HENDERSON v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:90-vv-03339-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo PAUL MICHAEL HENDERSON, Petitioner
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"
Office COFC
Filed 10/1/1990
Jury Demand
Demand $530000
Nature of Suit 424 - (Obj/Revocation Discharge 727
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 11/18/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 11/18/1994, Entered: 11/21/1994 Terminated:
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a) dismissing the petition for failure to substantiate and to prosecute this case (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/18/1994, Entered: 11/21/1994 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 10/14/1994, Entered: 10/20/1994 Terminated:
      ORDER Dismissing for Want of Prosecution (signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 7/11/1994, Entered: 7/19/1994 Terminated:
        See 90-3310V for ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz). Copy to parties. Petitioner's Resp. to Cause Order due: 9/9/94 (FE) Modified on 07/19/1994
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 3/10/1994, Entered: 4/1/1994 Terminated:
          RESPONDENT'S PRELIMINARY REVIEW (RECORDS). SERVICE: 3/10/94 (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 12/8/1993, Entered: 4/1/1994 Terminated:
            ORDER SCHEDULING PRELIMINARY REVIEW. ( Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 10/1/1990, Entered: 3/14/1994 Terminated:
              PETITION by PAUL MICHAEL HENDERSON FILING FEE $ 120 Vac. Date: 06/15/67 (FE)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 10/1/1990, Entered: 3/14/1994 Terminated:
                CASE assigned to Special Master Unassigned . (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 10/1/1990, Entered: 3/14/1994 Terminated:
                  CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned . (FE)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 101 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?