MA BAY TRANSPORT. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:89-cv-00283-LSM
District Judge Lawrence S. Margolis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goulston & Storrs, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rudolph F. Pierce +1 617 574 4078 +1 617 574 7623 rpierce@goulstonstorrs.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/18/1989
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 134 - Contract - Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 3/23/2007
Origin 4
Reopened 10/5/2006
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '05-5017'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (256) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 237 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day.. Service: 3/22/2007.(lg1, ).
    LREF
    Blank 236 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/28/2007 11:30 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis.The Court will initiate the conference call. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lg1, )
      LREF
      Blank 235 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006 Court Filing
      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/24/2007 11:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lg1, )
        LREF
        Blank 234 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/13/2006 at 11:00 AM before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dls )
          LREF
          Blank 233 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
          NOTICE of Reassignment filed, nunc pro tunc, October 5, 2006. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis for all further proceedings. Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt no longer assigned to the case. (dls )
            LREF
            Blank 232 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006
            MANDATE of CAFC, NUNC PRO TUNC 4/3/2006, affirming in part and vacating in part [227] Judgment Opinion/Order and remanding case. (hw1, )
              LREF
              Blank 231 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: 11/16/2004 Terminated:
              CAFC Case Number 05-5017 for [230] Notice of Appeal filed by MASSACHUSETTS BAY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY. (hw1, )
                LREF
                Blank 230 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: 11/10/2004, Terminated: 10/5/2006 Notice of Appeal
                NOTICE OF APPEAL by MASSACHUSETTS BAY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 061716. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 229 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/10/2004 Certified Transcript to Attorney
                  Certified transcript of judgment, dated October 13, 2004, forwarded to Rudolph F. Pierce. See letter in file. (bre,)
                    LREF
                    Blank 228 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004
                    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $1,075,242.03. (lld, ) Dollar amount Modified due to clerical error on 10/13/2004 (lld, ).
                      LREF
                      Blank 227 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004 Unpublished Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER and OPINION. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of plaintiff in the amount of $1,075,242.03. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (lld, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 226 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Stipulation of Dismissal
                        JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice of Pltf's Headhouse Floors and Terrazzo Floors Claims by all parties. Service: 2/25/2004.(jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 225 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of LawCourt Filing
                          Proposed Findings of Fact and Rulings of Law by MASSACHUSETTS BAY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, Filed by Leave of the Judge. (jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 224 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
                            ORDER RETURNING Proposed Findings of Fact and Ruling of Law received 6/13/03. Because: 1) the filing was not signed by the attorney of record for Pltf, as required by Rules 11, and 83.1(c)(2) of the RCFC; and 2) the correct number of copies was not submitted with the filing, as required by RCFC 5.1 and 5.3(d), the Clerk of the Court is directed to return the document to Pltf unfiled. Pltf shall correct these defects promptly. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 222 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                              Appendix of PROPOSED FINDINGS of Fact by UNITED STATES. Service: 6/12/03.(hw1, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 221 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Post-Trial Brief
                                POST TRIAL BRIEF by UNITED STATES. (hw1, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 223 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [220] Motion for Extension of Time to file Post Trial Brief due 6/13/2003. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (hw1, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 220 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003, Terminated: 6/10/2003 Terminated:
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until June 13, 2003 to file Post-Trial Brief and Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/3/03. Response due by 6/20/2003 (jat, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 219 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [218] Motion for Extension of Time to file post-trial briefs and proposed findings of uncontroverted fact. Post Trial Brief due 6/6/2003. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (dw1, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 218 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003, Terminated: 5/8/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/6/03 to file by MASSACHUSETTS BAY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, and The United States, filed by leave of the Judge.Service: 5/6/03. (hw1, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 217 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 Court Filing
                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: filed with Exhibit's (Pltfs. Exh. 1 and Defts. Exh. 535-536) held on March 11, 2003 before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (dw1, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 216 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER Parties' Post-trial briefs due 5/9/03 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003
                                              Evidentiary Hearing held ( Transcript due 4/10/03 ) (DS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 215 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER denying [205-1] motion objecting to trial, denying [205-2] motion for entry of judgment, etc. (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 214 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Response to Motion
                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/6/03 ) to [212-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the motion objecting to trial and for etnry of judgment, etc. Reply due: 3/20/03 (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 213 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [212-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the motion objecting to trial and for etnry of judgment, etc. Response to [205-1] motion objecting to trial due 3/7/03 and [205-2] motion for entry of judgment, etc., due 3/7/03 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 212 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003, Terminated: 3/4/2003 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 3/3/03) to Extend Time to respond to the motion objecting to trial and for etnry of judgment, etc. . until 3/7/03. Response due: 3/20/03. (LTD)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 211 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Terminated:
