MACHUT, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:90-vv-03068-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo JOSEPH MACHUT, JR., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman James Lerum +1 312 782 1087 njlerum@msn.com
No Logo KAREN MACHUT, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman James Lerum +1 312 782 1087 njlerum@msn.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"
Office COFC
Filed 10/1/1990
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 434 - Injunctive Relief
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 9/25/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 9/25/1995, Entered: 9/25/1995
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a) dismissing the petition for failure to substantiate and to prosecute this case (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/25/1995, Entered: 9/25/1995
    Case closed. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 8/22/1995, Entered: 8/24/1995 DECISION of Special Master
      Decision of Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 4/3/1995, Entered: 4/5/1995 Order
        ORDER entered directing Additional Documents [produce, or verify the unavailability of, certain records requested by the respondent] due by 5/1/95 for JOSEPH MACHUT JR., for KAREN MACHUT (signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 10/18/1994, Entered: 10/24/1994 Order
          ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time within which to produce, or verify the unavailability of, certain records requested by the Respondent set Additional Documents due: 12/12/94 for JOSEPH MACHUT JR. and KAREN MACHUT ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ) Copy to parties. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 10/11/1994, Entered: 10/14/1994, Terminated: 10/18/1994 Terminated:
            MOTION by KAREN MACHUT, JOSEPH MACHUT JR. (Service : 8/16/94) to Extend Time within which to produce, or verify the unavailability of, certain records requested by the Respondent (to 60 days). (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 10/11/1994, Entered: 10/14/1994 Description not available
              Petitioner's Response to Respondent's Review Records. Service: 8/16/94 (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 9/12/1994, Entered: 9/16/1994 notice of filing
                Notice of filing agreement with Petitioner's request for a 60 days extension of time by HHS. Service: 9/12/94 (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 7/5/1994, Entered: 7/12/1994 Order
                  ORDER resetting Petitioner's Response re: Records: 8/11/94 ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 4/5/1994, Entered: 5/10/1994 Order
                    ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to preliminary review/request for records, etc reset Petitioner's Response re: Records: 5/24/94 ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 3/30/1994, Entered: 4/20/1994, Terminated: 4/5/1994 Terminated:
                      MOTION by KAREN MACHUT, JOSEPH MACHUT JR. (Service : 3/25/94 ) to Extend Time to respond to preliminary review/request for records, etc (of 60 days). (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 3/30/1994, Entered: 4/20/1994 Terminated:
                        MOTION by KAREN MACHUT, JOSEPH MACHUT JR. (Service : 3/25/94 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Glen Harris Kanwit for JOSEPH MACHUT, attorney Glen Harris Kanwit for KAREN MACHUT Added Norman James Lerum. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 1/24/1994, Entered: 4/20/1994 Description not available
                          RESPONDENT'S PRELIMINARY REVIEW (RECORDS). SERVICE: 1/24/94 (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 10/7/1993, Entered: 4/20/1994 Order for Preliminary Review
                            ORDER SCHEDULING PRELIMINARY REVIEW ( Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 10/1/1990, Entered: 4/20/1994 Petition
                              PETITION by KAREN MACHUT, JOSEPH MACHUT JR. FILING FEE $ 120 Vac. Date: 01/01/01 (No Shot Date Provided). (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 10/1/1990, Entered: 4/20/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                CASE assigned to Special Master Unassigned . (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/1/1990, Entered: 4/20/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                  CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned . (FE)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 59 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?