PROCTOR v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:90-vv-03414-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo MARTHA J. PROCTOR, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Robert Arnold +1 214 739 4216 +1 972 243 2666 arnoldenda@aol.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark William Rogers +1 202 616 4122 mark.rogers2@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/1/1990
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 424 - (Obj/Revocation Discharge 727
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 2/26/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (85) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 82 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/24/2000 Satisfaction of Judgment
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $30,000.00, was mailed on April 18, 2000 to Brian Arnold, Esquire, attorney for the petitioners. See letter in file. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 81 Filed: 3/14/2000, Entered: 3/14/2000
    Certified copy of judgment solely awarding counsel fees and expenses, forwarded to HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 80 Filed: 3/14/2000, Entered: 3/14/2000
      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $30,000.00, payable jointly to petitioner and Mr. Brian Arnold. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 79 Filed: 2/15/2000, Entered: 2/16/2000 notice of filing
        Notice of filing "Petitioner's Statement Pursuant to General Order No. 9" by MARTHA J. PROCTOR. Service: 2/9/00. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 78 Filed: 2/10/2000, Entered: 2/11/2000 Published Decision of Special Master - Fees
          Decision of Special Master Laura D. Millman re: fees and costs. Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 77 Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000 Motion for Attorney Fees
            AMENDED MOTION by MARTHA J. PROCTOR (Service: 1/31/00) for Attorney Fees and Costs . Response due: 2/17/00. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 76 Filed: 1/27/2000, Entered: 1/28/2000 Order
              ORDER granting [75-1] motion to Extend Time to file any additional attorney's fees and expenses. set Additional Documents due: 1/27/00 for MARTHA J. PROCTOR ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 75 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/24/2000, Terminated: 1/27/2000 Terminated:
                MOTION by MARTHA J. PROCTOR (Service : 1/20/00 ) to Extend Time to file any additional attorney's fees and expenses. (to January 27, 2000) Response due: 2/7/00 (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 74 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/24/2000 Motion for Attorney Fees
                  MOTION by MARTHA J. PROCTOR (Service : 1/20/00 ) for Attorney Fees and Costs . Response due: 2/7/00 (DS)
                    LREF
                    Blank 73 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/6/2000 Order
                    ORDER set Petitioners' motion re: attorneys' fees filing deadline to 1/21/00. ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 72 Filed: 2/26/1999, Entered: 2/26/1999
                      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 21(a), that the petition is dismissed without prejudice. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 71 Filed: 2/26/1999, Entered: 2/26/1999, Terminated: 2/26/1999 Description not available
                        MOTION by MARTHA J. PROCTOR (Service : 2/11/99 ) to Voluntarily Dismiss Petition (LD)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 2/26/1999, Entered: 2/26/1999
                          Case closed (LD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 70 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/26/1999 Terminated:
                            Notice of Filing and MOTION by MARTHA J. PROCTOR (Service : 2/11/99 ) to dismiss. Response due: 3/15/99 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 69 Filed: 2/4/1999, Entered: 2/5/1999 Order
                              ORDER reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 2/12/99 for Petitioner to file a notice of voluntary dismissal. ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 68 Filed: 1/22/1999, Entered: 1/25/1999 Order
                                ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 1/29/99 for Petitioner's counsel to file a notice of voluntary dismissal. ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 67 Filed: 12/15/1998, Entered: 12/16/1998 Order
                                  ORDER re: No later than Teusday, January 5, 1999, petitioner shall contact my law clerk and inform him whether petitioner will be pursuing this action further ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 66 Filed: 11/10/1998, Entered: 11/12/1998 Scheduling Order
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Conference set for: 3:00 p.m. 12/14/98 ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 65 Filed: 10/23/1998, Entered: 10/27/1998 Prehearing Submissions
                                      Prehearing Submissions by HHS. Service by hand: 10/23/98. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 64 Filed: 9/8/1998, Entered: 9/10/1998 Scheduling Order
                                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Conference set for: 2:00 p.m., 11/9/98. Prehearing Submissions due: 10/23/98 for HHS, for MARTHA J. PROCTOR. Evidentiary Hearing set for: 10:00 a.m., 11/16/98 ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 63 Filed: 8/11/1998, Entered: 8/13/1998 Order
                                          ORDER re: respondent shall contact the court by 8/28/98 to confirm a hearing and pre-hearing ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 62 Filed: 6/17/1998, Entered: 6/19/1998 Order
                                            ORDER set Status Conference for 2:30 p.m., 8/10/98. ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 61 Filed: 6/15/1998, Entered: 6/17/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Mark William Rogers. Service : 6/15/98 (JT)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 60 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Order
                                                ORDER advising Petitioner's counsel to contact the court by 5/15/98 to confirm hearing date, dates for pre-hearing submissions and a pre-hearing status conference. ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 4/7/1998, Entered: 4/8/1998 Notice of Change of Address
                                                  NOTICE of change of address by Brian Robert Arnold. (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 3/30/1998, Entered: 3/31/1998 Order
                                                    ORDER cancelling evidentiary hearing and status conference. ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 11/13/1997, Entered: 11/25/1997 Scheduling Order
                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Prehearing Submissions due: 3/27/98 for HHS, for MARTHA J. PROCTOR; Prehearing Status Conference set for 11:00 on 4/8/98; and Evidentiary Hearing set for 11:00 on 4/9/98. ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to (DS)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 10/10/1997, Entered: 10/21/1997 Order
                                                        ORDER directing parties to confirm hearing date by 10/31/97 ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 10/9/1997, Entered: 10/15/1997 notice of filing
