SMITH, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-vv-00423-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MISSY SMITH, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Shoemaker and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clifford John Shoemaker +1 703 281 6395 +1 703 281 5807 cliff@attorneyaccess.net
No Logo TANYA SMITH, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Shoemaker and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clifford John Shoemaker +1 703 281 6395 +1 703 281 5807 cliff@attorneyaccess.net
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by Rawls & McNelis PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Levon Terzian +1 804 782 0613 dterzian@rawlsmcnelis.com
Office COFC
Filed 2/24/2003
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Dismissed by Special Master
County
Terminated 2/4/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Order
ORDER Concluding Proceedings Pursuant to Voluntary Dismissal Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (jat, )
    LREF
    Blank 16 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 ~Notice (other)
    NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by MISSY SMITH, TANYA SMITH. Service: 1/30/04 by hand.(tjk, )
      LREF
      Blank 15 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Notice Regarding Statutory Requirement
      ORDER re: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (jmm, )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz : A Status Conference was held on October 27, 2003. (als, )
          LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Order
          ORDER re: On September 5, 2003, petitioner's counsel filed a status reprot indicating that counsel expects to procure the signed Motion for Voluntary Dismissal from his client within the next thirty days. According petitioner's counsel shall file this document with the court within fourteen (14) days, by September 25, 2003. If petitioner's counsel has not obtained the document by this date, he shall contact the court to schedule a status conference. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (jmm, )
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: 9/5/2003
            STATUS REPORT by MISSY SMITH, TANYA SMITH. Service: 09/05/03.(jmm, )
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 7/18/2003 Status Report
              STATUS REPORT by MISSY SMITH, TANYA SMITH. Service: 6/23/03.(jat, )
                LREF
                Blank 11 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003 Status Report
                STATUS REPORT by MISSY SMITH, TANYA SMITH. Service: 6/27/03.(jat, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Scheduling Order
                  SCHEDULING ORDER:Petitioner shall file a statement with the court indicating whether he intends to further pursue this claim by 6/24/2003. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (jat, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz : Telephone Conference held on 6/9/03. (cmh, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz : Telephone Conference held on 5/8/03. (cmh, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 9 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/21/2003 Affidavit
                        Exhibit 5 - AFFIDAVIT of Melissa Smith by MISSY SMITH, TANYA SMITH. Service: 5/12/03.(jat, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Description not available
                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/9/2003 02:00 PM before Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (jat, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 Medical Records
                            MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit #1-4] filed by MISSY SMITH, TANYA SMITH. Service: 5/9/03.(jat, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 6 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/31/2003 Order
                              ORDER On March 21, 2003, this office inadvertently filed a document entitled "Notice Regarding Omnibus Autism Proceeding." That notice does not apply to this case and is hereby rescinded. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (jmm, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 5 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003 Order
                                ORDER re: petitioner shall confer with respondent and contact the court by 4/1/03 re: dates and times for the initial conference call. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (jat, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003 Notice Regarding Omnibus Autism Proceeding
                                  Notice Regarding Omnibus Autism Proceeding. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (jat, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by David Levon Terzian for The Secretary of Health and Human Services. Service: 03/18/03.(jmm, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                      NOTICE OF assignment to Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Petition
                                        PETITION by MISSY SMITH and TANYA SMITH Vac. Date: 2/20/01 (Respondent's report due 5/27/03). [fee not received] (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                          CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned Unassigned. (FE)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 125 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?