FINET, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-vv-00348-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANGELA FINET, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Shoemaker and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clifford John Shoemaker +1 703 281 6395 +1 703 281 5807 cliff@attorneyaccess.net
No Logo ERIC SHAW FINET, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Shoemaker and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clifford John Shoemaker +1 703 281 6395 +1 703 281 5807 cliff@attorneyaccess.net
No Logo SCOTT FINET, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Shoemaker and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clifford John Shoemaker +1 703 281 6395 +1 703 281 5807 cliff@attorneyaccess.net
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Glenn Alexander MacLeod +1 202 616 4122 glenn.macleod@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/14/2003
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (133) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008
MEMORANDUM, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, PREHEARING SUBMISSIONS by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (MacLeod, Glenn)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008
    NOTICE OF FILING Resp. Ex. U (Respondent's Position on Petitioners' Past Unreimbursed Expenses) by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (MacLeod, Glenn)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008
      NOTICE OF FILING Resp. Ex. T (Joint Summary of Disputed Items Chart) by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (MacLeod, Glenn)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008
        PREHEARING SUBMISSIONS by SCOTT FINET. (Shoemaker, Clifford)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008
          MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #57-64] filed by SCOTT FINET. (Attachments: # (1) Index, # (2) Exhibit EXH57, # (3) Exhibit EXH58, # (4) Exhibit EXH59, # (5) Exhibit EXH60, # (6) Exhibit EXH61, # (7) Exhibit EXH62, # (8) Exhibit EXH63-Part 1, # (9) Exhibit EXH63-Part 2, # (10) Exhibit EXH64-Part 1, # (11) Exhibit EXH64-Part 2)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008
            NOTICE OF FILING Curriculum Vitae of Kathleen Messimer (Resp. Ex. S) by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (MacLeod, Glenn)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008
              EXPERT REPORT of Kathleen Messimer, Vocational Specialist (Ex. no. R) filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (MacLeod, Glenn)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008
                NOTICE OF FILING Curriculum Vitae of Susan Waltzman, M.D. (Resp. Ex. Q) by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (MacLeod, Glenn)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008
                  EXPERT REPORT of Susan Waltzman, M.D. (Ex. no. P) filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (MacLeod, Glenn)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008
                    ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTATION by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, NOTICE OF FILING Curriculum Vitae of Suzanne W. Labansky (Resp. Ex. O) by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (MacLeod, Glenn)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008
                      PREHEARING SUBMISSIONS by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, LIFE CARE PLAN assessed by Suzanne W. Labansky (Ex. no. N (Amended Life Care Plan)) filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES(Life Care Plan due 10/14/2008.). (MacLeod, Glenn)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008
                        MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #51-56] filed by SCOTT FINET. (Attachments: # (1) Index, # (2) Exhibit EXH51, # (3) Exhibit EXH52, # (4) Exhibit EXH53, # (5) Exhibit EXH54, # (6) Exhibit EXH55, # (7) Exhibit EXH56)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008
                          PREHEARING ORDER: Prehearing Submissions due by 8/27/2008. Damages Hearing set for 9/17/2008 09:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008
                            ORDER The Parties informed the Court that a damages hearing will prove necessary, and the Court set a hearing date. A prehearing order will follow. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008
                              ORDER Petitioners informed the Court that they will forward their final demand to Respondent by the conclusion of this week. Petitioner recently filed information relating to past unreimbursable expenses, and Respondent is currently reviewing same. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008
                                MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #50] filed by SCOTT FINET. (Attachments: # (1) Index# (2) Exhibit EXH50)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008
                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/25/2008 10:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008
                                    ORDER: The Parties have engaged in several detailed discussions regarding the outstanding issues in this case, including the issue of past unreimbursable expenses, and the Court encouraged them to continue. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008
                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/25/2008 11:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008
                                        ORDER Respondent shall communicate information related to resolution within the next week. Notice of Compliance due by 2/26/2008. Status conference at 10:30. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008
