HOLTHAUS, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:91-vv-00221-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo FRED HOLTHAUS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF GEORGE E. HAYS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Eldon Wilson +1 334 409 2003 +1 334 409 2009 jameseldonwilson@mindspring.com
No Logo ROSE HOLTHAUS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF GEORGE E. HAYS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Eldon Wilson +1 334 409 2003 +1 334 409 2009 jameseldonwilson@mindspring.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"
Office COFC
Filed 1/29/1991
Jury Demand
Demand $30000
Nature of Suit 424 - (Obj/Revocation Discharge 727
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 6/12/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 6/12/1995, Entered: 6/12/1995
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a) dismissing the petition for failure to substantiate and to prosecute this case (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/12/1995, Entered: 6/12/1995
    Case closed. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 5/8/1995, Entered: 5/11/1995 DECISION of Special Master
      Unpublished Decision of Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 1/4/1995, Entered: 1/6/1995 Order
        See 91-206V for ORDER reset Pet.'s Resp. re: Review (Dismiss): 2/24/95 and directing Petitioner failure to comply results in dismissal (signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 7/29/1994, Entered: 8/4/1994 Description not available
          RESPONDENT'S PRELIMINARY REVIEW (MOTION TO DISMISS). Service: 7/29/94 (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 4/8/1994, Entered: 4/8/1994
            ORDER SCHEDULING PRELIMINARY REVIEW ( Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 1/29/1991, Entered: 4/4/1994 Petition
              PETITION by FRED HOLTHAUS, ROSE HOLTHAUS FILING FEE $ 120 Vac. Date: 01/11/84 (FE)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/29/1991, Entered: 4/4/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                CASE assigned to Special Master Unassigned . (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/29/1991, Entered: 4/4/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                  CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned . (FE)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 101 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?