FLANAGAN, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:90-vv-01518-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo CATHERINE ALEXANDRA ELLIOTT, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Wahten Morgan
No Logo MARY CROWE FLANAGAN, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Wahten Morgan
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Curtis Raby +1 202 616 4111 mark.raby@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/26/1990
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 434 - Injunctive Relief
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 8/21/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 4/1/1996, Entered: 4/4/1996 Satisfaction of Judgment
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $19,909.18 received from HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 3/7/1996, Entered: 3/12/1996 Judgment Forwarded (Election)
    Certified copy of judgment awarding counsel fees and expenses forwarded to HHS. See letter in file (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 11 Filed: 3/7/1996, Entered: 3/12/1996 Judgment*
      JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a) awarding petitioner attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $19,909.18 (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 2/5/1996, Entered: 3/12/1996 Motion for Attorney Fees
        MOTION by MARY CROWE FLANAGAN (Service: 12/29/95) for Attorney Fees . (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 9 Filed: 2/5/1996, Entered: 2/9/1996 Published Decision of Special Master - Fees
          Decision of Special Master Richard B. Abell re: attorney's fees and costs. Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 1/25/1996, Entered: 1/31/1996 Motion for Leave to File
            MOTION by MARY CROWE FLANAGAN, CATHERINE ALEXANDRA ELLIOTT (Service : 1/22/96) for Leave to File motion for attorney fees and expenses . Response due: 2/8/96 (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 Judgment*
              JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a) dismissing the petition (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 Terminated Case
                Case closed. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 7/13/1995, Entered: 7/17/1995 DECISION of Special Master
                  Decision of Special Master Richard B. Abell granting motion to dismiss. Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 7/3/1995, Entered: 7/7/1995 Terminated:
                    MOTION by MARY CROWE FLANAGAN, CATHERINE ALEXANDRA ELLIOTT (Service : 6/28/95) to Dismiss . Response due: 7/31/95 (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 6/5/1995, Entered: 6/8/1995 Order
                      ORDER entered directing petitioner to contact special master's law clerk, Stephanie Darr, Esq. by June 26, 1995 to schedule status conference ( signed by Special Master Richard B. Abell ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 11/26/1993, Entered: 8/19/1994 Status Report
                        STATUS REPORT by MARY CROWE FLANAGAN, CATHERINE ALEXANDRA ELLIOTT Service: 11/19/93 (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 3/9/1992, Entered: 8/18/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                          NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master Richard B. Abell. Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 9/26/1990, Entered: 8/18/1994 Petition
                            PETITION by MARY CROWE FLANAGAN, CATHERINE ALEXANDRA ELLIOTT . FILING FEE $ 120. Vac. Date: 12/20/72. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 9/26/1990, Entered: 8/18/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                              CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned . (FE)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 85 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?