                                                        Prehearing memorandum by USA. Service: 2/26/03. (LTD)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 210 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [208-1] motion to Extend Time to file pre-trial submissions Defendant's Pre-trial submissions due 2/26/03 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 209 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [207-1] motion to Extend Time to file pre-trial submissions Pre-trial submissions due 2/21/03 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 208 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003, Terminated: 2/26/2003 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 2/21/03) to Extend Time to file pre-trial submissions until 2/26/03. Response due: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 207 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003, Terminated: 2/24/2003 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 2/19/03) to Extend Time to file pre-trial submissions until 2/21/03. Response due: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 206 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                  PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by MA BAY TRANSPORT. Service: 2/14/03. (LTD)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 205 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003, Terminated: 3/10/2003 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by MA BAY TRANSPORT (Service: 2/14/03) objecting to trial , and for entry of judgment, etc. . Response due: 3/3/03 (HW)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003
                                                                      Status Conference held (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 204 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Transcript
                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of January 8, 2003. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 203 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER Evidentiary Hearing set for 10:00 a.m. on 3/11/03 , and Parties memoranda, witness lists, etc. due 2/18/03 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 202 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER setting Status Conference for 3:30 p.m. on 1/8/03 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 201 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 Status Report
                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 199 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 Status Report
                                                                                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 9/19/02. (LTD)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 200 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting in part, denying in part [198-1] motion to Extend Time to file a status report, denying [198-2] motion to Stay the scheduling of any hearings or submissions of any documents or pleadings on the issue of whether additional evidence is necessary on the damage claims that remain in dispute . Status Report deadline to 9/23/02 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 198 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/17/2002, Terminated: 9/18/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (Service : 9/12/02 ) to Extend Time to file a status report [until September 30, 2002] and to Stay the scheduling of any hearings or submissions of any documents or pleadings on the issue of whether additional evidence is necessary on the damage claims that remain in dispute. Response due: 9/30/02 (JT)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 197 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER Parties' Status Report due 9/19/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 196 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER denying [195-1] motion for hearing on its motion to disqualify trial Judge for bias and prejudice (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 195 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/30/2002, Terminated: 8/16/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                          MOTION by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (Service: 5/23/02) for hearing on its motion to disqualify trial Judge for bias and prejudice . Response due: 6/10/02. (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 194 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [193-1] motion to Extend Time to identify additional expert witnesses and provide copies of its expert reports, granting [193-2] motion to Extend Time for Defendant to complate depositions of designated experts by 5/20/02 and by 6/14/02 (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 193 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002, Terminated: 5/14/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                              MOTION by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (Service: 5/8/02) to Extend Time to identify additional expert witnesses and provide copies of its expert reports until 5/20/02 and to Extend Time for Defendant to complate depositions of designated experts until 6/14/02. Response due: 5/28/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD) Modified on 05/14/2002
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 192 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 4/15/02) to [187-1] motion to Disqualify Judge. Reply due: 4/29/02 (DS)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 191 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [190-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to the Motion to Disquality Judge for Bias and Prejudice Response to [187-1] motion to Disqualify Judge due 4/15/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 190 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 3/22/2002, Terminated: 3/26/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 3/21/02) to Extend Time to file response to the Motion to Disquality Judge for Bias and Prejudice until 4/15/02. Response due: 4/8/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 189 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER, re: Modification of pre-trial schedule (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 188 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT. Service: 3/1/02. (FILED WITH MOTION TO AMEND ORDER FILED 2/6/02). Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD) Modified on 03/06/2002
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 187 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                          MOTION by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (Service: 3/4/02) to Disqualify Judge for bias and prejudice. Response due: 3/21/02 (DS)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 186 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER Status Report deadline to 3/1/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 185 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/15/2002
                                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT filed. (DS)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 184 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER Status Report deadline to 2/15/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 183 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002
