SPOONER, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:03-vv-00020-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BAMBI SPOONER, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alice B. Burkin +1 617 345 9800
No Logo SHAWN PRICE, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alice B. Burkin +1 617 345 9800
No Logo SHAWNNA PRICE, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alice B. Burkin +1 617 345 9800
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by Rawls & McNelis PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Levon Terzian +1 804 782 0613 dterzian@rawlsmcnelis.com
Office COFC
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand
Demand $250000
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Dismissed by Special Master
County
Terminated 12/30/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 23 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $20,611.03, was mailed to Alice Burkin, attorney for the petitioners. See letter in file. (bre,)
    LREF
    Blank 22 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioners are awarded attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $20,611.03. This award shall be made payable jointly to petitioners and their attorney. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 DECISION of Special Master - Fees
      DECISION on Attorney's Fees and Costs Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank 20 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Petitioner's Election to Accept Judgment
        Petitioner's Election to Accept [19] Judgment. Service: 1/28/04.(jat, )
          LREF
          Blank 19 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that the petition is dismissed, with prejudice. (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank 18 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 DECISION of Special Master
            DECISION Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (jat, )
              LREF
              Blank 17 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Terminated:
              MOTION for Attorney Fees by SHAWN PRICE, SHAWNNA PRICE, BAMBI SPOONER.Service: 10/28/03. Response due by 11/14/2003 (jmm, )
                LREF
                Blank 16 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 Response
                Respondent's REPLY to Petitioners' notice of intent by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Service: 10/09/03. (jmm, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 15 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 Notice of Intent to Remain in the Program
                  NOTICE OF INTENT to Remain in the Program by Petitioner. Service: 09/22/03.(jmm, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Notice Regarding Statutory Requirement
                    ORDER re: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (jmm, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: 8/26/2003 Scheduling Order
                      SCHEDULING ORDER:Petitioners' counsel shall file notice of her clients' intent to proceed in this matter by no later than Monday, 9/22/2003. Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (jmm, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Margaret Sweeney : A Status Conference was held on August 21, 2003 at 2:00. Ms. Alice Burkin represented petitioners and Mr. David Terzian represented respondent. (als, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 12 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 Description not available
                          TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/21/2003 02:00 PM before Special Master Margaret Sweeney. Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (jmm, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 11 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/29/2003 Respondent's Report
                            Respondent's Report by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Service: 7/28/03. (jat, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 10 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003 Scheduling Order
                              SCHEDULING ORDER:Respondents Report Due by 8/4/2003. Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (jat, )
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/2/2003
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Margaret Sweeney : A Status Conference was held on June 2, 2003 at 10:00 a.m. Alice Burkin represented petitioner and David Terzian represented respondent. (als, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Description not available
                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Telephone Status Conference set for 6/2/2003 10:00 AM before Special Master Margaret Sweeney. Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (jat, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/8/2003 Order
                                    ORDER reassigning this case to Special Master Margaret M. Sweeney. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (jat, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/8/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                      Case reassigned to Special Master Margaret Sweeney. Special Master Richard B. Abell no longer assigned to the case. (jat, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Scheduling Order
                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 6/2/2003 10:00 AM. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (jat, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003
                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on April 1, 2003. (tlj, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003 Description not available
                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/1/2003 10:00 AM. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (jat, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                                              NOTICE of change of address by Alice B. Burkin (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/25/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by David Levon Terzian. Service: 1/21/03. (LTD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Order
                                                  ORDER Respondent's Report due 4/3/03 (signed by Special Master Richard B. Abell). Copy to parties., (LTD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                                    NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master Richard B. Abell. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Petition
                                                      PETITION (filed with Exhibits 1 thru 16) by BAMBI SPOONER, SHAWN PRICE and SHAWNNA PRICE, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT # 055942, Vac. Date: 1/5/01 (Respondent's report due 4/2/03). (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                        CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 191 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?