SCHOOR, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:90-vv-00990-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo HOLLY LYN SCHOOR, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Gage +1 307 433 8864 +1 307 635 1511 vaccinelaw@aol.com
No Logo JUDITH A. SCHOOR, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Gage +1 307 433 8864 +1 307 635 1511 vaccinelaw@aol.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark William Rogers +1 202 616 4122 mark.rogers2@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/14/1990
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 424 - (Obj/Revocation Discharge 727
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 3/11/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 9/7/1994, Entered: 9/7/1994
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $30,000 received from HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 8/11/1994, Entered: 8/29/1994 Judgment Forwarded (Election)
    Certified copy of judgment awarding counsel fees and expenses forwarded to HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 11 Filed: 8/5/1994, Entered: 8/8/1994 Judgment*
      JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a) awarding petitioner attorneys' fees and costs in the sum of $30,000.00, with payment to be made by check made payable to Robert T. Moxley, counsel of record (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 6/29/1994, Entered: 7/5/1994 Published Decision of Special Master - Fees
        Decision of Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright re: fees and costs. Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 9 Filed: 6/17/1994, Entered: 6/20/1994 Motion for Attorney Fees
          MOTION by JUDITH A. SCHOOR, HOLLY LYN SCHOOR (Service : 6/14/94 ) for Attorney Fees Response due: 6/28/94 (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 5/27/1994, Entered: 6/2/1994 Satisfaction of Judgment
            SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $275,242. See letter in file. (DS)
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 5/27/1994, Entered: 6/2/1994 Satisfaction of Judgment
              SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $1,379,974. See letter in file. (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 3/23/1994, Entered: 3/30/1994 Judgment Forwarded (Election)
                Certified copy of [election and] judgment forwarded to HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 5 Filed: 3/18/1994, Entered: 3/23/1994 Petitioner's Election
                  PETITIONER'S ELECTION to accept Judgment. Service: 3/14/94 (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 3/11/1994, Entered: 3/14/1994 Judgment*
                    JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a) awarding petitioner compensation as provided in the above referred to special master's decison, with a lump sum payment of $275,354.00 (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/11/1994, Entered: 9/28/1994 Annuity
                      Annuity Amt: $ 1379974. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/11/1994, Entered: 3/14/1994 Terminated Case
                        Case closed. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 2/7/1994, Entered: 3/14/1994 DECISION of Special Master
                          Decision of Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright entered awarding petitioner compensation. Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 03/14/1994
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 6/3/1991, Entered: 3/14/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                            NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright. Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 9/14/1990, Entered: 3/14/1994 Petition
                              PETITION by JUDITH A. SCHOOR and HOLLY LYN SCHOOR. FILING FEE $120. Vac. Date: 8/6/76. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 9/14/1990, Entered: 3/14/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 126 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?