                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 182 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [181-1] motion to Extend Time to file joint status report Joint Status Report due 1/18/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 181 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002, Terminated: 1/14/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 1/11/02) to Extend Time to file joint status report (to January 18, 2002). (DS)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 180 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER Joint Report deadline to 1/11/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 179 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: 12/13/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT filed. (DS)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 178 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [177-1] motion to Extend Time to file the joint status report Joint Status Report deadline to 12/12/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 177 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: 12/7/2001, Terminated: 12/11/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 12/6/01) to Extend Time to file the joint status report , (until December 12, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 175 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001, Terminated: 11/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 11/29/01) to Extend Time to file joint status report (to December 7, 2001). (DS)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 176 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [175-1] motion to Extend Time to file joint status report ( signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 174 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001 Transcript
                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume (24 pages), at Washington, D.C., for date of October 3, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 173 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status report due on 11/30/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 172 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 10/3/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 171 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                          MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated August 24, 2001 affirming/reversing in part [162-1] judgment order (HW)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                            CAFC Case Number Re: [170-1] appeal by MA BAY TRANSPORT. CAFC NUMBER: 00-5071 (HW)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 170 Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: 4/26/2000, Terminated: 8/24/2001 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL by MA BAY TRANSPORT. Copy to Judge Diane G. Weinstein, C.A.F.C. and defendant. FILING FEE $ 105. RECEIPT # 049505. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 169 Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: 4/21/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: On March 29, 2000, defendant moved for costs pursuant to Rule 68, plaintiff responded opposing these costs on April 5, 2000, costs will be taxed after the resolution of appellate proceedings (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 168 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: 4/19/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to [166-1] objection bill of costs by MA BAY TRANSPORT. Service:4/18/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 167 Filed: 4/12/2000, Entered: 4/13/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gregory Thomas Jaeger. Service : 4/12/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 166 Filed: 4/5/2000, Entered: 4/6/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION ( Reply due 4/17/00 ) by MA BAY TRANSPORT. to [165-1] bill of costs by USA. Service: 4/4/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 165 Filed: 3/29/2000, Entered: 3/30/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                        Bill of costs by USA. Service: 3/29/00 ( Objection to Bill of Costs due by 4/17/00 ) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 164 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: 3/10/2000
                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated March 9, 2000, forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 163 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ERRATA - on line two (2) of the Court's 3/2/00 Order, replace "February 1" with "February 11.". ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 162 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/3/2000
                                                                                                                                                              JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that judgment is entered in favor of defendant on Counts II and VI of the Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall recover damages of and from the United States, on Count IV of the Amended Complaint, in the amount of $275,189.00, plus interest in the amount of $218,386.00, pursuant to the Intergovernmental Cooperation Act ("ICA"), 31 U.S.C. Sec. 6503, from November 1985, through February 2000. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/3/2000
                                                                                                                                                                Case closed (LD)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 161 Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: 3/2/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER directing the clerk to enter judgment pursuant to the court's orders filed May 14, 1999, and February 1, 2000, and the parties' stipulation as to damages on Count IV of the amended complaint, filed February 29, 2000. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 160 Filed: 2/29/2000, Entered: 3/1/2000 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulation as to damages on Count IV of the Amended Complaint (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 159 Filed: 2/11/2000, Entered: 2/14/2000 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      UNPUBLISHED DECISION denying Rule 43 motion, denying [153-1] motion to strike declarations of Richard U. Cogswell, denying [136-1] motion to modify [133-1] Scheduling order, and denying as moot [157-1] motion for entry of final judgment on Counts III and VI of the amended complaint. The Court awards Plaintiff damages on Count IV of the amended complaint in the amount of $275,189. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 3/1/00 for the parties to file a joint stipulation stating the interest due on this award according to the method mandated in ICA, 31 U.S.C. Sec. 6503(d)(1). ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 158 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/18/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/14/00 ) to [157-1] motion for entry of final judgment on Counts III and VI of the amended complaint. Reply due: 1/31/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 157 Filed: 1/7/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000, Terminated: 2/11/2000 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (Service : 1/6/00 ) for entry of final judgment on Counts III and VI of the amended complaint. Response due: 1/24/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 156 Filed: 11/8/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/5/99 ) to [153-1] motion to strike declarations of Richard U. Cogswell. