HARBIN, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-vv-01794-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo KAREN A. HARBIN, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by SMITH & ALSPAUGH PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marcus Clay Alspaugh +1 205 324 8910
No Logo RICHARD GEORGE HARBIN, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by SMITH & ALSPAUGH PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marcus Clay Alspaugh +1 205 324 8910
No Logo RYLA NICOLE HARBIN, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by SMITH & ALSPAUGH PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marcus Clay Alspaugh +1 205 324 8910
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent James Matanoski +1 202 616 4124 +1 202 616 4310 vincent.matanoski@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/6/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $250000
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 3/14/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that the petition is dismissed. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003
    Case closed (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 DECISION of Special Master
      Decision of Special Master E. L. French. Copy to parties. (LTD)
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Terminated:
        MOTION by HHS (Service: 1/10/03) to Dismiss . Response due: 2/10/03. (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Vincent James Matanoski. Service :1/10/03. (LTD)
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Order
            ORDER setting Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 1/13/03 (signed by Special Master E. L. French). Copy to parties. (LTD)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/11/2003 Order
              ORDER setting Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 1/14/03 (signed by Special Master E. L. French). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 12/11/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Order
                ORDER Respondent's RUle 4(b) Report due 3/6/03 (signed by Special Master E. L. French). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                  NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master E. L. French. Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Petition
                    PETITION (filed with [2] two volumes of exhibit's in support) by KAREN A. HARBIN, RYLA NICOLE HARBIN and RICHARD GEORGE HARBIN, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #055584, Vac. Date: 12/8/00 (Respondent's report due 3/6/03). (FE) Modified on 12/09/2002
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                      CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 69 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?