WELCH, USAR v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:92-cv-00022-KRH
District Judge Kenneth R. Harkins, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CHARLIE G. WELCH, USAR, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David William Palmer, II +1 904 244 6102
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Jay Abelson +1 202 616 0461 +1 202 514 7969 steven.abelson@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/13/1992
Jury Demand
Demand $10000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 9/7/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 23 Filed: 9/7/1999, Entered: 9/7/1999
JUDGMENT entered dismissing the complaint with prejudice. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (DS)
    LREF
    Blank 22 Filed: 9/7/1999, Entered: 9/7/1999 Court Filing
    ORDER entered directing the Clerk to dismiss the case with prejudice. ( signed by Sr. Judge Kenneth R. Harkins ) Copy to parties. (DS)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/7/1999, Entered: 9/7/1999
      Case closed (DS)
        LREF
        Blank 21 Filed: 8/6/1999, Entered: 8/9/1999 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER set Plaintiff's status report deadline to 8/27/99. ( signed by Sr. Judge Kenneth R. Harkins ) Copy to parties. (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 20 Filed: 10/1/1997, Entered: 10/8/1997 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER Staying proceeding pending decision of the Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit in Palmer v. United States, No. 91-1588C. ( signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins ) Copy to parties. (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 19 Filed: 9/18/1997, Entered: 9/24/1997 Terminated:
            RESPONSE by USA to [18-1] recommendations by CHARLIE G. WELCH, USAR Service: 9/17/97 (CDC)
              LREF
              Blank 18 Filed: 7/28/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997 Order
              RECOMMENDATIONS for further proceedings filed by CHARLIE G. WELCH, USAR. Service: 7/25/97 (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 17 Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: 7/17/1997 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER lifting suspension of proceedings, and directing plaintiff to file a recommendation as to further proceedings by 7/28/97, with defendant to file comments within 15 days after service. ( signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 16 Filed: 6/27/1996, Entered: 7/2/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER Continuing stay in the related dockets othan than in 91-1588C and filing a copy of this order in each related case (signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins). Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 15 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                    SEE 91-1588 C FOR STATUS REPORT ORDER. Defendant's Status report (response to plaintiff's proposed joint resolution) due on 3/1/96 ( signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                      LREF
                      Blank 14 Filed: 2/2/1996, Entered: 2/8/1996 Status ReportCourt Filing
                      STATUS REPOR [proposed joint resolution] by CHARLIE G. WELCH, USAR by leave of Judge. Service: 12/15/95 (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 13 Filed: 12/21/1995, Entered: 1/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER directing the return of a package of documents received 12/19/95 for correction of defects: (1) Proof of Service - shows service in docket No. 94-191 C was on wrong attorney; and (2) Does Not Comply with the provisions of Rule 83 - copies missing. ( signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 12 Filed: 12/20/1995, Entered: 12/29/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to 11/22/95 order and reset Status Report deadline to 1/17/96 (signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins). Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 11 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/28/1995, Terminated: 12/20/1995 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service: 12/18/95) to Extend Time to respond to 11/20/95 order [to January 17, 1996]. Response due: 1/4/96 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 10 Filed: 11/22/1995, Entered: 11/29/1995 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                              STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 12/22/95 and staying pending decision on the appeal in Godwin (signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 5/18/1994, Entered: 5/26/1994 ~Notice (other)
                                NOTICE of change of address by attorney for CHARLIE G. WELCH, USAR. Service: 5/13/94 (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 12/14/1992, Entered: 2/1/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Suspend proceedings ( signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 12/11/1992, Entered: 2/1/1994, Terminated: 12/14/1992 Terminated:
                                    JOINT MOTION by CHARLIE G. WELCH, USAR and USA to Suspend proceedings (pending decision by the CAFC in Godwin v. U.S.). (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 5/7/1992, Entered: 2/1/1994 Reply to Response to Motion
                                      REPLY by USA to response to [3-1] motion to Dismiss (Rule 12) . Service: 5/7/92 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 4/10/1992, Entered: 2/1/1994 Terminated:
                                        RESPONSE by CHARLIE G. WELCH, USAR to [3-1] motion to Dismiss (Rule 12) Service: 4/6/92 Reply due: 4/27/92 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 3/27/1992, Entered: 2/1/1994 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 3/27/92 ) to Dismiss (Rule 12) Response due: 4/27/92 (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 1/13/1992, Entered: 2/1/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                            Notice of assignment to Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/13/1992, Entered: 2/1/1994 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT FILED. FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 29034 (FE)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 51 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?