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 11/17/99 (reply to response to motion included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 156 Filed: 11/8/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [149-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/5/99 (response to motion to strike included) (JT) Modified on 11/12/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 155 Filed: 9/24/1999, Entered: 9/29/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [154-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply brief. Defendant's reply to response to motion reset to 11/15/99 for [149-1] motion for summary judgment. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 154 Filed: 9/23/1999, Entered: 9/24/1999, Terminated: 9/24/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 9/21/99) to Extend Time to file reply brief , (until November 15, 1999). [by leave of the Judge] (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 153 Filed: 9/20/1999, Entered: 9/24/1999, Terminated: 2/11/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (Service : 9/16/99 ) to strike declarations of Richard U. Cogswell. Response due: 10/4/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 152 Filed: 9/20/1999, Entered: 9/24/1999 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by MA BAY TRANSPORT. Service: 9/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 151 Filed: 9/20/1999, Entered: 9/24/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (Service: 9/16/99 ) to [149-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due: 10/4/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 150 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/23/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 8/20/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 149 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/23/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 8/20/99) for Summary Judgment on the issue of damages. Response due: 9/20/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 148 Filed: 8/12/1999, Entered: 8/12/1999, Terminated: 3/3/2000 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to [146-1] response by MA BAY TRANSPORT, by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/11/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 147 Filed: 8/11/1999, Entered: 8/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER set Defendant's summary judgment motion filing deadline to 8/30/99. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 145 Filed: 8/5/1999, Entered: 8/5/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL STATUS REPORT by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/3/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 146 Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 8/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by MA BAY TRANSPORT. to [144-2] order. Service: 8/3/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 144 Filed: 7/21/1999, Entered: 7/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER set Plaintiff's response deadline to Defendant's 7/7/99 response and 7/14/99 reply to 8/5/99. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 143 Filed: 7/14/1999, Entered: 7/15/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to [141-1] response by MA BAY TRANSPORT. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 142 Filed: 7/7/1999, Entered: 7/8/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 7/7/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 141 Filed: 7/6/1999, Entered: 7/7/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by MA BAY TRANSPORT. to [133-1] order. Service: 7/2/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 140 Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/21/99) to [136-1] motion to modify [133-1] Scheduling order. Reply due: 7/6/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 139 Filed: 6/15/1999, Entered: 6/18/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [138-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to motion to modify the Court's May 14, 1999 order. Defendant's response to [136-1] motion to modify [133-1] Scheduling order reset to 6/21/99. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 138 Filed: 6/11/1999, Entered: 6/16/1999, Terminated: 6/15/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 6/11/99) to Extend Time to file response to motion to modify the Court's May 14, 1999 order , (until June 21, 1999). Response due: 6/28/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 137 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (Service: 5/28/99 ) to [134-1] motion to Extend Time to file the joint status report. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 136 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (Service : 5/28/99 ) to modify [133-1] Scheduling order. Response due: 6/14/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Deadline updated; Defendant's response to [136-1] motion to modify [133-1] scheduling order reset to 6/14/99. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 135 Filed: 5/27/1999, Entered: 6/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part, denying in part [134-1] motion to Extend Time to file the joint status report. Reset joint status report deadline to 7/7/99. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 134 Filed: 5/24/1999, Entered: 5/27/1999, Terminated: 5/27/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 5/24/99 ) to Extend Time to file the joint status report [until August 7, 1999]. Response due: 6/10/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 133 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER setting Joint Status Report due on 6/7/99 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 132 Filed: 10/15/1998, Entered: 10/20/1998 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 6 volumes, at Boston, Massachusetts, for date of September 14, 1998 through September 22, 1998, together with cumulative index, and defendant's exhibits (400, 401 [oversized drawing], 402, 403 A-Y, 404-504, 505 A-B, 506 A-E, 507 A-C, 508, 509 A-C, 510-514, 515 A&B, 517-528, 530 A&B, 531-533 and 534 A&B. Notice to parties. (FE) Modified on 10/20/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 131 Filed: 10/6/1998, Entered: 10/8/1998 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  POST-TRIAL FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by USA. Service: 10/6/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 130 Filed: 10/6/1998, Entered: 10/8/1998 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by MA BAY TRANSPORT. Service: 10/5/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/22/1998, Entered: 9/24/1998 Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Trial held ( Transcript due 10/22/98 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 129 Filed: 9/15/1998, Entered: 9/15/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of September 8, 1998. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 128 Filed: 9/9/1998, Entered: 9/14/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying as moot Defendant's motion to admit the declaration of Carl Locken and denying [101-1] motion for Summary Judgment. The parties shall raise any objections by motions in limine, which shall be filed by facsimile on or before 9/9/98, 12:00 noon. Set Trial for 9:00 a.m. 9/14/98 - 9/25/98 in Boston, Massachusetts. