DEASON v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-00490-ECH
District Judge Emily C. Hewitt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DOUGLAS G. DEASON, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Allen Harrington +1 202 616 0465 +1 202 307 0972 David.Harrington@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/3/2003
Jury Demand
Demand $230000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 7/16/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '03-5142'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [11] Judgment. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Terminated:
    CAFC Case Number 03-5142 for [12] Notice of Appeal filed by DOUGLAS G. DEASON. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003, Terminated: 1/26/2004 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [11] Judgment by DOUGLAS G. DEASON. Copies to Judge Emily C. Hewitt, opposing party (USA) and CAFC. (dw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003
        JUDGMENT pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. The parties shall bear their own costs. (bb1, )
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Court Filing
          PUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION granting the MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by UNITED STATES. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing the complaint. The parties shall bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (bb1, )
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 ResponseCourt Filing
            REPLY to [8] Dft's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss filed by DOUGLAS G. DEASON, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 6/3/03.(jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 Description not available
              REPLY to Response re [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 5/27/03.(hw1, )
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/26/2003 Response to Motion
                RESPONSE re [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by DOUGLAS G. DEASON. Reply due by 5/29/2003. Service: 5/11/03.(hw1, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003 Terminated:
                  MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) by The United States.Service: 5/2/03. Response due by 6/2/2003 (hw1, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Amended Complaint
                    AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by DOUGLAS G. DEASON. Copies to defendant.Related document: [1] Complaint.(dls, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Appearance by David Allen Harrington for The United States. Service: 3/14/03. (lrd)
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [2-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                          Notice of assignment to Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003, Terminated: 3/11/2003 Terminated:
                            MOTION by DOUGLAS G. DEASON (Service: 3/3/03) to Proceed in Forma Pauperis . Response due: 3/20/03. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT, Answer due on 5/2/03. (FE)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 151 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?