VIERRETHER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:91-cv-01482-LSM
District Judge Lawrence S. Margolis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo STEPHEN C. VIERRETHER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by FELDESMAN TUCKER LEIFER FIDELL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugene R. Fidell +1 202 466 8960 +1 202 293 8103 efidell@feldesmantucker.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"
Office COFC
Filed 10/1/1991
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 1/6/1993
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 11/1/1995, Entered: 11/1/1995
(FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/1/1995, Entered: 11/1/1995
    (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 10/22/1993, Entered: 10/26/1993 CAFC Mandate Affirming
      MANDATE (certified copy) affirmming the Court of Federal Claims decision in the [7-1] appeal by STEPHEN C. VIERRETHER. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 2/11/1993, Entered: 10/26/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
        NOTICE OF APPEAL by STEPHEN C. VIERRETHER . Copy to defendant, Judge and to CAFC. FILING FEE $ 105.00, RECEIPT # 33206. CAFC No. 93-5082. (HW) Modified on 10/26/1993
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 1/6/1993, Entered: 10/26/1993 Judgment*
          JUDGMENT (signed by Clerk) that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. Copy to parties. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 1/6/1993, Entered: 10/26/1993 Terminated Case
            Case closed. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 12/23/1992, Entered: 10/26/1993 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER [opinion] granting [4-1] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 1/13/1992, Entered: 10/26/1993, Terminated: 12/23/1992 Terminated:
                MOTION by USA (Service : 1/13/92 ) for Summary Judgment ; and proposed findings of uncontroverted fact (contained in 2 separate documents). (HW)
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 10/1/1991, Entered: 10/26/1993 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                  Notice of assignment to Judge Lawrence S. Margolis . Copy to parties. (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 10/1/1991, Entered: 10/26/1993 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $ 120. Answer due on 12/2/91. (HW)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 90 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?