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 127 Filed: 9/9/1998, Entered: 9/11/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 9/9/98 ) to [126-1] motion in Limine to exclude "CPM" evidence offered in connection with the section 222(c) insurance count, [125-1] motion in Limine to exclude the testimony of Leonard Silver. Reply due: 9/21/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 126 Filed: 9/9/1998, Entered: 9/11/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (Service : 9/9/98 ) in Limine to exclude "CPM" evidence offered in connection with the section 222(c) insurance count. Response due: 9/28/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 125 Filed: 9/9/1998, Entered: 9/11/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (Service : 9/9/98 ) in Limine to exclude the testimony of Leonard Silver. Response due: 9/28/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/8/1998, Entered: 9/9/1998 Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Pre-Trial Conference held ( Transcript due 10/8/98 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 124 Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: 9/9/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA to [120-2] order. Service: 8/4/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 123 Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: 9/9/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by MA BAY TRANSPORT (Service : 9/3/98 ) to admit declaration and certified public record or, alteratively, to subpoena witness, etc. Response due: 9/21/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 122 Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: 9/8/1998 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Revised Witness list by MA BAY TRANSPORT. Service: 9/3/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 121 Filed: 9/2/1998, Entered: 9/3/1998 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          (Revised) STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 9/2/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 120 Filed: 9/1/1998, Entered: 9/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 9/8/98 for Defendant to file a statement of genuine issues. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 119 Filed: 9/1/1998, Entered: 9/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER set revised witness lists deadline to 9/4/98. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 117 Filed: 8/28/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by MA BAY TRANSPORTATION to response to [101-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 8/27/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 118 Filed: 8/27/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA to [115-2] order. Service: 8/27/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 116 Filed: 8/27/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 8/27/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 115 Filed: 8/25/1998, Entered: 8/26/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER filing by leave of the court Defendant's response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on Count IV and for partial summary judgment on Counts III and VI, of the amended complaint. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 9/11/98 for Defendant to file a statement of genuine issues as well as the original affidavit of Mr. Cogswell, or explain why it believes it need not do so. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 08/26/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 114 Filed: 8/25/1998, Entered: 8/26/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/24/98 ) to [101-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 9/10/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 113 Filed: 8/21/1998, Entered: 8/21/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [98-1] motion for a continuance of the trial date. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 112 Filed: 8/18/1998, Entered: 8/19/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by MA BAY TRANSPORT. to response to [98-1] motion continuance of trial date. Service: 8/17/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 109 Filed: 8/15/1998, Entered: 8/17/1998 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by USA. Service: 8/14/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 111 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/18/1998 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STATEMENT OF CONTROVERTED FACTS AND LAW (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 110 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/18/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/14/98) to [98-1] motion continuance of trial date. Reply due: 8/28/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 108 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/17/1998 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit list by MA BAY TRANSPORT. Service: 8/13/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 107 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/17/1998 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by MA BAY TRANSPORT. Service: 8/13/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 106 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/17/1998 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness list by MA BAY TRANSPORT. Service: 8/13/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 105 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/17/1998 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Witness list by USA. Service: 8/14/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 104 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/17/1998 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Witness list by USA. Service: 8/14/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 103 Filed: 8/6/1998, Entered: 8/11/1998 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              THIRD DECLARATION OF JAMES F. WRIGHT by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 102 Filed: 8/6/1998, Entered: 8/11/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by MA BAY TRANSPORT. to [99-2] order. Service: 8/5/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 101 Filed: 7/30/1998, Entered: 8/7/1998, Terminated: 9/9/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by MA BAY TRANSPORT (Service : 7/27/98 ) for Summary Judgment , on Count IV and for partial summary judgment on Count III and VI of the Amended Complaint (together with separate two volume appendix. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 8/27/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 100 Filed: 7/30/1998, Entered: 8/7/1998 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by MA BAY TRANSPORT, by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/27/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 99 Filed: 7/30/1998, Entered: 8/5/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: Plaintiff's Motion for summary judgment on count IV and for partial summary judgment on counts III and VI of the amended complaint, etc., by 8/10/98 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 98 Filed: 7/30/1998, Entered: 8/3/1998, Terminated: 8/21/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (Service : 7/29/98 ) continuance of trial date . Response due: 8/19/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 97 Filed: 6/29/1998, Entered: 7/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [94-1] motion to Amend [93-2] order specifying issues remaining for trial ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 96 Filed: 6/15/1998, Entered: 6/16/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by MA BAY TRANSPORT. to response to [94-1] motion to Amend [93-2] order specifying issues remaining for trial. Service: 6/12/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 95 Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/1/98 ) to [94-1] motion to Amend [93-2] order specifying issues remaining for trial. Reply due: 6/15/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 94 Filed: 5/18/1998, Entered: 5/21/1998, Terminated: 6/29/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (Service : 5/15/98 ) to Amend [93-2] order specifying issues remaining for trial Response due: 6/4/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 93 Filed: 5/1/1998, Entered: 5/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER that the (adjusted) trial schedule established by the Court's April 1, 1998 Order remains in effect. ( Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 92 Filed: 4/28/1998, Entered: 5/1/1998 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by MA BAY TRANSPORT. Service: 4/27/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 90 Filed: 4/27/1998, Entered: 4/28/1998 Certified Transcript to Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT for payment of costs taxed forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 91 Filed: 4/23/1998, Entered: 4/28/1998 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 4/23/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 89 Filed: 4/20/1998, Entered: 4/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER mooting [87-1] motion to have court review clerk's action on bill of costs. