WILLIFORD, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:90-vv-02528-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo BRUCE B. WILLIFORD, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Arthur Allen, Jr. +1 919 734 6565
No Logo TIMOTHY BOWDEN WILLIFORD, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Arthur Allen, Jr. +1 919 734 6565
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Caroline Ferebee Gossee Elmendorf +1 202 616 4122
Office COFC
Filed 10/1/1990
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 434 - Injunctive Relief
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/9/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 6/1/1995, Entered: 6/6/1995 Order
ORDER entered directing petitioner to file Motion Filing on fees and costs by 7/28/95 ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 14 Filed: 5/9/1995, Entered: 5/10/1995 Judgment*
    JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 21(a)(2) dismissing the petition with prejudice (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/9/1995, Entered: 5/10/1995 Terminated Case
      Case closed. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 5/4/1995, Entered: 5/10/1995 Stipulation
        Stipulation by BRUCE B. WILLIFORD, TIMOTHY BOWDEN WILLIFORD, and HHS of dismissal of petition with prejudice filed. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 4/11/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995 Order
          ORDER entered directing Additional Documents [stipulation of dismissal] due by 5/12/95 for TIMOTHY BOWDEN WILLIFORD, for BRUCE B. WILLIFORD (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 3/24/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 Order
            ORDER entered scheduling Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 4/10/95 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/16/1995 Order
              ORDER entered rescheduling Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 3/29/95 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 2/10/1995, Entered: 2/14/1995 Order
                ORDER set Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 3/13/95 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 2/1/1995, Entered: 2/3/1995 notice of filing
                  Notice of filing Exhibit C, curriculum vitae of Neal A. Halsey, M.D. by HHS. Service: 2/1/95 (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 2/2/1995 Expert Report - Rule 26
                    Expert Report of Neal A. Halsey, M.D. by HHS. Service: 1/30/95 (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 1/18/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Order
                      ORDER set Status Conference for 11:30 2/6/95 . (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman) Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 11/14/1994, Entered: 11/18/1994 Order
                        ORDER set Additional Documents [supplemental affidavit] due: 12/30/94 for TIMOTHY BOWDEN WILLIFORD and set Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 1/17/95 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 9/29/1994, Entered: 10/6/1994 Scheduling Order
                          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Conference set for: 3:30 p.m., 11/1/94 ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 4/25/1994, Entered: 8/25/1994 Respondent's Report
                            RESPONDENT'S REPORT/motionto dismiss. Service: 4/25/94 (FE) Modified on 08/25/1994
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 2/2/1994, Entered: 8/25/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                              NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master Laura D. Millman . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 2/2/1994, Entered: 8/25/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 10/1/1990, Entered: 8/25/1994 Petition
                                  PETITION by BRUCE B. WILLIFORD, TIMOTHY BOWDEN WILLIFORD FILING FEE $ 120 Vac. Date: 1/15/72 (FE)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 69 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?