MOREL, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-vv-01772-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BRITTANY MASHELL MOREL, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Maglio Christopher & Toale, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Altom M. Maglio +1 888 952 5242 +1 877 952 5042 amm@mctlawyers.com
No Logo KIM M. MOREL, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Maglio Christopher & Toale, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Altom M. Maglio +1 888 952 5242 +1 877 952 5042 amm@mctlawyers.com
No Logo L. PAUL MOREL, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Maglio Christopher & Toale, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Altom M. Maglio +1 888 952 5242 +1 877 952 5042 amm@mctlawyers.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Voris Edward Johnson +1 202 616 4136 +1 202 616 4310 voris.johnson@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/3/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Judgment in Lump Sum
County
Terminated 10/31/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (78) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007
Errata Order correcting the undersigned's November 1, 2007 Decision on Attorney's Fees and Costs and directing the clerk to amend judgment accordingly. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (cc2, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007
    NOTICE of Appearance by Voris Edward Johnson for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.. (Johnson, Voris)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007
      *** Attorney Catherine Palmer Shonk terminated. (tjk, )
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioners are awarded attorneys' fees and costs in the amount of $45,984.12, in addition to the October 31, 2007 judgment of compensation. James B. Pittman, Jr., P.C. firm may collect $12,500.00 from petitioner. Mr Maglio may collect $33,484.12 from petitioner. Petitioner may retain $82.49 for his out-of-pocket expenses. (lld)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007
          NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by L. PAUL MOREL re [64] DECISION of Special Master - Fees. (Maglio, Altom)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007
            DECISION on Attorney's Fees and Costs. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (cc2, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007
              Petitioner's Election to Accept [62] Judgment. (Maglio, Altom)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007
                JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioners are awarded compensation in the amount of $125,000.00 in the form of a check payable to petitioners as legal representatives of Brittany's estate. (lld)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007, Terminated: 11/1/2007 Motion for Attorney Fees
                  Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, filed by L. PAUL MOREL.Response due by 11/2/2007. (Maglio, Altom)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Palmer Shonk for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Shonk, Catherine)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                      *** Attorney Mark Curtis Raby terminated. (tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007
                        DECISION. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (cc2, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007
                          ORDER Striking [57] DECISION of Special Master. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (cc2, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                            [STRUCK] DECISION. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (cc2, ) Modified on 9/18/2007 (tjk, ).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007
                              STIPULATION for Award, filed by all parties. (Raby, Mark)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007
                                STATUS REPORT re Stipulation, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Raby, Mark)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007
                                  ORDER changing case caption. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (cc2, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007
                                    15-Week STIPULATION ORDER: Respondent shall, within 15 weeks, send petitioner(s) the joint stipulation and file a status report. Within 30 days after the receipt of the stipulation, the petitioner(s) shall file a status report. Within 15 days after receiving the stipulation from petitioner(s), the respondent shall file the signed stipulation.Respondents Status Report due by 7/27/2007. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (cc2, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007, Terminated: 10/31/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                      Unopposed MOTION Relief from Order re [48] Scheduling Order,, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Response due by 4/30/2007. (Raby, Mark)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007
                                        NOTICE OF INTENT to Remain in the Program by Petitioner. (Maglio, Altom)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007
                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Altom Michael Maglio. (Maglio, Altom)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007
                                            ORDER re: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (cc2, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent's Expert Reports due by 4/13/2007. On or before 4/27/2007, the parties shall contact chambers and propose three mutually agreeable dates for the next status conference in this matter occurring after 4/27/2007. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (cc2, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007
                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Expert Report due by 3/23/2007. On or before 4/13/007, the parties shall contact chambers and propose three mutually agreeable dates for the next status conference in this matter occurring after 4/13/2007. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (cc2, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER:Medical literature due by 12/22/2006. Expert Report due by 2/23/2007. Parties are to contact chambers on or before 3/2/2007 to schedule the next status conference in this matter. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (cc2, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith : A telephonic Status Conference was held on 12/5/2006 from 3:00 until 3:15 PM. Mr. Altom Maglio represented petitioner and Mr. Mark Raby represented respondent. (cc2, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006
                                                      MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #16-18] filed by BRITTANY MASHELL MOREL. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 16 Kaygusuz - 2001 - Afebrile convulsions# (2) Exhibit 17 Hernan - Recombinant hepatitis B# (3) Exhibit 18 Deisenhammer - Acute cerebellar ataxia after)(Maglio, Altom)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006
                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/5/2006 at 03:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (cc2, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006
                                                          EXPERT REPORT of Vincent Bonagura, M.D. (Ex. no. 14-15) filed by BRITTANY MASHELL MOREL. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 14 Expert report of Vincent Bonagura, MD# (2) Exhibit 15 CV of Bonagura, Vincent M.D.)(Maglio, Altom)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006
                                                            ORDER granting [41] Motion for Extension of Time Expert Report due by 11/27/2006. On or before 12/4/2006, the parties shall contact chambers to schedule the next status conference. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (cc2, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2006 (tjk, ).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006, Terminated: 11/15/2006 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until November 24, 2006 to file expert report, filed by BRITTANY MASHELL MOREL.Response due by 11/27/2006. (Maglio, Altom)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006
                                                                ORDER granting [39] Motion for Extension of Time Expert Report due by 11/9/2006. The parties shall contact the court to schedule a status conference on or before 11/27/2006. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (cc2, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006, Terminated: 10/27/2006 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until October 16, 2006 to to file expert's report, filed by BRITTANY MASHELL MOREL.Response due by 10/2/2006. (Maglio, Altom)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006
                                                                    ORDER granting [37] Motion for Extension of Time to file granted and petitioner's medical records due by 9/15/2006. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (cc2, )
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006, Terminated: 8/17/2006 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until September 15, 2006 to to file experts' reports, filed by BRITTANY MASHELL MOREL.Response due by 9/5/2006. (Maglio, Altom)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006
