MUNSON v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:90-cv-03888-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo MOMOKO MUNSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith Rita Forman +1 310 312 4210
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah A. Bynum +1 202 616 0468 deborah.bynum@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/29/1990
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 3/25/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 8/29/1994, Entered: 7/17/1995 CAFC Mandate Dismissing
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated August 26, 1994, dismissed [9-1] appeal by USA. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/24/1994, Entered: 7/17/1995 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [9-1] appeal by USA. CAFC NUMBER: 94-5119. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 5/24/1994, Entered: 7/17/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA. Copy to Momoko Munson, Judge Merow and to C.A.F.C. Fee waived. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 3/29/1994, Entered: 3/30/1994 Certified Transcript to Attorney
        CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 3/25/1994, Entered: 3/29/1994 Judgment*
          JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 denying defendant's counterclaim, and awarding plaintiff the sum of $90,938.80 with $17,937.21 of this sum to be withheld for federal income tax, resulting in the net amount of $73,001.59 to be awarded to plaintiff in satisfaction of defendant's SBP annuity liability to plaintiff for the period up to January 31, 1994. Judgment was further entered that appropriate records should be corrected by the government to reflect plaintiff's continued entitlement to the SBP annuity payments elected for her by LTC Munson for such payments due and owing after January 31, 1994 (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/25/1994, Entered: 3/29/1994 Terminated Case
            Case closed. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 6 Filed: 3/24/1994, Entered: 3/25/1994 Published DecisionCourt Filing
              PUBLISHED DECISION entered directing the Clerk to enter judgment for plaintiff, and denying defendant's counterclaim. ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ). Copy to parties with plaintiff served via Fed. Ex. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 3/7/1994, Entered: 3/14/1994 Terminated:
                RESPONSE by MOMOKO MUNSON to defendant's status report filed by leave of the judge. Service: 3/3/94 (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 3/1/1994, Entered: 3/14/1994 Status Report
                  STATUS REPORT by USA Service: 2/23/94 (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 3/1/1994, Entered: 3/14/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER entered allowing defendant's 2/23/94 motion; enlarging time for stipulation setting forth amount for entry of final monetary judgement to 3/18/94 , and directing plaintiff's counsel to file a Status Report by 3/18/94 if stipulation cannot be filed (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 03/14/1994
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 10/29/1990, Entered: 3/9/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                      Notice of assignment to Judge James F. Merow. Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 10/29/1990, Entered: 3/9/1994 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $ 120. (FE)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 69 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?