TYSON v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:90-vv-03379-RJY
District Judge Robert J. Yock, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo ADRIAN MCCASKILL TYSON, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns Cunningham & Mackey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Francis Burns +1 334 432 0612
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark William Rogers +1 202 616 4122 mark.rogers2@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/1/1990
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 424 - (Obj/Revocation Discharge 727
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 2/18/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (65) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 62 Filed: 12/18/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998 Satisfaction of Judgment
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $12,733.06, will be mailed on November 16, 1998 to Peter Burns, Esquire, attorney for the petitioner's. See letter in file. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 61 Filed: 11/17/1998, Entered: 11/19/1998 Affidavit
    AFFIDAVIT by ADRIAN MCCASKILL TYSON. Service 11/10/98. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 60 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998 Judgment Forwarded (Election)
      Certified copy of judgment solely awarding counsel fees and expenses forwarded to HHS. See letter in file (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 59 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/16/1998
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded attorneys' fees and costs in the amount of $12,733.06. A check in this amount shall be made co-payable to petitioner and petitioner's counsel. (Signed by Clerk.) Copy to parties. (LD)
          LREF
          Blank 58 Filed: 9/11/1998, Entered: 9/15/1998 Published Decision of Special Master - Fees
          Decision of Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright re: fees and costs. Copy to parties. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 57 Filed: 5/19/1998, Entered: 5/21/1998 Motion for Attorney Fees
            MOTION by ADRIAN MCCASKILL TYSON (Service : 5/19/98 ) for Attorney Fees . Response due: 6/1/98 (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 56 Filed: 2/18/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998 Judgment*
              JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Appendix J paragraph 30 dismissing the petition. No costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 2/18/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998 Terminated Case
                Case closed (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 55 Filed: 2/17/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                  PUBLISHED DECISION denying [52-1] motion For review of Special Master's Decision. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 54 Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: 12/23/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Mark William Rogers Service : 12/15/97 (LD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 53 Filed: 12/2/1997, Entered: 12/12/1997 Terminated:
                      RESPONSE by HHS (Service: 12/1/97) to [52-1] motion For review of Special Master's Decision. Reply due: 12/8/9.7 (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 52 Filed: 11/7/1997, Entered: 11/20/1997 Terminated:
                        MOTION by ADRIAN MCCASKILL TYSON (Service : 10/27/97 ) For review of Special Master's Decision filed [by leave of the judge]. Response due: 12/8/97 (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 51 Filed: 10/30/1997, Entered: 11/4/1997 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                          Notice of assignment to Judge Robert J. Yock . Copy to parties. (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 50 Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 10/6/1997 DECISION of Special Master
                            Decision of Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright directing Clerk to enter judgment dismissing petition. Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 49 Filed: 12/9/1996, Entered: 12/12/1996 Post-Hearing Brief
                              Post-Hearing Brief by HHS. Service: 12/9/96 , (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 48 Filed: 12/9/1996, Entered: 12/12/1996 Exhibit
                                CORRECTED Exhibit list by ADRIAN MCCASKILL TYSON Service: 10/4/96 (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 47 Filed: 12/9/1996, Entered: 12/12/1996 Post-Hearing Brief
                                  Post-Hearing Brief by ADRIAN MCCASKILL TYSON Service: 12/6/96 , (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 46 Filed: 10/22/1996, Entered: 10/30/1996 Transcript
                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re:Evid. Hearing, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of October 7, 1996. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 45 Filed: 10/9/1996, Entered: 10/11/1996 Order
                                      ORDER set Post-Hearing Brief due: 12/9/96 for HHS, for ADRIAN MCCASKILL TYSON (signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 44 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Additional Documentation
                                        Additional Documentation [medical records] by ADRIAN MCCASKILL TYSON. Service: 10/4/96 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 43 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Exhibit
                                          Exhibit list by ADRIAN MCCASKILL TYSON. Service: 10/4/96 (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/14/1996 Evidentiary Hearing
                                            Evidentiary Hearing held. ( Transcript due 11/6/96 ) (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 42 Filed: 9/20/1996, Entered: 9/26/1996 Prehearing Submissions
                                              Prehearing Submissions by ADRIAN MCCASKILL TYSON. Service: 9/16/96 (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 41 Filed: 9/20/1996, Entered: 9/26/1996 Witness List
                                                Witness list by ADRIAN MCCASKILL TYSON. Service: 9/16/96 (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 9/20/1996, Entered: 9/26/1996 Exhibit
                                                  Exhibit list by ADRIAN MCCASKILL TYSON. Service: 9/16/96 (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 9/16/1996, Entered: 9/19/1996 Prehearing Submissions
                                                    Prehearing Submissions by HHS. Service: 9/16/96 (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 4/22/1996, Entered: 4/25/1996 Order
                                                      ORDER set Evidentiary Hearing for Entitlement: 10:00 a.m. on 10/7/96 and set Prehearing Submissions due: 9/16/96 for HHS and ADRIAN MCCASKILL TYSON (signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 4/15/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996 Order
                                                        ORDER directing parties to contact special master to establish a mutually convenient hearing date no later than April 26, 1996 (signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 3/13/1996, Entered: 3/19/1996 Order
                                                          ORDER setting Status Conference for 11:00 4/12/96 . ( signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 2/23/1996, Entered: 2/29/1996 notice of filing
                                                            Notice of filing Exhibit J. Medical Expert Report of Wayne Ray, Ph.D. by HHS. Service: 2/23/96 (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 11/16/1995, Entered: 11/21/1995 notice of filing
                                                              Notice of filing supplement records by ADRIAN MCCASKILL TYSON. Service: 11/2/95. (HW)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 11/16/1995, Entered: 11/21/1995 notice of filing
                                                                Notice of filing supplemental records by ADRIAN MCCASKILL TYSON. Service: 11/2/95. (HW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 11/3/1995, Entered: 11/8/1995 Stipulation
