ANDERSON, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:90-vv-03742-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo DARLA MARILYN ANDERSON, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ian D. McCargar
No Logo Donna M Anderson, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ian D. McCargar
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kate Adam Coleman +1 202 616 4122
Office COFC
Filed 10/1/1990
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 434 - Injunctive Relief
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 6/12/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 1/30/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996 Satisfaction of Judgment
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $3,871.60 received from HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 26 Filed: 12/12/1995, Entered: 1/3/1996 Judgment Forwarded (Election)
    Certified copy of judgment awarding counsel fees and expenses forwarded to HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 25 Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995 Judgment*
      JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a) awarding petitioner attorney's fees and costs in the sum of $3,871.60 (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 24 Filed: 11/7/1995, Entered: 11/13/1995 Notice Not to Seek Review
        NOTICE NOT TO SEEK REVIEW (To Accept Attorneys' Fees and Costs Decision) by DONNA M. ANDERSON. Service: 10/31/95 (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 23 Filed: 10/23/1995, Entered: 10/30/1995 Published Decision of Special Master - Fees
          Decision of Special Master Richard B. Abell re: attorneys' fees and costs. Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 22 Filed: 7/27/1995, Entered: 7/27/1995
            SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $250,000 received from HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 21 Filed: 6/29/1995, Entered: 7/5/1995 Judgment Forwarded (Election)
              Certified copy of election and judgment forwarded to HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 20 Filed: 6/28/1995, Entered: 6/29/1995 Petitioner's Election
                PETITIONER'S ELECTION to accept Judgment and request for ruling on petition for attorneys' fees and costs. Service: 6/26/95 Election(y/n): y (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 19 Filed: 6/12/1995, Entered: 6/13/1995 Judgment*
                  JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a) awarding petitioner compensation in the amount of $250,000.00 (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 6/12/1995, Entered: 6/29/1995 Terminated Case
                    Case closed. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 18 Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: 6/9/1995 Terminated:
                      MOTION by DARLA MARILYN ANDERSON, DONNA M. ANDERSON (Service: 5/31/95) for Attorney Fees Response due: 6/19/95 (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 17 Filed: 5/18/1995, Entered: 5/22/1995 Notice Not to Seek Review
                        NOTICE NOT TO SEEK REVIEW by DARLA MARILYN ANDERSON. Service: 5/15/95 (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 16 Filed: 5/3/1995, Entered: 5/8/1995 DECISION of Special Master
                          Decision of Special Master Richard B. Abell. Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 15 Filed: 4/27/1995, Entered: 5/3/1995 notice of filing
                            Notice of filing supplemental affidavit and letters of administration by DARLA MARILYN ANDERSON, DONNA M. ANDERSON Service: 4/24/95 (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 14 Filed: 4/5/1995, Entered: 4/7/1995 Order
                              ORDER petitioner will immediately file: affidavit affirming no one has filed a civil action or received a settlement, and documentation establishing Donna Anderson as Administratrix of the Estate of Darla Anderson ( signed by Special Master Richard B. Abell ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 13 Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 2/23/1995 Order
                                Special Master's ORDER entered re: scheduling a status conference with parties to file an original and one copy of future filings, etc. (signed by Special Master Richard B. Abell). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 02/23/1995
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 12 Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 2/23/1995 Order
                                  Special Master's ORDER entered re: scheduling a status conference with parties to file an original and one copy of future filings, etc. Copy to parties. ( signed by Special Master Richard B. Abell) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 11 Filed: 2/10/1995, Entered: 2/13/1995 Respondent's Report
                                    RESPONDENT'S REPORT. Service: 2/10/95. (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 10 Filed: 12/30/1994, Entered: 1/5/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Mary (Kate) Katherine Adam. Service : 12/30/94. (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 11/16/1994, Entered: 11/21/1994 Order
                                        See 91-257V for ORDER assigning this case to Special Master Richard B. Abell and scheduling respondent's report for 2/10/95 and directing Petitioner to file any outstanding documentation no later than January 3, 1995. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 10/6/1994, Entered: 10/13/1994 Preliminary Review
                                          RESPONDENT'S PRELIMINARY REVIEW (RULE 4). Service: 10/6/94 (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 8/17/1994, Entered: 8/20/1994 Description not available
                                            Petitioner's Response to Respondent's Review Records. Service: 8/15/94. (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 7/19/1994, Entered: 7/28/1994 Order
                                              ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to file supplemental doccumentation Additional Documents due: 8/18/94 for DONNA M. ANDERSON, for DARLA MARILYN ANDERSON (signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 7/11/1994, Entered: 7/18/1994, Terminated: 7/19/1994 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by DONNA M. ANDERSON (Service : 6/6/94 ) to Extend Time to file supplemental doccumentation until August 18, 1994. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 5/18/1994, Entered: 5/20/1994 Description not available
                                                  RESPONDENT'S PRELIMINARY REVIEW (RECORDS). SERVICE: 5/18/94 (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 2/18/1994, Entered: 3/31/1994 Order for Preliminary Review
                                                    ORDER SCHEDULING PRELIMINARY REVIEW. ( Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 9/24/1993, Entered: 12/20/1994 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by DARLA MARILYN ANDERSON (Service : 9/7/93 ) to Amend [1-1] petition by DONNA M. ANDERSON, DARLA MARILYN ANDERSON and notice of death of Darla Anderson. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 10/1/1990, Entered: 3/8/1994 Petition
                                                        PETITION by DARLA MARILYN ANDERSON, DONNA M. ANDERSON FILING FEE $ 120 Vac. Date: 09/08/69 (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/1/1990, Entered: 3/8/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                                          CASE assigned to Special Master Unassigned . (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/1/1990, Entered: 3/8/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                            CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned . (FE)
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 40 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?