STEVENS, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-vv-01223-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CORINTHIA SHALISE WATKINS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert William Hammer +1 817 332 8266
No Logo RANI STEVENS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert William Hammer +1 817 332 8266
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark William Rogers +1 202 616 4122 mark.rogers2@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/19/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $250000
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Dismissed by Special Master
County
Terminated 9/4/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded attorneys' fees and costs in the amount of $6,159.22 ($5,625.00 in fees and $534.22 in costs). This award shall be made payable jointly to petitioner and her attorney. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 21 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004 DECISION of Special Master - Fees
    DECISION on Attorney's Fees and Costs Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
      LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004, Terminated: 8/6/2004 Motion for Attorney Fees
      MOTION for Attorney Fees by RANI STEVENS, CORINTHIA SHALISE WATKINS.Service: 5/28/04. Response due by 6/14/2004 (tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004 Scheduling Order
        SCHEDULING ORDER:Petitioners shall file any request for attorneys' fees and costs by 6/4/2004. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
          LREF
          Blank 18 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of Appearance by Mark William Rogers for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 10/31/03.(jmm, )
            LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Judgment*
            JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that the petition is dismissed. (lld, )
              LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/29/2003 Order on Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1)
              ORDER granting [15] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (jmm, )
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: 6/21/2003, Terminated: 6/20/2003 Terminated:
                MOTION to Dismiss by RANI STEVENS, CORINTHIA SHALISE WATKINS.Service: 5/22/03. Response due by 6/16/2003 (jat, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 Notice Regarding Statutory Requirement
                  ORDER re: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (jat, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz : Telephone Conference held on 4-7-03. (cmh, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Status Report/Order
                      STATUS REPORT ORDER Petitioners' Status Report or motion to dismiss due by 5/7/2003. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (jat, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 12 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Respondent's Report
                        Respondent's Supplemental Report by The Secretary of Health and Human Services.Service: 04/03/03. (jmm, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 11 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003 Order
                          ORDER re: Petitioners counsel shall contact respondent's counsel re: initial status conference and contact the special masters office by 3/27/03. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (jmm, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 10 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 Respondent's Report
                            RESPONDENT'S REPORT Service: 3/7/03 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 Order
                              ORDER Respondent's Report due 3/10/03 (signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Petition
                                AMENDED PETITION by RANI STEVENS (Service: 12/11/02). (LTD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Status Report
                                  STATUS REPORT by RANI STEVENS. Service: 12/11/02. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 notice of filing
                                    Notice of filing Supplemental Medical Records by RANI STEVENS, CORINTHIA SHALISE WATKINS. Service: 12/2/02 (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Order
                                      ORDER Petitioner's medical records or a status report due 12/12/02 (signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Tami Coette Parker Service :10/22/02 (HW)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Set/Clear Flags
                                          **Not member of bar flag removed. (DS)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 3 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 Scheduling Order
                                            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Initial Status Conference set for: 11/4/02 (signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 2 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002
                                              NOTICE OF assignment to Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002
                                                PETITION by RANI STEVENS and CORINTHIA SHALISE WATKINS, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #054901, Vac. Date: 9/20/01 (Respondent's report due 12/18/02). (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002
                                                  **Not member of bar flag set (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002
                                                    CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 123 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?