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 88 Filed: 4/17/1998, Entered: 4/21/1998 Costs TaxedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental Taxation of Costs for MA BAY TRANSPORT. in the amount of $1,366.50 for plaintiff. (Taxation of Costs filed 4/9/98 Vacated by Clerk this date) (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties and to Judge. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 88 Filed: 4/16/1998, Entered: 4/20/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER set Joint Status Report deadline to 4/30/98. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 87 Filed: 4/14/1998, Entered: 4/15/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (Service : 4/13/98 ) to have court review clerk's action on bill of costs. Response due: 4/30/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 4/9/1998, Entered: 4/21/1998 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Costs Taxed this date vacated by Clerk's Supplemental Taxation of Costs filed April 17, 1998. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 85 Filed: 4/8/1998, Entered: 4/9/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 4/8/98 ) to [81-1] motion to specify issues remaining for trial. Reply due: 4/20/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 84 Filed: 4/1/1998, Entered: 4/3/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [83-1] motion to Amend [76-1] Scheduling order. reset parties' Appendix G deadline on 8/14/98 , reset Pretrial Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 9/8/98 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 82 Filed: 3/27/1998, Entered: 3/27/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 25, 1998. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 3/25/1998, Entered: 3/30/1998, Terminated: 4/1/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by MA BAY TRANSPORT., USA to Amend [76-1] Scheduling order. Response due: 3/1/95 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 81 Filed: 3/18/1998, Entered: 3/20/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (Service : 3/17/98 ) to specify issues remaining for trial. Response due: 4/3/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 80 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: 3/16/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [77-1] motion to reschedule the trial date. Reset Trial for 9/14/98 through 9/25/98. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 79 Filed: 3/12/1998, Entered: 3/12/1998, Terminated: 3/3/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by MA BAY TRANSPORT (Service: 3/9/98 ) to [77-1] motion to reschedule the trial date. Reply due: 3/23/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 78 Filed: 3/9/1998, Entered: 3/11/1998 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Orders originally filed on July 19, 1996, and August 7, 1996, are being reissued for publication. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 77 Filed: 3/5/1998, Entered: 3/6/1998, Terminated: 3/13/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 3/5/98 ) to reschedule the trial date. Response due: 3/23/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 76 Filed: 2/26/1998, Entered: 2/27/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting: (1) Pretrial Conference for 2:00 p.m., 7/20/98; (2) Final witness and exhibit lists and Appendix G submissions by 6/19/98; (3) Trial will be held 7/27/98 through 8/7/98 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/25/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Status Conference held ( Transcript due 3/27/98 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 2/5/1998, Entered: 2/9/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference at 2:00 on 2/25/98. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 1/22/1998, Entered: 1/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MANDATE (certified copy) reversing the [62-1] judgment order. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 73 Filed: 12/3/1997, Entered: 12/16/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Bill of costs by MA BAY TRANSPORT. Service: 12/2/97 ( Objection to Bill of Costs due by 12/19/97 ) (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 11/4/1996, Entered: 11/8/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to [67-1] objection bill of costs by MA BAY TRANSPORT. Service:11/4/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 10/24/1996, Entered: 10/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION (Reply due 11/7/96) by MA BAY TRANSPORT. to [70-1] bill of costs by USA. Service: 10/24/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 10/11/1996, Entered: 10/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Bill of costs by USA. Service: 10/11/96 ( Objection to Bill of Costs due by 10/28/96 ). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to [67-1] objection bill of costs by MA BAY TRANSPORT. Service:10/4/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/7/1996 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        UNPUBLISHED DECISION denying [65-1] bill of costs (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 9/26/1996, Entered: 10/2/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION ( Reply due 10/10/96 ) by MA BAY TRANSPORT. to [65-1] bill of costs by USA. Service: 9/25/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 9/25/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of supplement to bill of costs [certification of service] by USA. Service: 9/25/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 9/17/1996, Entered: 9/20/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Bill of costs by USA by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/11/96. (Objection to Bill of Costs due by 9/30/96). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 9/17/1996, Entered: 9/20/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER filing defendant's bill of costs by leave of the Judge and set defendant's Notice of Compliance [certification] deadline to 9/25/96 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 03/11/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/30/1996, Entered: 8/30/1996, Terminated: 3/3/2000 CAFC Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CAFC Case Number Re: [63-1] appeal by MA BAY TRANSPORT. CAFC NUMBER: 96-5128 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 8/22/1996, Entered: 8/27/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL by MA BAY TRANSPORT. Copy to USA, Judge Weinstein and to C.A.F.C. FILING FEE $ 105; RECEIPT # 042121. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 8/12/1996, Entered: 8/28/1996 Judgment*
