ALLISON VILLIAGE, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:90-cv-00006-RBA
District Judge Roger B. Andewelt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALL PLAINTIFFS, Plaintiff
No Logo ALLISON VILLAGE ASSOCIATES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles L. Edson +1 202 585 8000
No Logo BULLDOGGER APARTMENT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles L. Edson +1 202 585 8000
No Logo COLINAS DE SAN JUAN ASSOCIATES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles L. Edson +1 202 585 8000
No Logo DANA A. PATTERSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles L. Edson +1 202 585 8000
No Logo GAINESVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles L. Edson +1 202 585 8000
No Logo IRONMAN APARTMENTS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles L. Edson +1 202 585 8000
No Logo MONSERRATE ASSOCIATE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles L. Edson +1 202 585 8000
No Logo SECURITY PROPERTIES - '80, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles L. Edson +1 202 585 8000
No Logo STREETSBORO GREEN, AN OHIO LIMITED, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles L. Edson +1 202 585 8000
No Logo TURABO LIMITED DIVIDEND PARTNERSHIP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles L. Edson +1 202 585 8000
No Logo VICTORIA ARMS APARTMENTS, LTD., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles L. Edson +1 202 585 8000
No Logo VILLAGE EAST TOWER, LTD.,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles L. Edson +1 202 585 8000
No Logo WINHAVEN ASSOCIATES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles L. Edson +1 202 585 8000
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terrence Steven Hartman
Office COFC
Filed 1/2/1990
Jury Demand
Demand $3000000
Nature of Suit 128 - Contract - Subsidy
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 2/21/1995
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
187-cv-00006-RBA None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED, MEMBER
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: 3/17/1995
**Set appeal flag. See Lead Case 6-87 C for appeal. ** (HW)
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 3/3/1995 Terminated:
    SEE LEAD CASE NO. 6-87C FOR JUDGMENT entered this date. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 3/3/1995 Terminated Case
      Case closed. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 1/26/1994, Entered: 2/2/1994 Terminated:
        See Case No. 87-6 C for judgment entered in this and consolidated cases. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 1/24/1994, Entered: 2/2/1994 Terminated:
          See Case No. 87-6 C for court's order entered in this and consolidated cases. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 1/31/1990, Entered: 2/2/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
            ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Consolidate this Case (signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 1/31/1990, Entered: 2/2/1994 Terminated:
              SEE CASE NO. 6-87 C FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 1/30/1990, Entered: 2/2/1994, Terminated: 1/31/1990 Terminated:
                MOTION by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Service : 1/30/90 by hand) to Consolidate this Case with 6-87C, 324-87C, and 204-88C. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/30/1990, Entered: 2/2/1994 Set/Clear Flags
                  Consolidated Member Case. Lead Case Number: 87-6. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 1/2/1990, Entered: 2/2/1994 Terminated:
                    NOTICE of related cases (Nos. 6-87C, 324-87C, and 204-88C) by ALL PLAINTIFFS entered. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/1990, Entered: 2/1/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                      Notice of assignment to Judge Roger B. Andewelt . Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/1990, Entered: 2/1/1994 Terminated:
                        COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $ 120. (FE)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 158 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?