                                                                  Stipulation by ADRIAN MCCASKILL TYSON, HHS of Facts (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 10/19/1995, Entered: 10/24/1995 Order
                                                                    ORDER reset Brief [factual stipulation] deadline to 11/2/95 (signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 notice of filing
                                                                      Notice of filing Exhibits C thru I by HHS. Service: 10/6/95(FE) Modified on 10/16/1995
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 9/18/1995, Entered: 9/20/1995 Order
                                                                        ORDER set Brief [factual stipulation] deadline to 10/18/95 (signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 9/11/1995, Entered: 9/13/1995 Order
                                                                          ORDER set Status Conference for 2:00 9/14/95 ( signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 9/1/1995, Entered: 9/6/1995 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                            Expert Report by HHS. Service: 9/1/95. (HW)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 7/19/1995, Entered: 7/21/1995 Order
                                                                              ORDER set Expert Report due: 9/1/95 for HHS ( signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 7/13/1995, Entered: 7/14/1995 Order
                                                                                ORDER set Status Conference for 3:00p.m. on 7/17/95 (signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 6/29/1995, Entered: 6/30/1995 Additional Documentation
                                                                                  Additional Documentation [affidavits, exhibits in support of opinion, medical bills, etc.] by ADRIAN MCCASKILL TYSON Service: 6/16/95 (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/29/1995, Entered: 6/30/1995 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                    Deadline updated; Expert Report due: 7/31/95 for HHS (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/29/1995 notice of filing
                                                                                      Notice of filing affidavit of Adrian McCaskill Tyson by ADRIAN MCCASKILL TYSON Service: 3/22/95 (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 3/23/1995, Entered: 3/27/1995 Order
                                                                                        ORDER set Additional Documents [medical expert report, $1000 documentation and affidavit] due: 6/20/95 for ADRIAN MCCASKILL TYSON [Respondent's expert report within 45 days of service] (signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 3/21/1995, Entered: 3/23/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Mary (Kate) Katherine Adam Service : 3/21/95 (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: 3/21/1995 Scheduling Order
                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Conference by telephone for: 1:30 3/22/95; fee petition to be filed 21 days following the filing of an election of judgment (signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 03/21/1995
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 2/3/1995, Entered: 2/7/1995 Order
                                                                                              ORDER directng Respondent to contact Petitioner and Special Master with a date and time for Rule 5 conference within 30 days of filing of its report (signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 2/1/1995 Respondent's Report
                                                                                                RESPONDENT'S REPORT Service: 1/30/95 (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 1/19/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Order
                                                                                                  ORDER reset date Respondent's Report due to 1/30/95 (signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 11/9/1994, Entered: 11/17/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Linda Sara Renzi Service : 11/9/94 (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 10/17/1994, Entered: 10/21/1994 Order
                                                                                                      See 90-3121 V for ORDER assigning this case to Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright and scheduling respondent's report for 1/23/95. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 10/6/1994, Entered: 10/13/1994 Preliminary Review
                                                                                                        RESPONDENT'S PRELIMINARY REVIEW (RULE 4). Service: 10/6/94 (FE)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 9/23/1994, Entered: 9/29/1994 notice of filing
                                                                                                          Notice of filing supplemental medical records by ADRIAN MCCASKILL TYSON. Service: 9/16/94 (FE)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 8/22/1994, Entered: 8/25/1994 Additional Documentation
                                                                                                            Additional Documentation by ADRIAN MCCASKILL TYSON. Service: 8/17/94 (FE)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 8/5/1994, Entered: 8/10/1994 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                              Respondent's reply (request for additional records). Service: 8/5/94 (HW)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 7/20/1994, Entered: 8/10/1994 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                Petitioner's Reply re: Records. Service: 7/20/94 (HW)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 7/20/1994, Entered: 8/10/1994 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  Petitioner's Reply re: Records. Service: 7/20/94. (HW)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 6/28/1994, Entered: 6/29/1994 Order
                                                                                                                    ORDER reset Petitioner's Reply re: Records: 8/1/94 Respondent shall file a reply within 30 days from the date of service. ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ) Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 06/29/1994
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 6/21/1994, Entered: 6/22/1994 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                      Respondent's reply (request for additional records). Service: 6/21/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 6/9/1994, Entered: 6/10/1994 Description not available
                                                                                                                        Petitioner's Response to Respondent's Review Records. Service: 5/27/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 3/30/1994, Entered: 4/1/1994 Description not available
                                                                                                                          RESPONDENT'S PRELIMINARY REVIEW (RECORDS). SERVICE: 3/30/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 12/8/1993, Entered: 4/1/1994 Order for Preliminary Review
                                                                                                                            ORDER SCHEDULING PRELIMINARY REVIEW. ( Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 10/1/1990, Entered: 3/15/1994 Petition
                                                                                                                              PETITION by ADRIAN MCCASKILL TYSON FILING FEE $ 120 Vac. Date: 01/15/88 (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/1/1990, Entered: 3/15/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                                                                                                                CASE assigned to Special Master Unassigned . (FE)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/1/1990, Entered: 3/15/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                  CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned . (FE)
                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 190 times.

                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?