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 that the judgment is entered in favor of defendant. Costs to prevailing party (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/12/1996, Entered: 8/14/1996 Terminated Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case closed. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 8/7/1996, Entered: 8/13/1996 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          UNPUBLISHED DECISION (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (This decision has been reissued for publication. See remark of March 9, 1998.) (FE) Modified on 03/11/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 8/6/1996, Entered: 8/12/1996 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Trial, 1 volume, at Boston, Massachusetts, for date of July 22, 1996. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 8/1/1996, Entered: 8/7/1996 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re:Pre-trial conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 9, 1996. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/22/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996 Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Trial held. ( Transcript due 8/21/96 ) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 7/19/1996, Entered: 7/24/1996 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORRECTED COPY of NOTICE of TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re:Oral Argument, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 17, 1996. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 7/19/1996, Entered: 7/24/1996 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Oral Argument, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 17, 1996. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 7/19/1996, Entered: 7/23/1996 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting [33-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the claims involving change orders outlined in said decision (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (This decision has been reissued for publication. See remark of March 9, 1998.) (FE) Modified on 03/11/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 7/18/1996, Entered: 7/23/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [33-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 7/18/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 54 Filed: 7/17/1996, Entered: 7/19/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/15/96) to [35-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 8/1/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 7/17/1996, Entered: 7/19/1996 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/15/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/17/1996, Entered: 7/22/1996 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Oral Argument re: [35-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment by MA BAY TRANSPORT. ( Transcript due 8/16/96 ), [33-1] motion for Summary Judgment by USA (Transcript due 8/16/96). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 7/16/1996, Entered: 7/18/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [45-1] motion to Strike exhibit offered by defendant in support of its motion for summary judgment (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 7/10/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER set Additional Documents [consolidated exhibit lists] due: 7/15/96 for USA and MA BAY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY , Response to admission of oral or documentary evidence, motions in limine or other motions that can be anticipated in advance of trial by 7/17/96 , oral argument set for 11:00 a.m. on 7/17/96 for [35-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment and [33-1] motion for Summary Judgment , and set Trial for 9:00 a.m. on 7/22/96 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 7/9/1996, Entered: 7/12/1996 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of LawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT ISSUES OF FACT AND LAW [joint statement of controverted facts and law] by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 7/9/1996, Entered: 7/12/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER filing the joint statement of controverted facts and law by leave of the Judge (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 07/12/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/9/1996, Entered: 7/22/1996 Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pre-Trial Conference held. ( Transcript due 8/8/96 ) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 7/8/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (Service: 7/5/96) to [33-1] motion for Summary Judgment and one volume Appendix III. Reply due: 7/22/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 7/8/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by MA BAY TRANSPORT. Service: 7/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 7/8/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by MA BAY TRANSPORT. Service: 7/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 7/8/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996, Terminated: 7/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (Service: 7/5/96) to Strike exhibit offered by defendant in support of its motion for summary judgment . Response due: 7/22/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 7/8/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA [by leave of the Judge]. Service: 7/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 7/3/1996, Entered: 7/10/1996 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by USA Service: 7/3/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 7/3/1996, Entered: 7/10/1996 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit list by USA Service: 7/3/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 7/3/1996, Entered: 7/10/1996 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness list by USA Service: 7/3/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 7/3/1996, Entered: 7/10/1996 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by MA BAY TRANSPORT. Service: 7/2/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 7/3/1996, Entered: 7/10/1996 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Witness list by MA BAY TRANSPORT. Service: 7/2/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 7/3/1996, Entered: 7/10/1996 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit list by MA BAY TRANSPORT. Service: 7/2/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 6/27/1996, Entered: 7/2/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER reset Trial for 9:00 a.m. on 7/19-8/2/96 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 6/25/1996, Entered: 6/27/1996 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by MA BAY TRANSPORT [by levae of the Judge]. Service: 6/14/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of change of address by Agnes Marie Brown (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/27/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (Service : 6/14/96 ) for partial Summary Judgment (Counts III, IV, V and VI of the amended complaint) and memorandum with two volume appendix [by leave of the Judge]. Response due: 7/15/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 6/18/1996, Entered: 6/19/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 6/14/96) for Summary Judgment and one volume appendix by leave of the Judge. Response due: 7/15/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 6/18/1996, Entered: 6/19/1996 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/14/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 5/14/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part, denying in