CRIDDELL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:91-cv-01150-TJL
District Judge Thomas J. Lydon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JUANITA C. CRIDDELL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Guy James Ferrante +1 703 644 2009 kingand@erols.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Scott Kane
Office COFC
Filed 5/14/1991
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 3/11/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 8/12/1994, Entered: 8/17/1994 Description not available
G.A.O. Certificate of Settlement Number: Z-2933158 Dated: June 30, 1994 Amount: $72,500.00 Paid by Treasury Dept.: July 14, 1994 (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 3/14/1994, Entered: 3/18/1994 Certified Transcript to Attorney
    CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 3/11/1994, Entered: 3/11/1994
      JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 68 awarding plaintiff $63,500.00 in back pay, $6,500.00 in allowances, and $2,500.00 in attorney's fees (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 3/11/1994, Entered: 3/11/1994
        Case closed. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 3/8/1994, Entered: 3/11/1994 Stipulation
          Stipulation by JUANITA C. CRIDDELL, USA for entry of judgment. (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 11/30/1993, Entered: 3/9/1994 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER suspending proceedings until January 31, 1994, with parties to file a joint status report at that time ( signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. Lydon ). Copy to parties. (DS)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 5/14/1991, Entered: 3/2/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
              Notice of assignment to Senior Judge Thomas J. Lydon. Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 5/14/1991, Entered: 3/2/1994 ~Notice (other)
                NOTICE of related case [90-472C] by JUANITA C. CRIDDELL. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 5/14/1991, Entered: 3/2/1994 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $120. (FE)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 119 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?