                                                          Notice of filing and filing of Exh. 32 and new Table of Contents by MARTHA J. PROCTOR Service: 10/2/97 (CDC)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 9/26/1997, Entered: 9/30/1997 Order
                                                            ORDER directing parties to contact law clerk to schedule hearing. ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 9/23/1997, Entered: 9/26/1997 Order
                                                              ORDER directing the parties to contact special masters office by 10/10/97, to schedule a hearing ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 8/13/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Order
                                                                ORDER set Status Conference for 11:00 9/23/97 ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 7/22/1997, Entered: 7/23/1997 notice of filing
                                                                  Notice of filing Exh. K (Deposition of Martha Proctor) by HHS Service: 7/22/97 (CDC)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 7/9/1997, Entered: 7/14/1997 notice of filing
                                                                    Notice of filing documents by MARTHA J. PROCTOR Service: 7/7/97 (CDC)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 5/14/1997, Entered: 5/23/1997 Order
                                                                      ORDER set Status Conference for 10:30 5/28/97 (Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 5/13/1997, Entered: 5/22/1997 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                        Expert Report [of Dr. Mark E. Pretorius, M.D.] by MARTHA J. PROCTOR Service: 5/9/97 (HW)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: 4/15/1997 Order
                                                                          ORDER set Status Conference for 10:30 5/14/97 ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 3/13/1997, Entered: 3/18/1997 Order
                                                                            ORDER set Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 4/3/97 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 1/24/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997 Additional Documentation
                                                                              Additional Documentation [epidemiological study] by HHS. Service: 1/24/97 (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 1/24/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997 Additional Documentation
                                                                                Additional Documentation [comprehensive epidemiological] by HHS Service: 1/24/97 (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 1/24/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                                  Expert Report and curriculum vitae of Exhibits A and B by HHS. Service: 1/24/97 (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 1/2/1997, Entered: 1/3/1997 Order
                                                                                    ORDER reset Expert Report due: 1/31/97 for HHS (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 11/12/1996, Entered: 11/15/1996 Additional Documentation
                                                                                      Additional Documentation [supplement to $1000 documentation] by MARTHA J. PROCTOR. Service: 7/22/96 (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 11/5/1996, Entered: 11/8/1996 Order
                                                                                        ORDER reset Expert Report due: 12/30/96 for HHS and cancelling a status conference (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/7/1996 Order
                                                                                          ORDER re: set Status Conference for 2:30 12/2/96 , and set Expert Report due: 12/2/96 for HHS ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/22/1996 Order
                                                                                            ORDER set Additional Documents [$1000 documentation] due: 9/30/96 for MARTHA J. PROCTOR and set Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 9/30/96 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 8/9/1996, Entered: 8/14/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT (Exhibit #26,#27 & #28), by MARTHA J. PROCTOR Re: Costs and Expenditures. Service 7/22/96 (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 8/1/1996, Entered: 8/7/1996 Order
                                                                                                ORDER reset Additional Documents [$1000 documentation] due: 8/9/96 for MARTHA J. PROCTOR (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 6/28/1996, Entered: 7/3/1996 Order
                                                                                                  ORDER set Additional Documents [$1000 documentation] due: 7/26/96 for MARTHA J. PROCTOR and set Status Conference for 10:30 a.m. on 8/15/96 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 6/13/1996, Entered: 6/17/1996 Order
                                                                                                    ORDER re: set Status Conference for 3:00pm, 6/27/96 ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 5/31/1996, Entered: 6/4/1996 Order
                                                                                                      ORDER set Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 6/13/96 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 3/12/1996, Entered: 3/15/1996 Order
                                                                                                        ORDER cancelling status conference (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 2/26/1996, Entered: 3/1/1996 notice of filing
                                                                                                          Notice of filing front and back of cashier's check showing funds deposited into the account of Daisy Johnson by MARTHA J. PROCTOR. Service: 11/29/95 (FE)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 1/23/1996, Entered: 1/30/1996 Order
                                                                                                            ORDER re: Status Conference for 10:30am, 3/19/96 ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 12/13/1995, Entered: 12/18/1995 notice of filing
                                                                                                              Notice of filing affidavit of no record (for Prudential Insurance Company, tabbed as Exhibit "25") by MARTHA J. PROCTOR. Service: 11/29/95. (HW)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 12/12/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Order
                                                                                                                ORDER scheduling Status Conference for 10:30am, 1/4/96 and directing petitioners to supplement documentation as soon as practicable ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 Petition
                                                                                                                  SECOND AMENDED PETITION with affidavits by MARTHA J. PROCTOR (Service: 11/27/95). (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 11/2/1995, Entered: 11/8/1995 Order