part [28-1] motion for Leave to File to preclude defendant from introducing expert testimony, etc., reset Discovery deadline to 6/21/96 , and reset Motion Filing deadline to 6/25/96 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 5/7/1996, Entered: 5/10/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by MA BAY TRANSPORT. to response to [28-1] motion for Leave to File to preclude defendant from introducing expert testimony, etc. Service: 5/6/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 5/2/1996, Entered: 5/6/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 4/29/96 ) to [28-1] motion for Leave to File to preclude defendant from introducing expert testimony, etc. Reply due: 5/13/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 5/2/1996, Entered: 5/6/1996, Terminated: 5/14/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File to preclude defendant from introducing expert testimony, etc. , (by leave of the Judge). Response due: 5/13/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 5/1/1996, Entered: 5/6/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA to [26-1] Scheduling order. Service: 5/1/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 4/24/1996, Entered: 4/29/1996 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 5/31/96; Motion Filing deadline on 6/14/96; Pretrial Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 7/9/96; Plaintiff's Appendix G deadline on 7/3/96; Defendant's Appendix G deadline on 7/3/96 and Brief deadline set on 5/10/96 Trial deadline set on 7/16/96 (signed by Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: 4/23/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (Service: 4/11/96 ) to defendant's [24-2] motion to Extend Time to reschedule the trial date. Reply due: 4/25/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 4/8/1996, Entered: 4/10/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 4/8/96) to Extend Time to complete discovery until 5/31/96, and to Extend Time to reschedule the trial date until 8/14/96. Response due: 4/25/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/28/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [22-1] joint motion to Extend Time within which to complete discovery, reset Discovery deadline to 5/2/96 and reset Trial for 7/9-23/96 (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 12/4/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995, Terminated: 12/18/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT MOTION by MA BAY TRANSPORT. and USA to Extend Time within which to complete discovery , (until May 2, 1996). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 10/12/1995, Entered: 11/1/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [16-1] motion for Clarification of July 31, 1990 order and allowing plaintiff to amend the complaint to restore count three. (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 9/18/1995, Entered: 9/20/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 9/15/95) to [16-1] motion for Clarification of July 31, 1995 opinion. Reply due: 9/29/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 9/15/1995, Entered: 9/19/1995 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 9/8/1995, Entered: 9/11/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of August 15, 1995. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 9/5/1995, Entered: 9/11/1995 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to amended Complaint by USA Service: 9/5/95 ( JPSR due 10/23/95 ) (FE) Modified on 09/11/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 9/1/1995, Entered: 9/6/1995, Terminated: 10/12/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (Service: 9/1/95) for Clarification of July 31, 1990 order . Response due: 9/18/95. (HW) Modified on 11/01/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (Answer due 9/12/95 ) amending [1-1] complaint Service: 8/25/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER entered pursuant to discussion at status conference ; set Additional Documents due: 8/25/95 for MA BAY TRANSPORT. (amended complaint with defendant's answer 10 days after service; JPSR within 10 days after service of the answer) , and set Motion Filing (plaintiff's amended motion for revision of the court's order, 7/31/90) deadline to 9/1/95 , and set Discovery deadline to 2/2/96 , and set Trial for 3/5/96 through 3/19/96 ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; reset Trial for 3/5/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/15/1995, Entered: 8/16/1995 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Status Conference held ( Transcript due 9/14/95 ) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER set Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 8/15/95 (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: 7/27/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE [no objection] by USA (Service: 7/25/95 ) to [11-1] motion to Vacate [4-2] order (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 7/25/1995, Entered: 7/26/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by MA BAY TRANSPORT. (Service : 7/24/95 ) to Vacate [4-2] order (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 6/28/1995, Entered: 6/29/1995 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by MA BAY TRANSPORT., USA (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/28/1995, Entered: 6/29/1995 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deadline updated; Status Report deadline to 11/1/95 [4 months] (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 3/1/1995, Entered: 3/3/1995 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by MA BAY TRANSPORT., USA. Service: 3/1/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/1/1995, Entered: 3/3/1995 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; set Status Report deadline to 7/3/95 (4 months). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 2/14/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER set joint Status Report deadline to 3/1/95 and every four months thereafter (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 3/28/1994, Entered: 3/30/1994 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by MA BAY TRANSPORT. and USA. Service: 3/25/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 3/14/1994, Entered: 3/17/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER entered directing parties to file a joint status report regarding the status of proceedings in this case within 14 days of receipt of this order (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 9/24/1993, Entered: 3/17/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Agnes Marie Brown Service : 9/24/93 (FE) Modified on 03/17/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/8/1992, Entered: 3/17/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF CLARIFICATION entered in this case was Stayed for all purposes on 12/26/92. The stay applies to all proceedings including defendant's obligation to participate in discovery. The defendant's motion for a protetive order was not granted (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein) Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 07/26/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/6/1992, Entered: 3/17/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 1/6/92) for Clarification of order dated 12/26/91 . (FE) Modified on 11/01/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 11/2/1990, Entered: 3/16/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of reassignment to Judge Diane G. Weinstein filed in 90-756C. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 5/18/1989, Entered: 3/16/1994 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $120. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 139 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?