SENFTLE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-00405-LMB
District Judge Lawrence M. Baskir, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANNE F. SENFTLE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick George Senftle +1 202 398 0547 +1 202 398 0575
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Sinclair Groat +1 202 616 8260 +1 202 514 7965 jack.groat@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/20/2003
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 5/13/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags AUTO, CLOSED, ENDADR
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by filed ANNE F. SENFTLE. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i) this day. (dls, )
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003
    ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by the Clerk. Answer Due by 6/6/2003. (dls, )
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003, Terminated: 4/22/2003 Terminated:
      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until June 6, 2003 filed by The United States.Service: 4/21/03. (dls, )
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER (signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Sinclair Groat. Service: 3/10/03. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
            Notice of assignment to Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 Complaint
              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #056385. Answer due on 4/21/03. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                CASE assigned to ADR Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (FE)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 155 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?