                                                                        MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #13] filed by BRITTANY MASHELL MOREL. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 13 - records from the Office of the Medical Examiner)(Maglio, Altom)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006
                                                                          STATUS REPORT OF JULY 18, 2006, filed by BRITTANY MASHELL MOREL. (Maglio, Altom)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006
                                                                            ORDER granting [33] Motion for Extension of Time to file expert report. Petitioner shall file a status report when the autopsy slides are received by petitioner and sent out for review. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (cc2, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006, Terminated: 6/19/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to filing medical expert report, filed by BRITTANY MASHELL MOREL.Response due by 7/3/2006. (Maglio, Altom)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006
                                                                                ORDER granting [29] Motion to Issue Subpoena for any and all medical records pertaining to Brittany Mashell Morel and microscopic slides of the autopsy that was performed on 12/15/2000. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (cc2, )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/6/2006, Terminated: 10/31/2007 Motion to Issue Subpoena
                                                                                  Amended MOTION to Issue Subpoena, filed by BRITTANY MASHELL MOREL.Response due by 6/23/2006. (Toale, Anne)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006
                                                                                    STATUS REPORT re sufficiency of records, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Raby, Mark)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006, Terminated: 6/7/2006 Motion to Issue Subpoena
                                                                                      MOTION to Issue Subpoena, filed by BRITTANY MASHELL MOREL.Response due by 6/19/2006. (Maglio, Altom)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006
                                                                                        ORDER. Notice of Compliance due by 6/1/2006. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (Campbell-Smith, Patricia)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006
                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Expert Report due by 6/16/2006. Notice of Compliance due by 7/21/2006. Status Conference set for 7/25/2006 at 02:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (als, )
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006
                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith : A telephonic Status Conference was held on 5/16/06 from 2:05 until 2:30 PM. Mr. Mark Raby represented respondent and Mr. Altom Maglio represented petitioner. (als, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006
                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/16/2006 at 02:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (als, )
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006
                                                                                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE.Pursuant to Vaccine Rule 3(c), the above-captioned case is reassigned to Special Master Patricia Campbell-Smith.Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tlj, )
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006
                                                                                                  NOTICE, filed by BRITTANY MASHELL MOREL of Firm Name Change. (Maglio, Altom)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006
                                                                                                    NOTICE, filed by BRITTANY MASHELL MOREL Certificate of Valid ECF Account. (Maglio, Altom)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (tjk, )
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                        ORDER granting [20] Motion for leave to file electronically Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005, Terminated: 12/8/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to file electronically , filed by L. PAUL MOREL, KIM M. MOREL, BRITTANY MASHELL MOREL. Service: 12/01/05. Response due by 12/19/2005. (tjk, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 9/5/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Curtis Raby for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 8/30/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004 Order Staying Case
                                                                                                              ORDER STAYING CASE Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004, Terminated: 10/31/2007 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented)
                                                                                                                Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney Altom M. Maglio in place of James B. Pittman, Jr. by BRITTANY MASHELL MOREL, KIM M. MOREL, L. PAUL MOREL.Service: 7/29/04. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004
                                                                                                                  ***Attorney Altom Michael Maglio for L. PAUL MOREL; BRITTANY MASHELL MOREL and KIM M. MOREL added. Attorney James Bradford Pittman terminated. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 Order Staying Case
                                                                                                                    ORDER STAYING CASE Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (jmm, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003
                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on November 13, 2003. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: 9/5/2003
                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on September 2, 2003. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/5/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/13/2003 11:00 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (jmm, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/28/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Paul and Kim Morel by BRITTANY MASHELL MOREL, KIM M. MOREL, L. PAUL MOREL, and MEDICAL RECORDS. Service: 7/21/03.(jat, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:The next Telephonic Status Conference will be on Tuesday, 9/2/2003 11:00 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING Santa Rosa County, Florida Sheriff's Office Report by BRITTANY MASHELL MOREL, KIM M. MOREL, L. PAUL MOREL. Service: 06/17/03.(jmm, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/29/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                  TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/22/2003 11:00 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jmm, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003
                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on June 18, 2003. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/18/2003 11:00 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Prior to the status conference, petitioners shall file police reports and medical records. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners shall provide respondent with autopsy slides and shall file results of tests/medical records by 6/18/2003. Petitioners' oral motion for issuance of subpoena is granted. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003
                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference was held on April 22, 2003. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Petition
                                                                                                                                            AMENDED PETITION against The Secretary of Health and Human Services , filed by BRITTANY MASHELL MOREL, KIM M. MOREL, L. PAUL MOREL.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:30 a.m. on 4/22/03 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 2/12/03 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by David Levon Terzian Service :1/6/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Additional Documentation
                                                                                                                                                    Additional Documentation by L. PAUL MOREL, KIM M. MOREL, BRITTANY MASHELL MOREL. Service: 12/19/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER reassigning this case to Special Master Laura D. Millman. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF assignment to Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002 Petition
                                                                                                                                                          PETITION by L. PAUL MOREL, KIM M. MOREL and BRITTANY MASHELL MOREL, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #055552, Vac. Date: 12/12/00 (Respondent's report due 3/3/03). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                            CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 142 times.

                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?