SMITH v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:92-cv-00242-KRH
District Judge Kenneth R. Harkins, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo HERTA E. SMITH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert T. Moxley +1 307 632 1112 +1 307 632 0401 vaccinelawyer@gmail.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donna Chapin Maizel +1 213 894 2434 +1 213 894 2380
Office COFC
Filed 4/6/1992
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 12/4/1992
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 12/8/1993, Entered: 12/14/1993 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy)of the CAFC dated, December 8, 1993, affirming the Court of Federal Claims [6-1] appeal by HERTA E. SMITH. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 2/2/1993, Entered: 12/14/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
    NOTICE OF APPEAL by HERTA E. SMITH. Copy to USA, Judge and to C.A.F.C. FILING FEE $ 105.00, RECEIPT # 033172. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 2/2/1993, Entered: 12/14/1993 CAFC Case Number
      CAFC Case Number Re: [6-1] appeal by HERTA E. SMITH CAFC NUMBER: 93-5076. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 12/4/1992, Entered: 12/14/1993 Judgment*
        JUDGMENT (signed by Clerk) that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. Copy to parties. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 12/4/1992, Entered: 12/14/1993 Terminated Case
          Case closed. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 12/3/1992, Entered: 12/14/1993 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [3-1] motion to Dismiss ( signed by Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins ). Copy to parties. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 4/27/1992, Entered: 12/14/1993, Terminated: 12/3/1992 Terminated:
              MOTION by USA (Service : 4/27/92 ) to Dismiss . Response due: 5/28/92. (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 4/6/1992, Entered: 12/14/1993 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                Notice of assignment to Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins . Copy to parties. (HW)
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 4/6/1992, Entered: 12/14/1993 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $ 120.00, RECEIPT # 029982. Answer due on 6/5/92. (HW)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 101 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?