SUTTON v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-00090-LSM
District Judge Lawrence S. Margolis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES G. SUTTON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glen E. Keller, Jr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Adams Wickham +1 303 670 3825 +1 303 670 1586 wickham1@wispertel.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian John Moran +1 202 307 6299 +1 202 514 7969 christian.moran@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/15/2003
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 6/13/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
197-cv-00526-LSM
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (80) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 75 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, in favor of defendant and the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 74 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 Court Filing
    PUBLISHED OPINION denying plaintiff's motion for judgment upon the administrative record and granting defendant's motion for judgment upon the administrative record. Defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiff's request to remove plaintiff's Officer Evaluation Report is granted. Plaintiff's objections to the DAADB's proceedings on remand are overruled. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for defendant and dismiss the complaint. No costs. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 73 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [69] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply as to [67] Response to Order to Show Cause. Reply due by 3/24/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, )
        LREF
        Blank 72 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Administrative Record
        ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Re-Filed) by USA. (mb2, )
          LREF
          Blank 71 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
          ORDER granting [68] Motion for Leave to Re-File The Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, )
            LREF
            Blank 70 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Response
            REPLY to [67] Response to Order filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 3/23/2005.(mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 69 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: 3/28/2005, Terminated: 4/5/2005 Terminated:
              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to [67] Response to Order to Show Cause, until 3/24/2005, filed by USA.Service: 3/22/2005. Response due by 4/8/2005. (mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 68 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: 3/28/2005, Terminated: 4/5/2005 Terminated:
                MOTION for Leave to Re-File The Administrative Record filed by USA. Service: 3/23/2005. Response due by 4/11/2005.(mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 67 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Response to Order to Show Cause
                  RESPONSE TO [66] ORDER filed by JAMES G. SUTTON. Service: 2/28/2005.(mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 66 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Response to the Department of the Army determination, dated 11/23/2005, due by 3/3/2005. Reply due by 3/17/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 65 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                      RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference re-set for 2/16/2005 at 02:30 PM before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 64 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference RESCHEDULED for 1/19/2005 02:30 PM The court will initiate the conference call. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (eph, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 63 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference by telephone set for 1/18/2005 02:00 PM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. The Court will initiate the conference call. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lg1, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 62 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004 Decision by Agency
                            DECISION by United States Army. Copy to parties and judge. Service: 12/20/2004.(hw1, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 61 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                              ORDER denying [52] Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dw1)
                                LREF
                                Blank 60 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [52] MOTION to Amend/Correct [50] Order on Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Order on Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Order on Motion for Summary Judgment on the Admin. Record,, Order on Cross Motion [Dispositive], Order on Cross Motion [Dispositive] filed by JAMES G. SUTTON. Service: 10/26/04.(dw1)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 59 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting [58] Motion for Leave to File Reply to Response to Motion to Amend the Remand Order. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dw1)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 58 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004, Terminated: 12/15/2004 Terminated:
                                    MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Amend Remand Order by JAMES G. SUTTON.Service: 10/26/04. Response due by 11/12/2004 (jat, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 57 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004 Response to Motion
                                      RESPONSE to [52] MOTION to Amend/Correct [50] Order on Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Order on Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Order on Motion for Summary Judgment on the Admin. Record,, Order on Cross Motion [Dispositive], Order on Cross Motion [Dispositive] filed by USA. Reply due by 10/26/2004. Service: 10/12/04.(dw1)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 56 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [51] Pltf's Motion to Withdraw its Motion to Cite Supplemental Authority. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 55 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004 ERRATACourt Filing
                                          ERRATA to Motion to Reconsider the Remand Order filed by Plaintiff. Filed by leave of the Judge. (jat, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: 9/29/2004
                                            Certified copy of amended order of September 27, 2004, forwarded to the Deputy Assistant Secretary, Army Review Boards. (jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 54 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/29/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                              AMENDED ORDER: This Court DENIES [13] Dft's Motion to Dismiss and both [13] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment, and [30] Pltf's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administratie Record. This matter is REMANDED to the DAADB for futher consideration consistent with this opinion. The DAADB shall file its determination with the Court by 1/14/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 53 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/29/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER: There are grammatical errors in the [50] Order filed on 9/14/2004. The following corrections are being made to the original order: (See order for details). Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004, Terminated: 12/15/2004 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION to Amend [50] Remand Order, by JAMES G. SUTTON.Service: 9/23/2004. Response due by 10/12/2004. (jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004, Terminated: 10/1/2004 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION to Withdraw [49] MOTION cite Supplemental Authority by JAMES G. SUTTON.Service: 9/23/2004. Response due by 10/12/2004 (lg1, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004
                                                      Administrative Record Returned to agency pursuant to RCFC 56.2(a)(4). (dls)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004
                                                        Certified copy of order of September 15, 2004, forwarded to the Deputy Assistant Secretary, Army Review Boards. (dls)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004 Order on Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1)Court Filing
                                                          ORDER: This Court DENIES [13] Dft's Motion to Dismiss and both [13] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment, and [30] Pltf's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administratie Record. This matter is REMANDED to the DAADB for futher consideration consistent with this opinion. The DAADB shall file its determination with the Court by 1/14/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, ) Modified on 9/23/2004 (dls, ).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION to cite Supplemental Authority by JAMES G. SUTTON.Service: 9/12/2004. Response due by 9/29/2004. (dw1)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004
                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence S. Margolis: Motion Hearing held on 6-24-04 re [13] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA, and [30] CROSS MOTION to [13] D's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA filed by JAMES G. SUTTON (lmc)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 24, 2004 before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dw1)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004
                                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/29/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re: [30] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to [13] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, and [13] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record: Motion Hearing is set for Thursday, 6/24/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [44] Pltf's Motion for Leave to Reply to Dft's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Description not available