                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: The parties are working toward settlement. Status Conference set for 2/19/2008 10:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007
                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Parties are working on technological aspects of life care plan, and expect soon to bring the case to resolution. Status Conference set for 1/18/2008 09:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007
                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/11/2007 at 10:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007
                                                MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #49] filed by SCOTT FINET. (Attachments: # (1) Index# (2) Exhibit EXH49)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007
                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: The parties are to communicate on remaining disputed issues relating to the Life Care Plan of Petitioner. Status Conference set for 10/26/2007 at 10:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007
                                                    LIFE CARE PLAN assessed by Suzanne Labansky (Ex. no. M) filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Life Care Plan due 8/28/2007. (MacLeod, Glenn)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007
                                                      MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #47-48] filed by SCOTT FINET. (Attachments: # (1) Index# (2) Exhibit EXH47# (3) Exhibit EXH48)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007
                                                        LIFE CARE PLAN assessed by Scott Finet (Ex. no. 46) filed by SCOTT FINET.Life Care Plan due 7/9/2007. Status Report due by 7/9/2007 (Attachments: # (1) Index# (2) Exhibit EXH46)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007
                                                          ORDER granting [78] Motion for Extension of Time. Respondent shall file a status report notifying the Court when the materials at issue are received from the Petitioner. Once that status report is filed, the parties are to contact the Court to schedule a status conference. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell.(IRK)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007, Terminated: 5/15/2007 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 45 days from the date respondent receives the information requested from petitioner to file Respondent's Responsive Life Care Plan, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Response due by 5/29/2007. (MacLeod, Glenn)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007
                                                              MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #45] filed by SCOTT FINET. (Attachments: # (1) Index# (2) Exhibit EXH45)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007
                                                                MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #44] filed by SCOTT FINET. (Attachments: # (1) Index# (2) Exhibit EXH44)(Shoemaker, Clifford)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007
                                                                  ORDER: Respondent's life care plan and any other filings shall be made by close of business 16 May 2007. A follow up status conference is scheduled for 22 May 2007 at 10:00 AM (EDT). Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Respondent's life care plan and any other filings due by 5/16/07.(tjk, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/13/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/22/2007 10:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007
                                                                        MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #41-43] filed by SCOTT FINET. (Attachments: # (1) Index# (2) Exhibit EXH41# (3) Exhibit EXH42-Part 1# (4) Exhibit EXH42-Part 2# (5) Exhibit EXH43-Part 1# (6) Exhibit EXH43-Part 2)(Gentry, Renee)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: 2/27/2007
                                                                          MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #35-40 (FCPS Years 2001-2006)] filed by SCOTT FINET. (Attachments: # (1) Index# (2) Exhibit EXH35# (3) Exhibit EXH36# (4) Exhibit EXH37# (5) Exhibit EXH38# (6) Exhibit EXH39# (7) Exhibit EXH40)(Gentry, Renee)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: 2/27/2007
                                                                            STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (MacLeod, Glenn)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007
                                                                              LIFE CARE PLAN assessed by Scott Finet (Ex. no. 27-34) filed by SCOTT FINET.Life Care Plan due 4/9/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Index# (2) Exhibit EXH27(Supp. Life Care Plan)# (3) Exhibit EXH28(Med. Exp's-Summary)# (4) Exhibit EXH29 (Med. Exp's-Hosp & Surgery)# (5) Exhibit EXH30 (Med. Exp's-Suburban Listening)# (6) Exhibit EXH31 (Med. Exp's-School Based Therapy)# (7) Exhibit EXH32 (Med. Exp's-Equipment)# (8) Exhibit EXH33 (Med. Exp's-Speech Therapy)# (9) Exhibit EXH34 (Projected Med Exp's))(Gentry, Renee)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007
                                                                                MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #26] filed by SCOTT FINET. (Attachments: # (1) Index# (2) Exhibit EXH26)(Gentry, Renee)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/21/2007 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                  NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (tjk, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2007 (tjk, ).
