NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master John F. Edwards. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002
                                                      PETITION by KRYSTILYNN WILLIAMS and DARNEL WARREN SR., FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #053899, Vac. Date: 10/10/01 ( Respondent's report due 8/13/02). (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002
                                                        CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 145 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?