CARDINAL HEALTH 100 v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-00252-CFL
District Judge Charles F. Lettow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Cardinal Health Cardinal Health, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "CARDINAL HEALTH 100, INC."

Toggle Switch Represented by Shulman Rogers Gangal Pordy & Ecker, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ross Daryl Cooper +1 301 230 5239 +1 301 230 2891 rcooper@srgpe.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/4/2003
Jury Demand
Demand $1817000
Nature of Suit 116 - Contract - Supply (CDA)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to U.S. Agency
County
Terminated 6/21/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 37 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 Stipulation of Dismissal
JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by CARDINAL HEALTH 100, INC. and USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. Service: 6/21/04.(dw1)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dw1)
      LREF
      Blank 36 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 4/27/2004 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004
        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/3/2004. (vp1, )
          LREF
          Blank 35 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
          STATUS REPORT ORDER: In the event that no stipulaton of dismissal is filed in this case prior to 5/27/2004, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 4/27/2004
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles F. Lettow : Status Conference held on 4/27/2004. (lcd, )
              LREF
              Blank 34 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: The Status Conference currently scheduled to be held on 4/23/2004, shall be held on 4/27/2004 09:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 33 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Joint Status Report
                JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 3/17/2004.(jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 32 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: In the event that no stipulation of dismissal is filed in this case prior to 4/23/2004, a Status Conference will be held on 4/23/2004 09:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 31 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                    ORDER: [30] Pltf's Unopposed Motion to Extend the Stay is GRANTED in part. The stay on pre-trial proceedings in this case shall be lifted, but the pertinent deadlines shall be extended. In the event a stipulation of dismissal has not been filed by 3/17/2004, the parties shall file a joint status report on or before that date. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 30 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004, Terminated: 2/18/2004 Terminated:
                      UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend the Stay so as to Allow the Parties to Complete Their Settlement in Principle by CARDINAL HEALTH 100, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 2/13/2004. Response due by 3/1/2004. (jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 29 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [28] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Stay of Pretrial Deadlines. Pretrial proceedings in this case shall be stayed until 2/17/2004. In the event that a stipulation of dismissal has not been filed by that time, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before 2/17/2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 28 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004, Terminated: 1/9/2004 Terminated:
                          UNOPPOSED MOTION for Stay of Pretrial Deadlines by USA.Service: 1/5/2004. Response due by 1/22/2004.(jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 27 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003 Order on Motion to Amend ScheduleCourt Filing
                            ORDER: Good cause having been established, [25] Pltf's Unopposed Motion to Clarify and Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order is GRANTED. The Court's Scheduling Order of 9/5/2003, as amended, shall further be amended to reflect the following: Close of Fact Discovery: 1/5/2004. Submission of Pltf's Expert Reports, if any: 1/30/2004. Submission of Dft's Expert Reports, if any: 2/27/2004. Close of All Discovery: 3/5/2004. Submission of Joint Status Report: 3/8/2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 26 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [24] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Submit Its Responses to Pltf's First Set of Interrogatories and Document Requests. Dft shall respond to pltf's interrogatories and document requests on or before 1/5/2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 25 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003, Terminated: 12/9/2003 Terminated:
                                UNOPPOSED MOTION to Clarify and MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order, by CARDINAL HEALTH 100, INC.Service: 12/8/03. Response due by 12/29/2003. (jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 24 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003, Terminated: 12/8/2003 Terminated:
                                  UNOPPOSED MOTION for Enlargement of the Deadline for the Sumission of Dft's Responses to Pltf's First Set of Interrogatories and Document Requests to and Including 1/5/2004 by USA.Service: 12/3/03. Response due by 12/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 23 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Court Filing
                                    ORDER: Good cause having been shown, [22] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time is GRANTED. The Court's scheduling order of 9/5/2003, is amended to indicate that Fact Discovery shall be concluded on or before 1/5/2004. Pltf shall file its response to dft's first set of interrogatories on or before 12/24/2003. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 22 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003, Terminated: 11/25/2003 Terminated:
                                      MOTION for an Enlargement of Time to File Responses to the Dft's First Set of Interrogatories until 12/24/2003 and MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Fact Discovery, until 1/3/2004, by CARDINAL HEALTH 100, INC.Service: 11/20/03. Response due by 12/8/2003. Response due by 12/8/2003. (jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 21 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Court Filing
                                        ORDER: Good cause having been shown, [19] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Fact Discovery is GRANTED. The Court's scheduling order of September 5, 2003, is amended to indicate that Fact Discovery shall be concluded on or before 12/3/2003. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 20 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [18] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to the Government's First Set of Interrogatories. Response due by 11/24/2003. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 19 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003, Terminated: 11/5/2003 Terminated:
                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Fact Discovery, until 12/3/03, by USA.Service: 11/3/03. Response due by 11/20/2003. (jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 18 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: 11/5/2003, Terminated: 11/3/2003 Terminated:
                                              UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Government's First Set of Interrogatories, until 11/24/03, by CARDINAL HEALTH 100, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 10/30/03. Response due by 11/17/2003. (jcp, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 17 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
                                                ORDER RETURNING: Pltf's Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures received 9/2/2003. The Clerk's Office shall not file Pltf's Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures but rather shall return the Disclosures to the Pltf. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003 Discovery Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                  DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER:The parties shall conclude Fact Discovery on or before 11/3/2003. Pltf shall submit its Expert Reports, if any, on or before 12/19/2003. Dfts shall submit its Expert Reports, if any, on or before 1/30/2004. The parties shall conclude all Discovery on or before 2/23/2004. In all events, the parties are directed to submit to the Court a supplemental Joint Status Report on or before 3/8/2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 4, 2003 before Judge Charles Lettow. (dw1, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: 9/4/2003
                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 9/9/2003. (vp1, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: 8/22/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                        SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER:Pursuant to RCFC 16(b) and Appendix A, paragraph 7, It is hereby ORDERED that: A Preliminary Scheduling Conference shall be held in Chambers on 9/4/2003 10:00 AM in Suite 603 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                          JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. Service: 8/18/03.(jcp, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                            NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Charles Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Rule 40.1(c) of the RCFC, which permits the Chief Judge to reassign any case if necessary for the efficient administration of justice, the Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign the above captioned case to Judge Charles Lettow. Judge Robert H. Hodges no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: 8/13/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [9] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Joint Preliminary Status Report. JPSR due by 8/18/2003. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: 8/11/2003, Terminated: 8/11/2003 Terminated:
                                                                  UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/18/03 to file the Joint Preliminary Status Report by USA.Service: 8/7/03. Response due by 8/25/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Answer
                                                                    ANSWER to [1] Complaint by UNITED STATES.Service: 06/18/03. JPSR due by 8/11/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [6] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer Due by 6/18/2003. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (vro, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003, Terminated: 5/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until 6/19/03 by THE UNITED STATES.Service: 5/14/03. (vro, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003
                                                                          ORDER granting [4] Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the complaint. Answer Due by 5/19/2003. (dls, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003, Terminated: 4/7/2003 Terminated:
                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until May 18, 2003, filed by The United States.Service: 4/4/03. (dls, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gregory Thomas Jaeger. Service: 2/27/03. (LTD)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Complaint
                                                                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #056264. Answer due on 4/7/03. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 225 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?