GRIGGS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:92-cv-00171-DGS
District Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JOYCE M. GRIGGS, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Sinclair Groat +1 202 616 8260 +1 202 514 7965 jack.groat@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/10/1992
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 6/30/1993
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 90-2700[N. District of Georgia]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 7/18/1995, Entered: 7/18/1995
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated July 18, 1995, affirmed [6-1] appeal by JOYCE M. GRIGGS. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 8/30/1993, Entered: 2/8/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
    NOTICE OF APPEAL by JOYCE M. GRIGGS. Copy to USA, Judge and to C.A.F.C. FILING FEE $ 105.00, RECEIPT # 034894. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/30/1993, Entered: 2/8/1994 CAFC Case Number
      CAFC Case Number Re: [6-1] appeal by JOYCE M. GRIGGS CAFC NUMBER: 93-5198. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 6/30/1993, Entered: 2/8/1994 Judgment*
        JUDGMENT entered that the complaint is dismissed (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 6/30/1993, Entered: 2/8/1994 Published DecisionCourt Filing
          PUBLISHED DECISION ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ). Copy to parties with plaintiff served via Federal Express. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/30/1993, Entered: 2/8/1994 Terminated Case
            Case closed. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 5/11/1992, Entered: 2/4/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
              Notice of assignment to Judge Diane G. Weinstein. Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 3/10/1992, Entered: 2/4/1994 Amended Complaint
                AMENDED COMPLAINT by JOYCE M. GRIGGS. COPIES (5) TO USA. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/10/1992, Entered: 2/4/1994 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                  Record transferred from the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, case number 90-CV-2700-JTC consisting of one bound volume. Notice to parties. (FE) Modified on 02/04/1994
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 50 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?