SUTTON, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:90-vv-03187-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo JEFFREY JOHN SILKE, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Mombach Boyle & Hardin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert W. Elton +1 386 274 2229 +1 386 274 7577 relton@eltonlaw.com
No Logo PHYLLIS SUTTON, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert W. Elton, PL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert W. Elton +1 386 274 2229 +1 386 274 7577 relton@eltonlaw.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Curtis Raby +1 202 616 4111 mark.raby@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/1/1990
Jury Demand
Demand $500000
Nature of Suit 434 - Injunctive Relief
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 8/31/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 3/6/1995, Entered: 3/6/1995
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $30,000 received from HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 2/15/1995, Entered: 2/16/1995 Judgment Forwarded (Election)
    Certified copy of judgment awarding counsel fees and expenses forwarded to HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 2/14/1995, Entered: 2/14/1995
      JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a) awarding petitioner attorneys' fees and costs in the sum of $30,000.00, with payment made by check made payable to Robert W. Elton, petitioner's attorney of record (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 2/2/1995 Notice Not to Seek Review
        NOTICE NOT TO SEEK REVIEW by PHYLLIS SUTTON. Service: 1/23/95 (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 15 Filed: 1/13/1995, Entered: 1/18/1995 Published Decision of Special Master - Fees
          Decision of Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright re: fees and costs. Copy to parties. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 11/28/1994, Entered: 11/30/1994 notice of filing
            Notice of filing additional exhibit [letter from Dr. Alan Hart, dated 11/16/94, itemizing the basis for his expert witness fee] by PHYLLIS SUTTON, JEFFREY JOHN SILKE Service: 11/23/94 (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 11/3/1994, Entered: 11/3/1994
              SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $250,000 received from HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 11/1/1994, Entered: 11/10/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Mark Curtis Raby Service : 11/1/94 (HW)
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 10/31/1994, Entered: 11/10/1994 notice of filing
                  Notice of filing exhibit to petition for costs and expenses by PHYLLIS SUTTON Service: 10/20/94 (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 10/17/1994, Entered: 10/21/1994 Terminated:
                    MOTION by PHYLLIS SUTTON (Service: 10/12/94) for Attorney Fees . Response due: 10/31/94 (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 9 Filed: 9/27/1994, Entered: 10/20/1994 Judgment Forwarded (Election)
                      Certified copy of [election and] judgment forwarded to HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 8 Filed: 9/26/1994, Entered: 10/3/1994 Petitioner's Election
                        PETITIONER'S ELECTION to accept Judgment. Service: 9/20/94 Election(y/n): y (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 7 Filed: 8/31/1994, Entered: 9/2/1994 Terminated:
                          JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a) awarding petitioner compensation in the amount of $250,000.00 (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 8/31/1994, Entered: 9/2/1994 Terminated Case
                            Case closed. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 6 Filed: 8/29/1994, Entered: 9/1/1994 Terminated:
                              AFFIDAVIT of PHYLLIS SUTTON by PHYLLIS SUTTON and JEFFREY JOHN SILKE. Re: Service 8/22/94. (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 5 Filed: 8/16/1994, Entered: 8/22/1994 Terminated:
                                ORDER Correcting pages 19-21 of 7/29/94 decision (signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 7/29/1994, Entered: 8/3/1994 Terminated:
                                  Decision of Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 5/13/1993, Entered: 8/3/1994 Terminated:
                                    See 90-3242V for Special Master's ORDER re filing of notice of intent (signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 12/10/1991, Entered: 8/3/1994 Terminated:
                                      See 90-967V for NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/10/1991, Entered: 8/3/1994 Terminated:
                                        CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 10/1/1990, Entered: 8/3/1994 Terminated:
                                          PETITION FILED by PHYLLIS SUTTON, JEFFREY JOHN SILKE FILING FEE $ 120 Vac. Date: 00/00/00 (FE)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 67 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?