BREWER, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:92-cv-00141-DGS
District Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALL PLAINTIFFS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth C. Hensley +1 816 322 4466 +1 816 348 0896 hensleylawoffice@gmail.com
No Logo BILLY KYNER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth C. Hensley +1 816 322 4466 +1 816 348 0896 hensleylawoffice@gmail.com
No Logo E. A. BREWER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth C. Hensley +1 816 322 4466 +1 816 348 0896 hensleylawoffice@gmail.com
No Logo HOMER STONE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth C. Hensley +1 816 322 4466 +1 816 348 0896 hensleylawoffice@gmail.com
No Logo HUGH JENKINS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth C. Hensley +1 816 322 4466 +1 816 348 0896 hensleylawoffice@gmail.com
No Logo JOE ROBINSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth C. Hensley +1 816 322 4466 +1 816 348 0896 hensleylawoffice@gmail.com
No Logo KARL JENKINS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth C. Hensley +1 816 322 4466 +1 816 348 0896 hensleylawoffice@gmail.com
No Logo STEVE GREEN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth C. Hensley +1 816 322 4466 +1 816 348 0896 hensleylawoffice@gmail.com
No Logo TRENT WILSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth C. Hensley +1 816 322 4466 +1 816 348 0896 hensleylawoffice@gmail.com
No Logo TWO HUNDRED TEN ENTERPRISES CORPORATION, GARY GUILFORD, PRESIDENT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth C. Hensley +1 816 322 4466 +1 816 348 0896 hensleylawoffice@gmail.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Jay Abelson +1 202 616 0461 +1 202 514 7969 steven.abelson@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/2/1992
Jury Demand
Demand $50000
Nature of Suit 128 - Contract - Subsidy
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 1/31/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 1/31/1995, Entered: 2/3/1995 Judgment*
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint for failure to prosecute (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 02/03/1995
    LREF
    Blank 14 Filed: 1/31/1995, Entered: 2/3/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
    UNPUBLISHED DECISION entered dismissing the [1-1] complaint (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 02/03/1995
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/31/1995, Entered: 2/3/1995 Terminated Case
      Case closed. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 1/5/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
        ORDER entered directing the plaintiff to file notice required by RCFC 60.1(b)(4) by 1/17/95 or their claim will be dismissed (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 11/4/1994, Entered: 11/16/1994 Terminated:
          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 11/4/94 (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 11/4/1994, Entered: 11/16/1994 Terminated:
            DECISION ON REMAND. Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 10/17/1994, Entered: 10/21/1994 Terminated:
              STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 10/17/94 (FE)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 10/17/1994, Entered: 10/21/1994 Terminated:
                Deadline updated; reset Defendant's Status Report deadline to 12/13/94 [60 days]. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 8/22/1994, Entered: 8/25/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                  STATUS REPORT by USA by leave of Judge. Service: 8/18/94 (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 6/24/1994, Entered: 6/27/1994 Terminated:
                    JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint as to plaintiffs Brewer, Green, Hugh Jenkins, Karl Jenkins, Kyner Robinson, and Wilson (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 6/16/1994, Entered: 6/16/1994, Terminated: 1/31/1995 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                      UNPUBLISHED DECISION denying [4-1] cross motion, granting in part, denying in part [3-1] motion for Summary Judgment; setting defendant's Status Report deadline to 8/15/94 with further status reports due at 60 day intervals; remanding this case to DASCO; directing DASCO to file FOUR copies of final decision by 8/15/94; directing entry of judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) for defendant against certain plaintiffs and Administrative Record in (2) volumes returned to Defendant pursuant to Rule 60.1(a)(3), (4). (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties with plaintiffs served via Fed. Ex. and a certified copy to DASCO. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 12/13/1993, Entered: 1/28/1994 Terminated:
                        COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA Service: 12/13/93 (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 12/3/1993, Entered: 1/28/1994 Terminated:
                          REPLY by USA to response to [4-1] cross motion . Service: 12/3/93 (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 10/8/1993, Entered: 1/28/1994 Terminated:
                            CROSS MOTION by ALL PLAINTIFFS ( Service: 10/6/93 ) and RESPONSE to [3-1] motion for Summary Judgment by USA (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 5/21/1993, Entered: 1/28/1994 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service: 5/21/93) for Summary Judgment . (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 3/2/1992, Entered: 1/28/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                Notice of assignment to Judge Diane G. Weinstein . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/2/1992, Entered: 1/28/1994 Terminated:
                                  COMPLAINT FILED. FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 29623 (FE)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 182 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?