TRICE, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-00191-NBF
District Judge Nancy B. Firestone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RICHARD EDWARD TRICE, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/27/2003
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 134 - Contract - Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 2/27/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '03-5084'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags AUTO, CLOSED, ENDADR
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
ORDER RETURNING (1) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, (2) Plaintiff's Reply and (3) Motion for Summary Judgment received 9/2/03, 9/11/03 and 9/15/03. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 26 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 6/17/2004 CAFC Mandate Dismissing
    MANDATE of CAFC dismissing [17] Notice of Appeal filed by RICHARD EDWARD TRICE. (Previously entered as a CAFC Order directing that the Notice of Appeal be DISMISSED. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 24 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003 Terminated:
      Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit ORDER. On July 24, 2003, the court (CAFC) issued an order allowing Richard Edward Trice ("Trice") 30 days to pay the $105 filing fee. Trice has failed to comply with that order. Upon consideration thereof, IT IT ORDERED THAT: (1) This appeal is hereby dismissed. (2) Each side shall bear its own costs. FOR THE COURT Jan Horbaly, Clerk, CAFC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 23 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: 8/26/2003 Order on Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15(b)Court Filing
        ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, [20] Pltf's Motion for Reconsideration, and [22] Pltf's Amended Motion for Reconsideration must be DENIED. Pltf has failed to provide the court with any basis for relief from the court's March 31, 2003 order. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 22 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: 8/11/2003 Terminated:
          AMENDED MOTION for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60 re: [5] Judgment, Relation Back of Amendments, and Supplemental Pleading by RICHARD EDWARD TRICE.Service: 8/4/03. Response due by 8/21/2003. (jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 21 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/28/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
            OPPOSITION to [20] Pltf's MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15(b) and MOTION for Relief from Judgment pursuant to Rule 60 re: [12] Order, and [4] Order filed by UNITED STATES, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Reply due by 8/6/2003. Service: 7/23/03.(jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 20 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/28/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
              MOTION for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60 re: [12] Order of March 24, 2003 and [4] Order of February 21, 2002, and MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15(b) to Show Jurisdiction in the Appellate Court and Trial Court, 28 USC 1653 by RICHARD EDWARD TRICE, Filed by Leave of the Judge.Service: 7/16/03. Response due by 8/4/2003. (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
                ORDER RETURNING document's. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dw1, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 19 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 Terminated:
                  CAFC Case Number 03-5084 for [17] Notice of Appeal filed by RICHARD EDWARD TRICE. (hw1, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 17 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 Terminated:
                    NOTICE OF APPEAL by RICHARD EDWARD TRICE. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. Fee waived, filed in forma pauperis. (hw1, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 16 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/11/2003 Interrogatories PropoundedCourt Filing
                      INTERROGATORIES by RICHARD EDWARD TRICE, by leave of the Judge.Service: 4/7/03.(dw1, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 15 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/11/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                        MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for Temporary Restraining Order by RICHARD EDWARD TRICE. Service: 3/24/03. Response due 4/24/2003. Filed by leave of the Judge. (lrd)
                          LREF
                          Blank 14 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                          MOTION for Discovery by RICHARD EDWARD TRICE, by leave of the Judge.Service: 4/7/03. Response due by 4/24/2003. (dw1, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 12 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 3/31/2003 Court Filing
                            ORDER denying [6] Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (hw1, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 11 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 3/31/2003 Court Filing
                              RESPONSE to order directing the dismissal of this case filed by RICHARD EDWARD TRICE, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/4/03.(hw1, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 10 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 3/31/2003, Terminated: 3/7/2007 Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                MOTION to file an Amended complaint by RICHARD EDWARD TRICE, filed by leave of the JudgeService: 3/4/03. Response due by 3/21/2003 (hw1, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003 Response to Motion
                                  RESPONSE to Motion re [6] Motion for Relief from Judgment filed by The United States. Reply due by 4/4/2003. Service: 3/21/03. (lrd)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for The United States. Service: 3/19/03. (lrd)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER returning Plaintiff's preliminary motion discovery (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003, Terminated: 3/31/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                        MOTION by RICHARD EDWARD TRICE (Service: 3/4/03) for relief from Judgment of 2/27/03 . Response due: 3/21/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003
                                          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003
                                            Case closed (LD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 4 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [2-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and directing the clerk to dismiss the complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. ( signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone ) Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 3 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                Notice of assignment to Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003, Terminated: 2/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by RICHARD EDWARD TRICE (Service: 1/27/03) to Proceed in Forma Pauperis . Response due: 2/13/03. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Complaint
                                                    COMPLAINT, Answer due on 3/28/03. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                      CASE assigned to ADR Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (FE)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 59 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?