BRIGHTON VILLAGE, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:91-cv-01252-BAF
District Judge Bohdan A. Futey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BRIGHTON VILLAGE ASSOCIATES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COAN & LYONS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl A.S. Coan, Jr. +1 202 728 1070 +1 202 293 2448 coanlyons@aol.com
No Logo HERBERT F. GOLD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COAN & LYONS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl A.S. Coan, Jr. +1 202 728 1070 +1 202 293 2448 coanlyons@aol.com
No Logo JUAN M. COFIELD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COAN & LYONS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl A.S. Coan, Jr. +1 202 728 1070 +1 202 293 2448 coanlyons@aol.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office COFC
Filed 6/28/1991
Jury Demand
Demand $1400000
Nature of Suit 128 - Contract - Subsidy
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 8/29/1995
Origin 4
Reopened 6/16/1995
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 1/18/1996, Entered: 1/26/1996 Description not available
G.A.O. Certificate of Settlement Number: Z-2941873, Dated: November 2, 1995; Amount: $488,192.00, Paid by Treasury Dept.: November 27, 1995 (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 26 Filed: 9/1/1995, Entered: 9/29/1995 Certified Transcript to Attorney
    CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 25 Filed: 8/29/1995, Entered: 8/31/1995 Judgment*
      JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 68 awarding plaintiffs the sum of $488,192.00. Each party shall bear its own costs, attorney fees, and expenses incurred in this litigation (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 8/29/1995, Entered: 8/31/1995 Terminated Case
        Case closed. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 24 Filed: 8/22/1995, Entered: 8/24/1995 Stipulation
          Stipulation of agreement for judgment's entry. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 23 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: 7/25/1995 Status Report
            Joint STATUS REPORT by BRIGHTON VILLAGE, HERBERT F. GOLD and JUAN M. COFIELD. Service: 7/21/95. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 22 Filed: 6/29/1995, Entered: 6/29/1995 Court Filing
              ORDER pursuant to the telephonic conference held this date, the parties are directed to file a joint status report by July 21, 1995 ; set Joint Status Report deadline to 7/21/95 ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 21 Filed: 6/21/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER set Telephone Conference for 10:30 a.m. on 6/29/95 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 20 Filed: 6/16/1995, Entered: 6/19/1995 CAFC Mandate Affirming in Part/Reversing in Part
                  MANDATE (certified copy) affirming/reversing in part [19-1] appeal by JUAN M. COFIELD, HERBERT F. GOLD, and BRIGHTON VILLAGE. (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 7/26/1994, Entered: 7/26/1994, Terminated: 8/29/1995 CAFC Case Number
                    CAFC Case Number Re: [19-1] appeal by JUAN M. COFIELD, HERBERT F. GOLD, BRIGHTON VILLAGE. CAFC NUMBER: 94-5142. (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 19 Filed: 7/18/1994, Entered: 7/20/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                      NOTICE OF APPEAL by BRIGHTON VILLAGE, HERBERT F. GOLD and JUAN M. COFIELD. Copy to defendant, Judge and to C.A.F.C. FILING FEE $ 105.00, RECEIPT # 037189. (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 18 Filed: 5/18/1994, Entered: 6/1/1994 Terminated:
                        JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 5/18/1994, Entered: 6/1/1994 Terminated Case
                          Case closed. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 17 Filed: 5/16/1994, Entered: 5/25/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                            PUBLISHED DECISION denying [4-1] cross motion; granting [3-1] motion to Dismiss; granting [3-2] motion for Summary Judgment and directing Clerk to dismiss complaint. No costs. (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 5/16/1994, Entered: 5/25/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                              ORDER mooting [13-1] motion to Strike [12-1] memorandum by USA (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 15 Filed: 5/16/1994, Entered: 5/24/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                REPLY by PLAINTIFFS to response to [13-1] motion to Strike [12-1] memorandum by USA filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/10/94 (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 4/26/1994, Entered: 5/3/1994 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/94 ) to submit argument in opposition to new agument etc. . Response due: 5/13/94 (FE) Modified on 05/03/1994
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 4/26/1994, Entered: 5/3/1994 Terminated:
                                    RESPONSE by USA to [13-1] motion to Strike [12-1] memorandum by USA Service: 4/26/94 Reply due: 5/9/94 (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 4/11/1994, Entered: 5/2/1994 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by BRIGHTON VILLAGE, HERBERT F. GOLD, JUAN M. COFIELD (Service : 4/11/94 ) to Strike [12-1] memorandum by USA Response due: 4/28/94 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/11/1994, Entered: 5/2/1994 Terminated:
                                        Deadline updated; Response to [13-1] motion to Strike [12-1] memorandum by USA reset to 4/28/94 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 3/24/1994, Entered: 3/29/1994 Terminated:
                                          MEMORANDUM Supplemental Brief concerning the effect of new authority by USA. Service: 3/24/94 (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 3/24/1994, Entered: 3/29/1994 Terminated:
                                            MEMORANDUM Supplemental brief by BRIGHTON VILLAGE, HERBERT F. GOLD, JUAN M. COFIELD. Service: 3/24/94 (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 10 Filed: 3/3/1994, Entered: 3/8/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting [9-1] motion for Leave to File supplementary information ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ). Copy to parties. (DS) Modified on 03/09/1994
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 9 Filed: 2/25/1994, Entered: 3/8/1994, Terminated: 3/3/1994 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by BRIGHTON VILLAGE (Service: 2/25/94) for Leave to File supplementary information . (DS) Modified on 03/09/1994
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 2/22/1994, Entered: 3/9/1994 Terminated:
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 15, 1994 . Notice to parties. (FE) Modified on 03/09/1994
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 2/18/1994, Entered: 3/8/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                    ORDER directing parties to file supplemental briefs set Brief deadline to 3/24/94 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/15/1994, Entered: 3/9/1994 Terminated:
                                                      Oral Argument held re: [4-1] cross motion by BRIGHTON VILLAGE ( Transcript due 3/17/94 ), [3-1] motion to Dismiss by USA, [3-2] motion for Partial Summary Judgment by USA (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 8/4/1993, Entered: 3/8/1994 Terminated:
                                                        REPLY by BRIGHTON VILLAGE to response to [4-1] cross motion. Service: 8/4/93 (DS)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 7/2/1993, Entered: 3/8/1994 Terminated:
                                                          RESPONSE by USA to [4-1] cross motion. (DS)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 4/30/1993, Entered: 3/8/1994 Terminated:
                                                            CROSS MOTION by BRIGHTON VILLAGE, ET AL. (Service: 4/30/93) and RESPONSE to [3-1] motion to Dismiss by USA, [3-2] motion Summary Judgment by USA. (DS)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 3/15/1993, Entered: 3/8/1994 Terminated:
                                                              PARTIAL MOTION by USA (Service: 3/15/93) to Dismiss , and for Summary Judgment . (DS)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 6/28/1991, Entered: 3/2/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                Notice of assignment to Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 6/28/1991, Entered: 3/2/1994 Terminated:
                                                                  COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $120. (FE)
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 137 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?