BROWN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:91-cv-01261-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GREGORY V. BROWN, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Charles Peachey
Office COFC
Filed 7/5/1991
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 1/4/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 5/25/1994, Entered: 4/1/1996 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated May 25, 1994, affirmed [5-1] judgment order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 3/9/1994, Entered: 7/17/1995 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/3/1994, Entered: 7/17/1995 CAFC Case Number
      CAFC Case Number Re: [7-1] appeal by GREGORY V. BROWN. CAFC NUMBER: 94-5080. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 2/14/1994, Entered: 7/17/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
        NOTICE OF APPEAL by GREGORY V. BROWN. Copy to USA, Chief Judge Smith and to C.A.F.C. Fee waived, IFP. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 2/14/1994, Entered: 7/17/1995, Terminated: 3/9/1994 Terminated:
          MOTION by GREGORY V. BROWN (Service : 2/11/94 ) to Proceed in Forma Pauperis . Response due: 2/28/94. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 1/4/1994, Entered: 1/4/1994
            JUDGMENT entered dismissing complaint (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 1/4/1994, Entered: 1/4/1994
              Case closed. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 12/30/1993, Entered: 1/4/1994 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                CORRECTED PUBLISHED DECISION entered (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 12/23/1993, Entered: 1/4/1994 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                  PUBLISHED DECISION entered (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties with plaintiff served via Fed Ex. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 7/9/1993, Entered: 1/4/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                    Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 7/5/1991, Entered: 1/4/1994 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $120. (FE)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 65 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?