FRISON v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:92-cv-00364-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ELLIS SCOTT FRISON, JR, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donna Chapin Maizel +1 213 894 2434 +1 213 894 2380
Office COFC
Filed 5/21/1992
Jury Demand
Demand $550000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 9/28/1992
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 6/2/1994, Entered: 6/2/1994
MANDATE (certified copy) of the CAFC dated March 2, 1994, affirming Court of Federal Claims decision re [10-1] appeal by ELLIS SCOTT FRISON, JR. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 7/14/1993, Entered: 1/31/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
    NOTICE OF APPEAL by ELLIS SCOTT FRISON JR. Copy to USA, Judge and to C.A.F.C. FILING FEE $ 105.00, RECEIPT # 034507. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/14/1993, Entered: 1/31/1994 CAFC Case Number
      CAFC Case Number Re: [10-1] appeal by ELLIS SCOTT FRISON JR. CAFC NUMBER: 93-5163. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 6/30/1993, Entered: 1/31/1994 Judgment*
        JUDGMENT (signed by Clerk) entered that the Rule 60(b) motion is denied, etc. Copy to parties. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 8 Filed: 6/30/1993, Entered: 1/31/1994 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER denying [7-1] motion to Vacate [4-1] judgment order, [3-1] order ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ). Copy to parties. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 7 Filed: 6/28/1993, Entered: 1/31/1994, Terminated: 6/30/1993 Terminated:
            MOTION by ELLIS SCOTT FRISON JR (Service : 6/22/93 ) to Vacate [4-1] judgment order, [3-1] order or in the alternative, and independant action for relief. Response due: 7/18/93. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 6 Filed: 6/23/1993, Entered: 1/31/1994 CAFC Mandate Affirming
              MANDATE (certified copy) of the CAFC dated June 23, 1993, affirming the Court of Federal Claims decision re [5-1] appeal by ELLIS SCOTT FRISON JR (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 11/17/1992, Entered: 1/31/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
                NOTICE OF APPEAL by ELLIS SCOTT FRISON JR. Copy to USA, Judge and to C.A.F.C. FILING FEE $ 105.00, RECEIPT # 032495. (HW)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 11/17/1992, Entered: 1/31/1994 CAFC Case Number
                  CAFC Case Number Re: [5-1] appeal by ELLIS SCOTT FRISON JR CAFC NUMBER: 93-5031. (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 9/28/1992, Entered: 1/31/1994 Judgment*
                    JUDGMENT entered that the complaint is dismissed with no costs to be assessed (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 9/28/1992, Entered: 1/31/1994 Terminated Case
                      Case closed. (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 9/25/1992, Entered: 1/31/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER entered directing the entry of final judgment ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 5/26/1992, Entered: 1/13/1994 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                          Notice of assignment to Judge James F. Merow. Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 5/21/1992, Entered: 1/13/1994 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $ 120. RECEIPT # 30513 (5/22/92). (FE)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 55 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?