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 68 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: 1/21/2007 Order
                                                                                    ORDER re Petitioner's motion to have this case converted to electronic filing is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 67 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007 Scheduling Order
                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent's Life Care Plan and any other filings shall be made by the close of business on 2/28/07. Status Conference set for 3/5/2007 10:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007
                                                                                        A Status Conference was held on 10 January 2007 before Special Master Richard Abell. Although the parties are still pursuing some necessary files from third party sources, the Court set a filing schedule for the parties so that damages may be calculated expeditiously. (dlm, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: 12/26/2006 notice of filing
                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING Exhibits #25- River School Updated Records by ERIC SHAW FINET, SCOTT FINET, ANGELA FINET. Service: 12/18/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 12/3/2006 Scheduling Order
                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Outstanding Medical records due by 12/15/2006. Status Conference set for 1/10/2007 10:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006
                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephonic Status Conference held on November 29, 2006. (tlj, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Status Conference Order
                                                                                                ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/29/2006 10:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Respondent shall file a Life Care Plan following receipt of the medical documents solicited by respondent from medical care providers. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006
                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephonic Status Conference held on October 24, 2006. (tlj, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Status Conference Order
                                                                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/24/2006 10:30 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to file electronically , filed by ERIC SHAW FINET, SCOTT FINET, ANGELA FINET. Service: 8/28/06.Response due by 9/14/2006. (tjk, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006 Status Conference Order
                                                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/1/2006 10:30 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Order
                                                                                                          ORDER directing the parties to contact the court to reschedule the status conference of August 21, 2006, which is cancelled. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (dls )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006 notice of filing
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING Exhibits 21-24 by ERIC SHAW FINET, SCOTT FINET, ANGELA FINET. Service: 8/7/06.(dls )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/26/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Alexander MacLeod for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/24/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 notice of filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING Exhibits 19-20 (Past Unreimbursed Exp's & Summary Chart and School Rec's & Evals) by ERIC SHAW FINET, SCOTT FINET, ANGELA FINET. Service: 7/12/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Life Care Plan
                                                                                                                  LIFE CARE PLAN assessed by Estelle L. Davis, Ph.D., CRC (Ex. no. 18) filed by ERIC SHAW FINET, SCOTT FINET, ANGELA FINET. Service: 6/15/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/14/2006 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners indicated that their life care plan will be filed by the close of business on 6/16/06. Respondent requested until 8/15/06 to file a response. Status Conference set for 8/21/2006 10:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006
                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephonic Status Conference held on June 12, 2006. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006
                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephonic Status Conference held on May 08, 2006. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 54 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/12/2006 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER:Life Care Plan due 4/27/2006. Status Conference set for 5/8/2006 11:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006
                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephonic Status Conference held on April 5, 2006. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Description not available
                                                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/5/2006 10:00 AM (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006
                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on February 23, 2006. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 Description not available
                                                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/23/2006 10:00 AM (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                    ENTITLEMENT RULING Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Wernett McInerny for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 8/18/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Surreply
                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY re [48] Order filed by ERIC SHAW FINET, SCOTT FINET, ANGELA FINET.Service: 7/08/05 by hand. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Per Petitioners' request, their surresponse, which was due 6/29/05, is now due 7/13/05. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Post-Hearing Brief
                                                                                                                                            POST HEARING BRIEF by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 6/10/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent shall file his Post Hearing Brief due by 6/15/05. Petitioners may, if they so choose, file a surresponse by 6/29/05. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Post-Hearing Brief
                                                                                                                                                POST HEARING BRIEF by ERIC SHAW FINET, SCOTT FINET, ANGELA FINET. Service: 5/10/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT and REQUEST FOR 1 WEEK EXTENSION OF TIME to file the post-hearing brief by ERIC SHAW FINET, SCOTT FINET, ANGELA FINET. Service: 4/22/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners shall file their post hearing brief by 5/06/05. Respondent shall file his post hearing brief by 6/10/05. Petitioners may, if they so choose, file a surresponse by 6/24/05Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Respondent shall file Post Hearing Brief due by 6/10/2005. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING Exhibits I-L in response to [39]Petitioner's Exhibit #16 by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 4/14/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 41 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/22/05 before Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners shall file their post hearing brief by 4/22/05. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Respondent shall file his Post Hearing Brief due by 5/27/2005. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING Exhibit 16- [Emails from Dr. Bellanti] by ERIC SHAW FINET, SCOTT FINET, ANGELA FINET. Service: 2/28/05 by hand.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING: Exhibit H - pursuant to the special master's oral directive at hearing by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 2/24/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005
                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 3/22/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT [Exhibit 16] by ERIC SHAW FINET, SCOTT FINET, ANGELA FINET. Service: 2/22/05.(tjk, ).
