TRICE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-cv-00559-NBF
District Judge Nancy B. Firestone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RICHARD E. TRICE, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/10/2003
Jury Demand
Demand $10000000
Nature of Suit 528 - Miscellaneous - Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 4/17/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ENDADR
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/22/2003 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
ORDER RETURNING: On March 31, 2003, the court issued an order dismissing pltf's complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Accordingly, the court is returning unfiled pltf's Supplemental Pleadings Motion received August 6, 2003. No further pleadings may be filed in this closed case. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (jcp, )
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003 Supplemental BriefCourt Filing
    SUPPLEMENTAL PLEADINGS, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 7/28/03.(jcp, )
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
      ORDER RETURNING document's. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed on the grounds that this court lacks subject matter jurisdiction. (lld, )
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
          ORDER directing the Clerk to dismiss the case. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (hw1, )
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for The United States. Service: 3/27/03. (lrd)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
              Notice of assignment to Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Terminated:
                MOTION by RICHARD E. TRICE (Service: 3/10/03) to Proceed in Forma Pauperis . Response due: 3/27/03. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT, Answer due on 5/9/03. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                    CASE assigned to ADR Judge Robert H. Hodges. (FE)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 47 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?