GELCO CORP. /GE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-00439-DGS
District Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GELCO CORP. /GE CAPITAL FLEET SERVICES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel L. Penner +1 817 569 1819
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Diane Seward +1 202 307 6508 +1 202 514 9440 elizabeth.d.seward2@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/27/2003
Jury Demand
Demand $366000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 11/9/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt : Initial Status Conference held on 10/9/03. (lag, )
      LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [16] Joint Motion to Suspend the Proceedings Pending a Final Decision, Including All Appeals, in Schlumberger Corp. & Subsidiaries v. United States, 98-197T. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (jcp, )
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004, Terminated: 1/27/2004 Terminated:
        JOINT MOTION to Suspend Proceedings by GELCO CORP. /GE CAPITAL FLEET SERVICES, USA.Service: 1/16/2004. Response due by 2/2/2004. (jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 15 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 9, 2003 before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (dw1, )
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 Response
            OPPOSITION to [13] Dft's Notice of Indirectly Related Cases filed by GELCO CORP. /GE CAPITAL FLEET SERVICES. Service: 10/15/03.(jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003
              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/24/2003. (vp1, )
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/17/2003 Notice of Indirectly Related Case(s)
                NOTICE of Indirectly Related Case(s) [00-564T] filed by USA. Service: 10/3/03.(dls, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:An Initial Status Conference will be held on Thursday, 10/9/2003 03:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Diane G. Sypolt. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                    MOTION for Leave to File Certification Out of Time by GELCO CORP./GE CAPITAL FLEET SERVICES, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 7/28/03. Response due by 8/14/2003. (jcp, ) Modified on 8/6/2003 (jcp, ).
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                      JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT, Filed by Leave of the Court, per Order of 7/11/03. Service: 7/9/03.(jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 9 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER: On 7/9/03, the parties attempted to file the joint preliminary status report. Because the signature for pltf's attorney of record does not appear to be an original but, rather, a signature transmitted by facsimile, the JPSR is filed by leave of the court. On or before 7/21/03, pltf's counsel shall file a signed certification attesting to his signature on the JPSR. This error shall be corrected in any future filing. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Compliance due by 7/21/2003, per Order of 7/11/03. (jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 8 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to file the "JPSR". JPSR due by 7/9/2003. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (dw1, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 7 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003, Terminated: 6/20/2003 Terminated:
                              MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/9/03 to file Joint Preliminary Status Report by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/17/03. Response due by 7/7/2003 (hw1, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Answer
                                ANSWER to [1] Complaint by The United States.Service: 4/28/03. JPSR due by 6/19/2003.(hw1, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 5 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                  CHAMBERS PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (lrd)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 4 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Diane Seward for The United States. Service: 4/3/03.(dw1, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Court Filing
                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 2 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003
                                        NOTICE by GELCO CORP. /GE of related cases (99-258T, 00-564T and 98-197T). (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003
                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #056512. Answer due on 4/28/03. (FE)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 268 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?