                                                                        REPLY to Dft's Opposition to [30] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to [13] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by JAMES G. SUTTON. Service: 5/11/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004, Terminated: 5/18/2004 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Reply to Dft's Motion to Strike, by JAMES G. SUTTON.Service: 5/11/2004. Response due by 5/28/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [42] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to [36] Dft's Opposition to [30] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to [13] Dtf's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record. Reply due by 5/11/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004, Terminated: 5/6/2004 Terminated:
                                                                              UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [36] Dft's Opposition to Pltf's Cross Motion, until 5/11/2004, by JAMES G. SUTTON.Service: 4/29/2004. Response due by 5/17/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [40] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File an Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [36] Dft's Opposition to Pltf's Cross Motion for Judgment on Adminstrative Record. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004, Terminated: 5/5/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to [36] Response to Motion,(until May 11, 2004), by JAMES G. SUTTON.Service: 4/29/04. (dw1)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/5/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [38] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to [36] Dft's Opposition to [30] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to [13] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record. Reply due by 4/28/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004, Terminated: 4/1/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                      UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [36] Dft's Opposition to Pltf's Cross Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record, until 4/28/2004, by JAMES G. SUTTON.Service: 3/26/2004. Response due by 4/12/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                        MOTION to Strike Material From Pltf's Appendix by USA.Service: 3/11/2004. Response due by 3/29/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                          OPPOSITION to [30] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to [13] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA. Reply due by 3/29/2004. Service: 3/11/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Response
                                                                                            OBJECTIONS to [29] Pltf's Counter Statement of Facts filed by USA. Service: 3/11/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [33] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [30] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to [13] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record. Response due by 3/11/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004, Terminated: 3/3/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to [30] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to [13] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, until 3/11/2004, by USA.Service: 2/19/2004. Response due by 3/8/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [31] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [30] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to [13] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, until 2/19/2004. Response due by 2/19/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004, Terminated: 1/20/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [30] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to [13] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, until 2/19/2004, by USA.Service: 1/13/2004. Response due by 1/30/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                      CROSS MOTION to [13] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, Together with Separately Bound Appendix Volume by JAMES G. SUTTON. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 12/17/03. Response due by 1/20/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                        COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS by JAMES G. SUTTON. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 12/17/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting [27] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [13] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) or MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, until 12/17/2003. Response due by 12/17/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003, Terminated: 12/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [13] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, until 12/17/2003, by JAMES G. SUTTON.Service: 12/4/03. Response due by 12/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [25] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [13] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, until 12/5/2003. Response due by 12/5/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003, Terminated: 11/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [13] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, until 12/5/2003, by JAMES G. SUTTON.Service: 11/20/03. Response due by 12/8/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: 11/3/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [23] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [13] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record. Response due by 11/21/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/31/2003, Terminated: 10/30/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [13] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, until 11/21/03, by JAMES G. SUTTON.Service: 10/21/03. Response due by 11/17/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/31/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [21] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File an Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Dft's Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record, Until 11/21/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003, Terminated: 10/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File an Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Dft's Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record by JAMES G. SUTTON.Service: 10/21/03. Response due by 11/7/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: 8/22/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [19] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [13] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, until 10/8/03. Response due by 10/8/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/28/2003, Terminated: 8/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to [13] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, until 10/8/03, by JAMES G. SUTTON.Service: 7/22/03. Response due by 8/8/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              AMENDED ORDER granting [16] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [13] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, until 8/8/03. Response due by 8/8/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, ) Modified on 7/14/2003 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: 7/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER re: [16] Pltf's Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [13] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, until 8/8/03, filed by JAMES G. SUTTON. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003, Terminated: 7/10/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [13] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, until 8/8/03, by JAMES G. SUTTON.Service: 7/2/03. Response due by 7/21/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF FACTS by UNITED STATES, filed by leave of the Judge.Service: 6/6/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), and MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record by UNITED STATES, filed by leave of the Judge.Service: 6/6/03. Response due by 7/14/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                        ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD and other documents (in two volumes) by UNITED STATES. Service: 6/11/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [10] Motion for Leave to File administrative record Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer Due by 6/6/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003, Terminated: 6/11/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File the administrative record and other documents by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/6/03. Response due by 6/23/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003, Terminated: 6/6/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint (until 6/6/2003) by UNITED STATES.Service: 5/30/03. Response due by 6/16/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer Due by 5/30/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (vro, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/26/2003, Terminated: 5/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [6] Order, until 5/30/2003 by UNITED STATES.Service: 5/16/03. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. reset Answer deadline to 5/16/03 ( signed by the Clerk ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003, Terminated: 3/14/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 3/13/03) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to May 16, 2003). (DS)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Christian John Moran Service:1/29/03. (NN)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by JAMES G. SUTTON of directly related case (97-526C). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #056051. Answer due on 3/17/03. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 150 times.

                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?