JEWELL SMOKELESS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-00543-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JEWELL SMOKELESS COAL CORPORATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sunoco, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy Markert Seweryn +1 215 977 6556 +1 215 977 6100 nmseweryn@sunocoinc.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/7/2003
Jury Demand
Demand $147000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 5/21/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, dismissing the complaint, without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (dls)
    LREF
    Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Court Filing
    ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to dismiss the case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. RCFC 41(a)(1). See [25]. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
      LREF
      Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008
      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
        LREF
        Legal Document 24 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Court Filing
        ORDER - Continuing stay. Joint Status Report by May 19, 2008, regarding status of any motion for rehearing in Clintwood Elkhorn Mining case, or if none, whether a judgment for dismissal without prejudice can enter. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
          LREF
          Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008
          JOINT STATUS REPORT and Motion for Continued Suspension, filed by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
            LREF
            Legal Document 22 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007 Court Filing
            AMENDED ORDER STAYING CASE Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (snk)
              LREF
              Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007 Court Filing
              ORDER The stay in this case is continued. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (snk)
                LREF
                Legal Document 20 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007
                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006
                  NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 18 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006 Court Filing
                    ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (lg1, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER Paragraph 1 of the order entered on 5/11/04 is modified only insofar as this case is suspended pending further order of the court. Pursuant to paragraph 2 of the order entered on 5/11/04, counsel's June 15 stipulation lists 38 cases to which they agreed to be bound upon issuance of a final decision. Within 30 days of a final decision in any of the cases listed in the parties' joint stipulation, the parties shall file a joint status report advising the court. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jat, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Stipulation
                        JOINT STIPULATION by JEWELL SMOKELESS COAL CORPORATION, USA. (jat, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 15 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [] Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (dw1)
                            LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Stipulation
                            JOINT STIPULATION OF LIABILITY by JEWELL SMOKELESS COAL CORPORATION and USA. Service: 4/29/04.(dw1)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Terminated:
                              JOINT MOTION to Stay Proceedings by JEWELL SMOKELESS COAL CORPORATION and USA.Service: 4/29/04. (dw1) [This entry is part of dkt no. 14]
                                LREF
                                Blank 13 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004 Joint Status Report
                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 4/5/2004.(jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due 6/7/2004 and every 60 days thereafter. (jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Joint Status Report
                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties with further Joint Status Reports at 60 day intervals. Service: 2/2/04.(hw1, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due 4/2/2004 and every 60 days thereafter. (hw1, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Joint Status Report
                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 12/5/03.(jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due 2/3/2004 and every 60 days thereafter. (jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003 Joint Status Report
                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by JEWELL SMOKELESS COAL CORPORATION, USA. Service: 10/6/03.(jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/5/2003 and every 60 days thereafter. (jcp, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 9 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: 8/11/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by JEWELL SMOKELESS COAL CORPORATION, USA. Service: 8/7/03.(jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: 8/11/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/6/2003 and every 60 days thereafter. (jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                    STATUS REPORT ORDER AND ORDER STAYING CASE:Further to the Joint Status Report and Request for Withdrawal of the Order of 6/19/03, 1) The order entered on 6/19/03, is vacated. 2) This case is suspended pending the results of an IRS audit. 3) The parties shall file a Joint Status Report at 60-day intervals, commencing on 8/7/2003, stating with particularity the status of the audit. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION to Withdraw [6] Order of June 19, 2003 and Joint Status Report by JEWELL SMOKELESS COAL CORPORATION, UNITED STATES.Service: 6/27/03. Response due by 7/14/2003 (jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT and Request for Withdrawal of the Order of June 19, 2003 by all parties. Service: 6/27/03.(jcp, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties Joint Stipulation due by 7/18/2003. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. [VACATED per Order of 7/7/03] (dw1, ) Modified on 7/9/2003 (jcp, ).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (jcp, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003 Answer
                                                              ANSWER to [1] Complaint by The United States.Service: 5/2/03. JPSR due by 6/23/2003.(hw1, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Charles Stoddart for The United States. Service: 4/3/03.(dw1, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O. C. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Complaint
                                                                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #056618. Answer due on 5/6/03. (FE)
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 157 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?