COLE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:92-cv-00184-MRT
District Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SYLVIA COLE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Cologne
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Sinclair Groat +1 202 616 8260 +1 202 514 7965 jack.groat@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/16/1992
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 2/28/1995
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 91-1079[S. District of California]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 2/28/1995, Entered: 3/1/1995 Judgment*
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/28/1995, Entered: 3/1/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 26 Filed: 2/27/1995, Entered: 3/1/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
      PUBLISHED DECISION entered denying plaintiff's [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment and granting defendant's [15-1] cross motion for summary judgment (signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 25 Filed: 11/28/1994, Entered: 11/30/1994 Terminated:
        REPLY by USA to response to [15-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 11/28/94. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 24 Filed: 11/28/1994, Entered: 11/29/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
          ORDER granting [23-1] motion for Leave to File out of time an enlargement of time within which to reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss (signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 23 Filed: 11/18/1994, Entered: 11/22/1994, Terminated: 11/28/1994 Terminated:
            MOTION by USA (Service : 11/18/94 ) for Leave to File out of time an enlargement of time within which to reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss (to November 28, 1994). (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 22 Filed: 11/17/1994, Entered: 11/22/1994 Terminated:
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Sinclair Groat Service: 11/17/94 (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 21 Filed: 11/16/1994, Entered: 11/21/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                ORDER returning Defendant's motion for enlargement of time for not being signed by attorney of record (signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III). Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 20 Filed: 11/2/1994, Entered: 11/14/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                  REPLY by SYLVIA COLE to response to [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/20/94 (FE) Modified on 11/14/1994
                    LREF
                    Blank 20 Filed: 11/2/1994, Entered: 11/14/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                    RESPONSE by SYLVIA COLE (Service: 10/20/94 ) to [15-1] cross motion, [15-1] motion to Dismiss. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 11/7/94 (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 19 Filed: 11/2/1994, Entered: 11/14/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                      ORDER pltf's response to deft's motion to dismiss, etc. is filed by leave of the judge: Document was untimely received; proof of service not attached to each copy; document does not comply with Rule 56.1(b); document does not comply with General Order No. 32. ( signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III ) Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 11/14/1994
                        LREF
                        Blank 18 Filed: 10/12/1994, Entered: 10/19/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                        ORDER granting [17-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss and cross motion for summary judgment, Response to [15-1] cross motion reset to 10/21/94 and [15-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 10/21/94 (signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 17 Filed: 10/7/1994, Entered: 10/14/1994, Terminated: 10/12/1994 Terminated:
                          MOTION by SYLVIA COLE (Service: 10/6/94) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss and cross motion for summary judgment [to October 21, 1994]. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 15 Filed: 9/12/1994, Entered: 9/20/1994 Terminated:
                            CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 8/30/94 ) and RESPONSE to [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment by SYLVIA COLE. Response due: 8/26/94. (HW) Modified on 09/20/1994
                              LREF
                              Blank 15 Filed: 9/12/1994, Entered: 9/20/1994 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service : 8/30/94 ) to Dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Response due: 9/30/94. (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 14 Filed: 9/12/1994, Entered: 9/20/1994 Terminated:
                                COUNTER-STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 9/7/94. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 9/12/1994, Entered: 9/20/1994 Terminated:
                                  STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 8/30/94. (HW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 9/12/1994, Entered: 9/19/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Leave to File motion to dismiss and cross-motion for summary judgment ( signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 9/7/1994, Entered: 9/19/1994, Terminated: 9/12/1994 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 9/7/94 ) for Leave to File motion to dismiss and cross-motion for summary judgment . (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 8/30/1994, Entered: 9/2/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                        ORDER entered directing the Clerk of the Court to return unfiled, "Defendant's motion to dismiss, etc., and Defendant's counter-statement of facts," received August 26, 1994 for correction of the following defects: (1) Documents do not comply with the provisions of Rule 56.1(d) re: statement of Facts missing. Documents may be filed by leave of the judge if they are out of time, with plaintiff's time to respond to run from the date of re-service ( signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III ). Copy to parties. (HW) Modified on 09/12/1994
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 8/1/1994, Entered: 8/8/1994 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by SYLVIA COLE (Service: 7/26/94) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 8/26/94 (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 8/1/1994, Entered: 8/8/1994 Terminated:
                                            STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by SYLVIA COLE. Service: 7/26/94 (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 7 Filed: 6/21/1994, Entered: 6/22/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                              ORDER entered pursuant to the June 20, 1994, joint status report, directing parties, should they choose to proceed on dispositive motions, to file by 8/5/94 ( signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/21/1994, Entered: 6/22/1994 Terminated:
                                                Deadline updated re 6/21/94 order; set Notice of Compliance deadline to 8/5/94 . (HW)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 6/20/1994, Entered: 6/22/1994 Terminated:
                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, together with a separate volume of appendix (record of AFBCMR proceedings) [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 6/20/1994, Entered: 6/22/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                    ORDER allowing the joint status report to be filed ( signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/20/1994, Entered: 6/22/1994 Terminated:
                                                      Deadline updated; reset Status Report deadline to 7/20/94 (monthly) (DS)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 9/24/1992, Entered: 2/1/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                        ORDER entered denying defendant's motion for summary judgment; remanding this case to the Air Force Board for Correction of Military Records; Suspending proceedings ; and directing plaintiff to file monthly Status Reports beginning 1/21/93 (signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III). Copy to parties with plaintiff served via federal express and a certified copy forwarded to the AFBCMR. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 4/14/1992, Entered: 2/1/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                          Notice of assignment to Judge Moody R. Tidwell III . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 4/14/1992, Entered: 2/1/1994 Terminated:
                                                            FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by SYLVIA COLE. Copies (5) to defendant. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 3/16/1992, Entered: 2/1/1994 Terminated:
                                                              Record transferred from the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California; case number 91-1079-B (LSP); consisting of one bound volume. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 108 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?