                                                                                                                    ORDER set Additional Documents (supplemental affidavit from Dr. Pretorious, and supporting documentation for $1,000 in unreimbursable medical expenses) due: 11/27/95 for MARTHA J. PROCTOR , and set Status Conference for 11:30 12/11/95 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 10/3/1995, Entered: 10/6/1995 Order
                                                                                                                      ORDER reset Status Conference for 11:30 a.m. on 11/1/95 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 9/12/1995, Entered: 9/18/1995 Order
                                                                                                                        ORDER petitioners shal submit supporting documentation for $1000 in unreimbursable Additional Documents due: 10/11/95 for MARTHA J. PROCTOR , Status Conference for 11:00am, on 10/17/95 ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 8/15/1995, Entered: 8/18/1995 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                                                                          Expert Report and affidavit of Dr. Mark E. Pretorious, M.D. by MARTHA J. PROCTOR. Service: 8/8/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 7/11/1995, Entered: 7/13/1995 Order
                                                                                                                            ORDER set Expert Report due: 8/25/95 for MARTHA J. PROCTOR and set Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 9/11/95 (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 7/10/1995, Entered: 7/12/1995 notice of filing
                                                                                                                              Notice of filing Exhibit 19, Affidavit of Dr. Angus S. Baker, M.D. by MARTHA J. PROCTOR. Service: 6/29/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 6/14/1995, Entered: 6/16/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                ORDER set Status Conference for 10:30 7/10/95 ( signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 6/2/1995, Entered: 6/7/1995 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                  Notice of filing petitioners' third response to respondent's request for additional records by MARTHA J. PROCTOR Service: 5/26/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 5/19/1995, Entered: 5/25/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                    ORDER entered directing petitioner's counsel to contact SM by 6/10/95 re: dates (signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 5/15/1995, Entered: 5/16/1995 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Brian C. Arnold by MARTHA J. PROCTOR. Service 5/8/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 5/5/1995, Entered: 5/10/1995 Respondent's Report
                                                                                                                                        RESPONDENT'S REPORT. Service: 5/5/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 4/19/1995, Entered: 4/20/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Mary (Kate) Katherine Adam. Service: 4/19/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/15/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Althea Elizabeth Walker Service : 3/13/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 2/23/1995, Entered: 2/24/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                              ORDER in this and listed assigning this case to Special Master Laura D. Millman and scheduling respondent's report for 5/5/95 and directing Petitioner to file any outstanding documentation no later than April 21, 1995. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 1/13/1995, Entered: 1/17/1995 Preliminary Review
                                                                                                                                                RESPONDENT'S PRELIMINARY REVIEW (RULE 4). Service: 1/13/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 12/14/1994, Entered: 12/19/1994 Additional Documentation
                                                                                                                                                  Additional Documentation (Medical Records of St. Francis Xavier Hospital, and M.D. Anderson Hospital, Houston, Texas ) by MARTHA J. PROCTOR. Service: 12/13/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 11/22/1994, Entered: 11/28/1994 Order
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Respondent's response to its supplemental filing and reset Additional Documents due: 12/14/94 for MARTHA J. PROCTOR (signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 11/14/1994, Entered: 11/17/1994 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      Petitioner's Reply re: Records. Service: 11/11/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 11/14/1994, Entered: 11/17/1994, Terminated: 11/22/1994 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by MARTHA J. PROCTOR (Service: 11/11/94) to Extend Time to respond to Respondent's response to its supplemental filing [30 days]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 10/14/1994, Entered: 10/20/1994 Order
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER reset Petitioner's Reply re: Records: 11/14/94 [Respondent's reply within 30 days of service] (signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 10/6/1994, Entered: 10/13/1994 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                            Respondent's reply (request for additional records). Service: 10/6/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 9/9/1994, Entered: 9/13/1994 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                              Petitioner's Response to Respondent's Review Records. Service: 9/8/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 7/11/1994, Entered: 7/19/1994 Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                See 90-3310V for ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ). Copy to parties. Petitioner's Resp. to Cause Order due: 9/9/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 3/28/1994, Entered: 3/29/1994 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONDENT'S PRELIMINARY REVIEW (RECORDS). SERVICE: 3/28/94 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 12/8/1993, Entered: 3/29/1994 Order for Preliminary Review
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER SCHEDULING PRELIMINARY REVIEW ( Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 10/1/1990, Entered: 3/15/1994 Petition
                                                                                                                                                                      PETITION by MARTHA J. PROCTOR FILING FEE $ 120 Vac. Date: 01/07/87 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/1/1990, Entered: 3/15/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                                                                                                                                                        CASE assigned to Special Master Unassigned . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/1/1990, Entered: 3/15/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                          CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 114 times.

                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?