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/4/2005 Prehearing Submissions
                                                                                                                                                                        PREHEARING SUBMISSIONS by ERIC SHAW FINET, SCOTT FINET, ANGELA FINET. Service: 2/01/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/4/2005 Prehearing Submissions
                                                                                                                                                                          PREHEARING SUBMISSIONS by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 2/01/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING [Exhibits C,D,E,F,G] by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 1/03/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Prehearing Order
                                                                                                                                                                              ENTITLEMENT PREHEARING ORDER:Prehearing Submissions due by 2/1/2005. Evidentiary Hearing set for 2/22/2005 09:00 AM (EST) in Washington, DC before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on November 22, 2004. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: 11/7/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference reset for 11/22/2004 10:30 AM (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/4/2004 09:30 AM (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on October 7, 2004. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/7/2004 11:00 AM (EDT) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on September 14, 2004. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING [Exhibit #15- Articles from Dr. Bellanti] by ANGELA FINET, ERIC SHAW FINET, SCOTT FINET. Service: 9/10/04 by hand.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING Exhibits 12-14 (#12-Dr. Tornatore's CV, #13-Dr. Bellanti's report and #14-Dr. Bellanti's CV) by ANGELA FINET, ERIC SHAW FINET, SCOTT FINET. Service: 9/10/04 by hand.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/14/2004 09:30 AM (EDT) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Petitioner shall have until the close of business 9/10/04 to submit Dr. Bellanti's report along with curriculum vitae and any attendant medical literature or to SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. This timing reflects Petitioners' request for a 2 week extension. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by ANGELA FINET, ERIC SHAW FINET, SCOTT FINET. Service: 8/27/04.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by ANGELA FINET, ERIC SHAW FINET, SCOTT FINET. Service: 7/29/04.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER:Petitioners shall file Dr. Bellanti's Expert Report, his curriculum vitae and any attendant medical literature by 7/29/2004. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/30/2004 09:00 PM (EDT) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on June 29, 2004. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 5/26/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER:Petitioners' Expert Report and CV due by 6/25/2004. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/29/2004 11:30 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on May 25, 2004. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference reset for 5/25/2004 01:00 PM (EDT) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: 4/26/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/20/2004 09:00 AM, E.D.T. before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: 4/22/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on April 22, 2004. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 Respondent's Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Respondent's Report by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Service: 4/13/04. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER:Medical Expert Report, corresponding curriculum vitae and all relevant medical literature due by 4/13/2004. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/22/2004 09:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on February 9, 2004. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Expert Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXPERT REPORT of Dr. Tornatore (Ex. no. 11) filed by ANGELA FINET, ERIC SHAW FINET, SCOTT FINET. Service: 1/30/04.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by ANGELA FINET, ERIC SHAW FINET, SCOTT FINET. Service: 1/05/04.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on January 6, 2004. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/20/2004 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER:Petitioners' Expert Report, CV and medical evidence due by 2/2/2004. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/9/2004 09:00 AM. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/18/2003 Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Status conference set for 1/6/2004 09:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Show Cause Response due by 1/2/2004. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (jmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/1/2003 09:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (jmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on November 7, 2003. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/7/2003 09:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (jmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on September 30, 2003. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/29/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: Due to the impending inclement weather in the Washington, D.C. area, the Court has postponed the telephonic status conference scheduled for 18 September 2003. The Court has rescheduled the status conference for September 30, 2003 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (jmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/29/2003 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Status Conference reset for 9/30/2003 10:30 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. (jmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: 8/22/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibits #9-10] filed by ANGELA FINET, ERIC SHAW FINET, SCOTT FINET. Service: 08/22/03.(ndl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on August 5, 2003. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/18/2003 10:30 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (jmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 8/1/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003 Medical Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #5-8] filed by ANGELA FINET, ERIC SHAW FINET, SCOTT FINET. Service: 8/1/03.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/5/2003 10:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (jmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/2/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on June 2, 2003. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Medical Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit #3 & 4] filed by ANGELA FINET, ERIC SHAW FINET, SCOTT FINET. Service: 5/23/03.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/16/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/2/2003 09:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (jmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by David Levon Terzian for The Secretary of Health and Human Services. Service: 03/18/03.(jmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: Petitioner shall confer with Respondent and contact the Court by 3/17/03 re: dates and times for the initial conference call. ( signed by Special Master Richard B. Abell ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master Richard B. Abell. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PETITION by ERIC SHAW FINET, SCOTT FINET and ANGELA FINET, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #056383, Vac. Date: 7/18/01 (Respondent's report due 5/15/03). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 249 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?